J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd. v. UBS Real Estate Securities, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd.
Defendant: U.S. Bank N.A., Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC, UBS Real Estate Securities Inc. and Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Undetermined: Lennar Corp.
3Rd Party Defendant: Harry Shani and Jaikishin Bhagia
3Rd Party Plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 1:2019cv01878
Filed: February 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332jd
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. This case is to be determined to be tried to a jury. Amended pleadings may not be filed and additional parties may not be joined except with leave of the Court. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed in accordance with a separate order of May 3, 2019. Non-Expert Deposition due by 11/1/2019. Expert Deposition due by 12/17/2019. Fact Discovery due by 11/1/2019. Expert Discovery due by 12/17/2019. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is: TBD. Case Management Conference set for 11/22/2019 at 10:30 AM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/3/2019) (jwh)
May 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER FOLLOWING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: As a result of a Pre-Trial Conference held before the Court today, the following is ORDERED: Plaintiff is granted leave to amend to (a) assert a breach of contract claim against U.S. Bank N.A. (b) to set forth the citizenship of the members of the limited partnership (as distinguished from residency), and (c) address any purported deficiencies asserted in defendants' letter of April 12, 2019. The Fourth Amended Complaint shall be filed by May 17, 2019. (Amended Pleadings due by 5/17/2019.) (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 5/3/2019) (jwh)
May 3, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge P. Kevin Castel: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 5/3/2019. The next conference is scheduled for November 22, 2019 at 10:30 a.m. (Nacanther, Florence)
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #68 Letter filed by J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd. ENDORSEMENT: Approved. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/30/2019) (jwh)
April 26, 2019 Filing 69 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jeffrey C. Wigginton dated April 26, 2019 re: Joint letter to comply with the Court's Order dated March 1, 2019. Document filed by J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd..(Wigginton, Jeff)
April 26, 2019 Filing 68 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Lee S. Siegel, Esq. dated April 26, 2019 re: Pretrial Conference. Document filed by J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd..(Siegel, Lee)
April 23, 2019 Filing 67 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Third Party Complaint,,,, served. Harry Shani served on 4/17/2019, answer due 5/8/2019. Service was accepted by Harry Shani. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Jackson, Aaron)
April 23, 2019 Filing 66 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Third Party Complaint,,,, served. Jaikishin Bhagia served on 3/30/2019, answer due 4/22/2019. Service was accepted by Jaikishin Bhagia. Document filed by U.S. Bank National Association. (Jackson, Aaron)
April 22, 2019 Filing 65 ANSWER to #43 Counterclaim. Document filed by J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd..(Kirchner, Christine)
April 22, 2019 Filing 64 ANSWER to #44 Third Party Complaint,,,,. Document filed by Jaikishin Bhagia.(Kirchner, Christine)
April 22, 2019 Filing 63 AMENDED RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Jaikishin Bhagia, J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd..(Kirchner, Christine)
April 18, 2019 Filing 62 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jeffrey C. Wigginton dated April 18, 2019 re: Opposition to Defendants/Counter-Plaintiffs' U.S. Bank National Association April 12, 2019 letter requesting permission to file a motion to dismiss. Document filed by J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd..(Wigginton, Jeff)
April 18, 2019 Filing 61 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Frank Thomas Spano on behalf of Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC, U.S. Bank N.A., Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Spano, Frank)
April 12, 2019 Filing 60 ANSWER to #50 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC, U.S. Bank N.A., Wells Fargo Bank N.A..(Nagi, Jason)
April 12, 2019 Filing 59 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Counts II and III of the Third Amended Complaint addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Jason A. Nagi dated April 12, 2019. Document filed by Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC, U.S. Bank N.A., Wells Fargo Bank N.A..(Nagi, Jason)
April 11, 2019 Filing 58 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #43 Counterclaim,,,, Unopposed. Document filed by J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 proposed Order)(Kirchner, Christine)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER granting #55 Motion for Christine Kirchner to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
April 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER granting #54 Motion for Jeffrey Carl Wigginton, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
April 3, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #55 MOTION for Christine Kirchner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16615372. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
April 3, 2019 Filing 55 MOTION for Christine Kirchner to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16615372. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jaikishin Bhagia, J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd., Harry Shani. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Certificate of Good Standing Texas Supreme Court, #3 Certificate of Good Standing State Bar of Texas, #4 Certificate of Good Standing Supreme Court of Illinois, #5 proposed order for Kirchner Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Kirchner, Christine)
April 3, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #54 MOTION for Jeffrey Carl Wigginton, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16613826. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (jc)
April 3, 2019 Filing 54 MOTION for Jeffrey Carl Wigginton, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16613826. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 State Bar of Texas Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Supreme Court Certificate of Good Standing, #4 Proposed Order)(Wigginton, Jeff)
April 2, 2019 Filing 53 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lee Scott Siegel on behalf of J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd.. (Siegel, Lee)
April 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER granting #51 Motion for Aaron C. Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
April 2, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #51 MOTION for Aaron C. Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16602298. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
April 1, 2019 Filing 51 MOTION for Aaron C. Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16602298. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC, U.S. Bank N.A., Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Jackson, Aaron)
March 29, 2019 Filing 50 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #11 Amended Complaint against Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC, UBS Real Estate Securities Inc., Wells Fargo Bank N.A..Document filed by J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd.. Related document: #11 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Mark, Brian)
March 29, 2019 Filing 49 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brian Frederick Mark on behalf of J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd.. (Mark, Brian)
March 25, 2019 Filing 48 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Harry Shani. (gp)
March 25, 2019 Filing 47 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Jaikishin Bhagia. (gp)
March 21, 2019 Filing 46 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Jaikishin Bhagia, re: #44 Third Party Complaint,,,,. Document filed by U.S. Bank N.A.. (Nagi, Jason)
March 21, 2019 Filing 45 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Harry Shani, re: #44 Third Party Complaint,,,,. Document filed by U.S. Bank N.A.. (Nagi, Jason)
March 21, 2019 Filing 44 THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Harry Shani, Jaikishin Bhagia.Document filed by U.S. Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Loan Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Deed of Trust, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment, #5 Exhibit E - Settlement Statement, #6 Exhibit F - Collateral Protection Notice, #7 Exhibit G - ACORD Certificate, #8 Exhibit H - Guaranty, #9 Exhibit I - Disbursement Ledger, #10 Exhibit J - Notice of Cancellation, #11 Exhibit K - Request, Invoice, Certificate, #12 Exhibit L - E-Mail, #13 Exhibit M - Nov. 2012 Rent Roll, #14 Exhibit N - June 2013 Rent Roll, #15 Exhibit O - Nov. 2013 Rent Roll, #16 Exhibit P - April 2014 Rent Roll, #17 Exhibit Q - Dec. 2018 Rent Roll, #18 Exhibit R - Reporting Default Letter, #19 Exhibit S - May 2017 Default Letter, #20 Exhibit T - June 2017 Default Letter, #21 Exhibit U - Acceleration Letter, #22 Exhibit V - Association Letter, #23 Exhibit W - Association Dues Default Letter, #24 Exhibit X - East West Note)(Nagi, Jason)
March 21, 2019 Filing 43 COUNTERCLAIM against J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd..Document filed by U.S. Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Loan Agreement, #2 Exhibit B - Note, #3 Exhibit C - Deed of Trust, #4 Exhibit D - Assignment, #5 Exhibit E - Settlement Statement, #6 Exhibit F - Collateral Protection Notice, #7 Exhibit G - ACORD Certificate, #8 Exhibit H - Guaranty, #9 Exhibit I - Disbursement Ledger, #10 Exhibit J - Notice of Cancellation, #11 Exhibit K - Request, Invoice, Certificate, #12 Exhibit L - E-Mail, #13 Exhibit M - Nov. 2012 Rent Roll, #14 Exhibit N - June 2013 Rent Roll, #15 Exhibit O - Nov. 2013 Rent Roll, #16 Exhibit P - April 2014 Rent Roll, #17 Exhibit Q - Dec. 2018 Rent Roll, #18 Exhibit R - Reporting Default Letter, #19 Exhibit S - May 2017 Default Letter, #20 Exhibit T - June 2017 Default Letter, #21 Exhibit U - Acceleration Letter, #22 Exhibit V - Association Letter, #23 Exhibit W - Association Dues Default Letter, #24 Exhibit X - East West Note)(Nagi, Jason)
March 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER granting #41 Motion for Brett D. Anders to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge P. Kevin Castel)(Text Only Order) (Nacanther, Florence)
March 18, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #41 MOTION for Brett D. Anders to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16516704. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
March 18, 2019 Filing 41 MOTION for Brett D. Anders to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-16516704. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC, U.S. Bank N.A., Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Anders, Brett)
March 7, 2019 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason A. Nagi on behalf of Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC, U.S. Bank N.A., Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Nagi, Jason)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/3/2019 at 10:45 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/1/2019) (jwh)
March 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER: Within 30 days of this Order, plaintiff shall amend its complaint to allege the citizenship of each of the constituent members of the LLC and the "main office" of the national bank or the action will be dismissed for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/1/2019) (jwh)
February 28, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sjo)
February 28, 2019 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
February 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sjo)
February 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
February 28, 2019 Filing 37 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Texas Southern; Case Number: 4:18-cv-00375. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
February 21, 2019 Interdistrict transfer to United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. Case transferred electronically, filed. (bthomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
February 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER granting #20 Motion to Transfer Venue. This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER granting #34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Pleadings and Add Additional Parties. (Amended Pleadings and Addition of New Parties due by 4/5/2019.) (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
February 1, 2019 Filing 34 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Pleadings and Add Additional Parties by Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., UBS Real Estate Securities, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 2/22/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pegues, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 33 AMENDED SCHEDULING ORDER. (Trial Term: October 2019). Amendments to Pleadings and Addition of New Parties due by 2/4/2019. Pltf Expert Witness List due by 1/2/2019. Pltf Expert Report due by 1/2/2019. Deft Expert Witness List due by 2/4/2019. Deft Expert Report due by 2/4/2019. Discovery due by 3/29/2019. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 4/30/2019. Pretrial Order due by 9/20/2019. Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/23/2019. Docket Call set for 9/27/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER granting #31 Motion to Modify Scheduling Order.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
November 29, 2018 Filing 31 Unopposed MOTION to Modify Scheduling Order by Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., UBS Real Estate Securities, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 12/20/2018. (Pegues, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
November 1, 2018 Filing 30 STATUS REPORT by Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., UBS Real Estate Securities, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed.(Pegues, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
October 23, 2018 Filing 29 NOTICE of Change of Address by POLSINELLI PC, counsel for Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., UBS Real Estate Securities, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed. (Pegues, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting #27 Motion for Extension of Time to Add New Parties. The deadline to add new parties is 12/3/2018.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
September 25, 2018 Filing 27 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time Add New Parties by Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., UBS Real Estate Securities, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 10/16/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pegues, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
July 31, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Second MOTION for Extension of Time To Add New Parties. (Addition of New Parties due by 10/2/2018) (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
July 27, 2018 Filing 25 Second MOTION for Extension of Time To Add New Parties by Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., UBS Real Estate Securities, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 8/17/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pegues, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
June 11, 2018 Filing 24 Amended RESPONSE to #20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Transfer of Venue filed by J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Appendix, #3 Proposed Order)(Kirchner, Christine) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
June 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #22 Motion for Extend Time to Add New Parties. (Joinder of Parties due by 8/3/2018). (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
May 31, 2018 Filing 22 MOTION for Extension of Time To Add New Parties by Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., UBS Real Estate Securities, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/21/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pegues, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
May 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Extend Time to Answer to Plaintiff's Second Complaint. (Defendant's Answer due by 5/22/18). (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
May 21, 2018 Filing 20 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Transfer of Venue by Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., UBS Real Estate Securities, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/11/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pegues, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
May 18, 2018 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE of Conference re: #18 MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Second Amended Complaint by Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., UBS Real Estate Securities, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed.(Pegues, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
May 14, 2018 Filing 18 MOTION for Extension of Time Respond to Second Amended Complaint by Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., UBS Real Estate Securities, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 6/4/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pegues, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #13 Motion for Brett D. Anders to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
May 7, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #12 Motion for Aaron Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice.(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(jdav, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER FOR STATUS REPORT. Status Report due by 11/1/2018(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER. Trial Term: July 2019. ETT: 3 days. Non-Jury Trial. Amended Pleadings due by 6/4/2018. Joinder of Parties due by 6/4/2018 Pltf Expert Report due by 11/1/2018. Deft Expert Report due by 12/3/2018. Discovery due by 1/30/2019. Dispositive Motion Filing due by 3/1/2019. Joint Pretrial Order due by 6/24/2019. Pretrial Order due by 6/21/2019. Docket Call set for 6/28/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
May 4, 2018 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore. SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/4/2018. Scheduling dates entered, order to follow Appearances: Christine Kirchner, Michael Pegues.(Court Reporter: Bruce Slavin), filed.(bthomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 13 MOTION for Brett D. Anders to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., UBS Real Estate Securities, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/25/2018. (Pegues, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
May 4, 2018 Filing 12 MOTION for Aaron Jackson to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., UBS Real Estate Securities, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/25/2018. (Pegues, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
April 30, 2018 Filing 11 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT and REQUEST FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants filed by J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd. (bthomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
April 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. (Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(bthomas, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd., filed. Motion Docket Date 5/18/2018. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Second Amended Complaint and Request for Declaratory Judgment, #2 Proposed Order granting Leave to File Second Amended Complaint)(Wigginton, Jeff) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
April 27, 2018 Filing 8 RESPONSE to #5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Appendix Cases, #3 Proposed Order denying Defendants Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative to Transfer Venue)(Kirchner, Christine) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
April 24, 2018 Filing 7 JOINT DISCOVERY/CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN by J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd., filed.(Kirchner, Christine) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
April 10, 2018 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., UBS Real Estate Securities, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed.(Pegues, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
April 6, 2018 Filing 5 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC, U.S. Bank, N.A., UBS Real Estate Securities, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., filed. Motion Docket Date 4/27/2018. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pegues, Michael) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
February 23, 2018 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd., filed.(Daily, Kimberly) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
February 23, 2018 Filing 3 First AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC, UBS Real Estate Securities, Inc., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., U.S. Bank, N.A. filed by J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd..(Daily, Kimberly) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
February 9, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER for Initial Pretrial and Scheduling Conference and Order to Disclose Interested Persons. Initial Conference set for 5/4/2018 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 9A before Judge Vanessa D Gilmore(Signed by Judge Vanessa D Gilmore) Parties notified.(smurdock, 4) [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]
February 8, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against all Defendants (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-19580422) filed by J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kirchner, Christine) Modified on 2/9/2018 (smurdock, 4). [Transferred from Texas Southern on 2/28/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd. v. UBS Real Estate Securities, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Undetermined: Lennar Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank N.A.
Represented By: Michael D Pegues
Represented By: Brett D Anders
Represented By: Aaron Cooper Jackson
Represented By: Frank Thomas Spano
Represented By: Jason A. Nagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rialto Capital Advisors, LLC
Represented By: Michael D Pegues
Represented By: Brett D Anders
Represented By: Aaron Cooper Jackson
Represented By: Frank Thomas Spano
Represented By: Jason A. Nagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UBS Real Estate Securities Inc.
Represented By: Michael D Pegues
Represented By: Brett D Anders
Represented By: Aaron Cooper Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Michael D Pegues
Represented By: Aaron Cooper Jackson
Represented By: Brett D Anders
Represented By: Frank Thomas Spano
Represented By: Jason A. Nagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J&R Multifamily Group, Ltd.
Represented By: Christine Kirchner
Represented By: Kimberly Lanai Daily
Represented By: Jeff C Wigginton, Jr
Represented By: Lee Scott Siegel
Represented By: Brian Frederick Mark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Harry Shani
Represented By: Christine Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jaikishin Bhagia
Represented By: Christine Kirchner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Michael D Pegues
Represented By: Brett D Anders
Represented By: Jason A. Nagi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?