Cruz v. United States of America et al

Plaintiff: Michael Cruz
Defendant: Ozone Park Medical Care, PLLC, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Mohammad Rahman and Mohammed M. Rahman
Case Number: 1:2019cv02064
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Conference adjourned from May 2, 2019 to June 11, 2019 at 12:30 pm. SO ORDERED., Initial Conference set for 6/11/2019 at 12:30 PM before Judge P. Kevin Castel. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 4/30/2019) (rj)
April 25, 2019 Filing 8 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Talia Kraemer dated 4/25/2019 re: Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by United States Of America.(Kraemer, Talia)
April 24, 2019 Filing 7 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Talia Kraemer dated 04/24/2019. Document filed by United States Of America.(Kraemer, Talia)
April 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Talia Kraemer on behalf of United States Of America. (Kraemer, Talia)
April 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lauren Maloney on behalf of Ozone Park Medical Care, PLLC, Mohammed M. Rahman. (Maloney, Lauren)
March 7, 2019 Filing 4 LETTER addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from GORDON PRICE DIEFENBACH dated MARCH 7, 2019 re: Courtesy copy as per Judge's rules. Document filed by Michael Cruz.(Diefenbach, Gordon)
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 5/2/2019 at 11:45 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 3/7/2019) (jwh)
March 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
March 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
March 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
March 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gordon Price Diefenbach. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1402; Dollar Demand $10,000,000,000; County code New York; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1346; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9,999,000; the County code has been modified to Queens; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (pc)
March 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Gordon Price Diefenbach to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the All Defendant radio button was selected;. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
March 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gordon Price Diefenbach. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Michael Cruz, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, Mohammad Rahman. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted;. (pc)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Diefenbach, Gordon)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against All Defendants. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16450978)Document filed by Michael Cruz. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Diefenbach, Gordon) Modified on 3/7/2019 (pc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cruz v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ozone Park Medical Care, PLLC
Represented By: Lauren Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Talia Kraemer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammad Rahman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohammed M. Rahman
Represented By: Lauren Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Cruz
Represented By: Gordon Price Diefenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?