EVRM Limited v. SDKA North America, LLC et al

Plaintiff: EVRM Limited
Defendant: SDKA North America, LLC, Christopher Kelly and Gurpreet Rai
Case Number: 1:2019cv01861
Filed: February 27, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332fr
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 18, 2019 Filing 29 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Gurpreet Rai. (km)
April 18, 2019 Filing 28 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to SDKA North America, LLC. (km)
April 18, 2019 Filing 27 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Christopher Kelly. (km)
April 17, 2019 Filing 26 AFFIRMATION of Akin Alcitepe in Support re: #23 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default, #25 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default, #24 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. Document filed by EVRM Limited. (Alcitepe, Akin)
April 17, 2019 Filing 25 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by EVRM Limited. (Alcitepe, Akin) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
April 17, 2019 Filing 24 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by EVRM Limited. (Alcitepe, Akin) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
April 17, 2019 Filing 23 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by EVRM Limited. (Alcitepe, Akin) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
April 17, 2019 Filing 22 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by EVRM Limited. (Alcitepe, Akin) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 4/18/2019 (km).
March 19, 2019 Filing 21 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Civil Cover Sheet, Summons in a Civil Action, Civil Complaint, Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, Individual Rules and Practices of Judge George B. Daniels, and ECF Rules & Instructions. served on Gurpreet Rai on March 13, 2019. Service was accepted by Johann Rose Cabildo, a person of suitable age and discretion. Document filed by EVRM Limited. (Alcitepe, Akin)
March 14, 2019 Filing 20 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Civil Cover Sheet, Summons in a Civil Action, Civil Complaint, Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, Individual Rules and Practices of Judge George B. Daniels, and ECF Rules & Instructions. served on SDKA North America, LLC on March 13, 2019. Service was accepted by Authorized Agent in the Office of the Secretary of State, of the State of New York. Document filed by EVRM Limited. (Alcitepe, Akin)
March 14, 2019 Filing 19 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gurpreet Rai. (pne)
March 14, 2019 Filing 18 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Civil Cover Sheet, Summons in a Civil Action, Civil Complaint, Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement, Individual Rules and Practices of Judge George B. Daniels, and ECF Rules & Instructions. served on Christopher Kelly on March 11, 2019. Service was accepted by Christopher Kelly. Document filed by EVRM Limited. (Alcitepe, Akin)
March 13, 2019 Filing 17 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Gurpreet Rai, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by EVRM Limited. (Alcitepe, Akin)
March 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Akin Alcitepe to RE-FILE Document No. #16 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; This party was previously issued a summons. If you require a new summons you must request an Amended Summons. Please include the word "Amended" on the summons PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Amended Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
March 12, 2019 Filing 16 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUESTED - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gurpreet Rai, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by EVRM Limited. (Alcitepe, Akin) Modified on 3/13/2019 (dnh).
March 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting #14 Motion for Akin Alcitepe to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 3/5/2019) (rjm)
March 1, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Akin Alcitepe to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
March 1, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Akin Alcitepe to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by EVRM Limited. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Akin Alcitepe in Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Alcitepe, Akin)
February 28, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Theodor Dietrich Erwin Bruening on behalf of EVRM Limited. (Bruening, Theodor)
February 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/12/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/28/2019) (jwh)
February 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Akin Alcitepe. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $5,665,000,000; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $5,670,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S. (pne)
February 28, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to SDKA North America, LLC. (pne)
February 28, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gurpreet Rai. (pne)
February 28, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Christopher Kelly. (pne)
February 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
February 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
February 28, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
February 28, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #7 MOTION for Akin Alcitepe to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16415427. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #8 Affidavit in Support of Motion,.. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from DC BAR; missing Proposed Order; Pursuant to Rule 1.3. the Attorney Affidavit missing the language of disciplinary.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice please attach the Certificate of good standing, the affidavit and the proposed Order to the Motion as exhibits. - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
February 27, 2019 Filing 8 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - AFFIDAVIT of Akin Alcitepe in Support re: #7 MOTION for Akin Alcitepe to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16415427. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. Document filed by EVRM Limited. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Alcitepe, Akin) Modified on 2/28/2019 (wb).
February 27, 2019 Filing 7 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Akin Alcitepe to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16415427. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by EVRM Limited.(Alcitepe, Akin) Modified on 2/28/2019 (wb).
February 27, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gurpreet Rai, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by EVRM Limited. (Alcitepe, Akin)
February 27, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Christopher Kelly, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by EVRM Limited. (Alcitepe, Akin)
February 27, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SDKA North America, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by EVRM Limited. (Alcitepe, Akin)
February 27, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by EVRM Limited.(Alcitepe, Akin)
February 27, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Alcitepe, Akin)
February 27, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Christopher Kelly, Gurpreet Rai, SDKA North America, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16415338)Document filed by EVRM Limited. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Alcitepe, Akin)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EVRM Limited v. SDKA North America, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SDKA North America, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Kelly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gurpreet Rai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EVRM Limited
Represented By: Akin Alcitepe
Represented By: Theodor Dietrich Erwin Bruening
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?