Sturkey et al v. Smith, Jr. et al
Plaintiff: TASHIKA STURKEY and JORDAN STURKEY
Defendant: JOE HASKELL SMITH, JR. and WIZ TRANS LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv01999
Filed: March 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1441mv
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). The parties have not engaged in settlement discussions. This case is to be tried to a jury. No additional parties may be joined after 60 days following deposition without leave of the Court. No amendments to the pleadings may be made after 60 days post deposition without leave of the Court. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 9 days. Deposition due by 7/26/2019. Fact Discovery due by 7/26/2019. Expert Discovery due by 9/20/2019. Discovery due by 10/21/2019. Status Conference set for 8/2/2019 at 11:45 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 4/26/2019) (rj)
April 26, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronnie Abrams: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 4/26/2019. (arc)
April 19, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Jordan Sturkey, Tashika Sturkey.(Rosen, Kara)
April 18, 2019 Filing 7 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Joe Haskell Smith, Jr., Wiz Trans LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Order) (Leader, Robyn)
March 7, 2019 Filing 6 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Ronnie Abrams from Robyn J. Leader dated March 7, 2019 re: Order. Document filed by Joe Haskell Smith, Jr., Wiz Trans LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Order, #2 Affidavit Affidavit of Service)(Leader, Robyn)
March 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial status conference on April 26, 2019 at 3:15 p.m. in Courtroom 1506 of the U.S. District Court for the Southern District of NewYork, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by April 19, 2019, the parties submit a joint letter, not to exceed five (5) pages, providing the following information in separate paragraphs. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, by April 19, 2019, the parties jointly submit to the Court a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. Defendants are ordered to serve Plaintiffs with a copy of this order and to file an affidavit on ECF certifying that such service has been effectuated. Ad as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 4/26/2019 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 3/06/2019) (ama)
March 5, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Service)(Leader, Robyn)
March 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Robyn Jacqueline Leader to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Yes and No selected for Jury Demand; Select only Yes;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
March 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robyn Jacqueline Leader. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Tashika Sturkey, Jordan Sturkey, Joe Haskell Smith, Jr., Wiz Trans LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps. (pne)
March 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robyn Jacqueline Leader. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jurisdiction code 3 (Federal Question); Citizenship Plaintiff code (NONE); Citizenship Defendant code (NONE); County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jurisdiction code has been modified to 4 (Diversity); the Citizenship Plaintiff code has been modified to 1 (Citizen of This State); the Citizenship Defendant code has been modified to 2 (Citizen of Another State); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
March 5, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
March 5, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
March 5, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
March 4, 2019 Filing 3 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by WIZ TRANS LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Service)(Leader, Robyn)
March 4, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of Service)(Leader, Robyn) Modified on 3/5/2019 (pne).
March 4, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 32529/2018E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16437404).Document filed by WIZ TRANS LLC, JOE HASKELL SMITH, JR.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Verified Answer, #3 Exhibit Verified Bill of Particulars, #4 Exhibit Response to Combined Demands, #5 Affidavit Declaration of Service)(Leader, Robyn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sturkey et al v. Smith, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TASHIKA STURKEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JORDAN STURKEY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOE HASKELL SMITH, JR.
Represented By: Robyn Jacqueline Leader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WIZ TRANS LLC
Represented By: Robyn Jacqueline Leader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?