Allen et al v. General Motors, LLC
Plaintiff: Andrew Allen and Tammy Allen
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv02088
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Jesse M Furman
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: On April 12, 2019, the Court cancelled the status conference scheduled for April 18, 2019. See Docket No. 6667. No later than one week from the date of this Order, the parties shall submit a joint letter advising the Court of whether or when there is a need for a status conference and, if so, (1) what topics the conference should cover (including but not limited to whether the conference should be limited to personal injury and wrongful death cases in light of the pending class certification and summary judgment motions as to the economic loss claims); and (2) dates upon which all relevant counsel are available. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 5/2/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al.(jca)
April 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER NO. 163 [Regarding Modifications to Agreed Preservation Order Nos. 2-6]: The Court, having received and reviewed the parties' April 25, 2019 request to modify or withdraw the Agreed Preservation Orders governing New GM's obligations for maintaining and preserving recalled parts covered by certain National Highway Traffic Safety Administration ("NHTSA") Recall Campaigns (Docket No. 6708), HEREBY ORDERS, ADJUDGES, and DECREES that the following Agreed Preservation Orders shall be modified and/or withdrawn as follows: Agreed Preservation Order No. 2 (Docket No. 279) Withdrawn except as to the preservation obligations relating to parts covered by NHTSA Recall Campaigns 14V-118 and 14V-153, which remain operative; Agreed Preservation Order No. 3 (Docket No. 344) Withdrawn and dissolved in its entirety; Agreed Preservation Order No. 4 (Docket No. 403) Withdrawn and dissolved in its entirety; Agreed Preservation Order No. 5 (Docket No. 605) Withdrawn and dissolved in its entirety; and Agreed Preservation Order No. 6 (Docket No. 880) Withdrawn except as to the preservation obligations relating to parts covered by NHTSA Recall Campaigns 14V-346 and 14V-394, which remain operative. Should any party to this litigation object to the foregoing modifications and/or withdrawals, such objection(s) shall be filed on the main MDL docket within twenty-one (21) days of the entry of this Order, and shall specify the particular recall campaign preservation obligation that is the subject of the objection, as well as the basis for that objection. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 4/29/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al.(ne)
April 2, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Letter served on Affected Plaintiffs on April 2, 2019. Service was made by Mail. Document filed by General Motors LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al.(Bloomer, Andrew)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. General Motors, LLC served on 3/11/2019, answer due 4/1/2019. Service was accepted by CSC Lawyers. Document filed by Andrew Allen; Tammy Allen. (Emison, Brett)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER NO. 162 [Regarding Next Steps For 18 Post-Sale Personal Injury Claims]: By Friday, March 15, 2019, New GM will provide Lead Counsel a list of plaintiffs it has identified as those it believes should be subject to dispositive motion practice in light of the Court's December 28, 2017 Opinion and Order. See In re GM LLC Ignition Switch Litig., 2017 WL 6729295, at *1 (S.D.N.Y. Dec. 28, 2017). By Friday, March 22, 2019, New GM and Lead Counsel shall submit a joint letter (and, if appropriate, a proposed order) with respect to how the Court should address the claims of those plaintiffs. By Friday, March 29, 2019, the parties are to meet and confer and provide the Court joint or competing lists of plaintiffs who may be eligible for Suggestion of Remand No. 1. By Monday, April 15, 2019, Lead Counsel and Counsel for New GM shall submit to the Court a joint letter addressing the parties' recommendations as to the proper venue for remand or transfer of each of the plaintiffs subject to Suggestion of Remand No. 1. (As further set forth in this order) (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/8/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF et al.(ne)
March 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MDL CONSOLIDATION ORDER. Pursuant to the June 12, 2014 Order of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation (JPML), In re: General Motors Ignition Switch Litigation, 14-MD-2543, has been assigned to this Court for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. 14-MD-2543, Docket No. 1. As this case, Allen v. General Motors LLC, 19-CV-2088, has been directly filed in this district and, based on the Court's review, appears to be within the scope of the multidistrict litigation, it is hereby ORDERED that it is transferred to 14-MD-2543 for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings, subject to the process for objections set forth in Section II of Order No. 8. See 14-MD-2543, Docket No. 249, at 4-5. Counsel is advised to consult the docket in 14-MD-2543, including Order Nos. 1 and 25 (14-MD-2543, Docket Nos. 19 and 422, respectively), as well as the GM Ignition Switch MDL website (http://gmignitionmdl.com), for other pertinent information. The Clerk of Court is directed to docket this Order in the above-captioned cases. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Jesse M. Furman on 3/8/19) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:14-md-02543-JMF, 1:19-cv-02088-JMF(yv)
March 8, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:14-md-02543-JMF. (yv)
March 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ma)
March 8, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Jesse M. Furman. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ma)
March 8, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:14-md-02543-JMF. Notice of Assignment to follow. (ma)
March 7, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to General Motors, LLC. (sj)
March 7, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Jesse M. Furman as possibly related to 1:14md2543. (sj)
March 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
March 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (sj)
March 6, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to General Motors, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Andrew Allen, Tammy Allen. (Emison, Brett)
March 6, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 14-MD-2543. Document filed by Andrew Allen, Tammy Allen.(Emison, Brett)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Emison, Brett)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against General Motors, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16453919)Document filed by Andrew Allen, Tammy Allen.(Emison, Brett)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrew Allen
Represented By: Brett A. Emison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Allen
Represented By: Brett A. Emison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?