United States of America v. Ahern Painting Contractors, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Tower Maintenance Corp., Ahern Painting Contractors, Inc. and Spectrum Painting Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv02096
Filed: March 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Deborah A Batts
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for Plaintiff, the United States of America, and the respective undersigned counsel for Defendants Ahern Painting Contractors, Inc. ("Ahern"), and Spectrum Painting Corp. ("Spectrum"), that the deadline to answer, move, or otherwise responds to the Complaint in the above-captioned case, filed March 6, 2019, (Dkt.1), shall be extended from May 8, 2019 to May 22, 2019. This is the second stipulation agreeing to an extension of time for Ahern and Spectrum to respond to the Complaint. The first stipulation was granted by Your Honor and extended the due date to respond from April 8, 2019 to May 8, 2019 (Dkt.15). GRANTED. SO ORDERED., Ahern Painting Contractors, Inc. answer due 5/22/2019; Spectrum Painting Corp. answer due 5/22/2019. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 5/1/2019) (rj)
April 30, 2019 Filing 18 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Ahern Painting Contractors, Inc.. (Gilbert, Michael)
April 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER: That Tower's Maintenance's deadline to file its Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint is hereby extended to June 7, 2019. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Tower Maintenance Corp. answer due 6/7/2019.) (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 4/25/2019) (rro) Modified on 4/26/2019 (rro).
April 24, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Tower Maintenance Corp.. (Georgoulis, Chris)
March 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for Plaintiff, the United States of America, and the respective undersigned counsel for Defendants Ahern Painting Contractors, Inc., and Spectrum Painting Corp., that the deadline to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Complaint in the above-captioned case, filed March 6, 2019 (Dkt. 1), shall be extended from April 8, 2019 to May 8, 2019. GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Ahern Painting Contractors, Inc. answer due 5/8/2019; Spectrum Painting Corp. answer due 5/8/2019.) Motions terminated: #13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Michael J. Gilbert dated March 28, 2019 filed by Ahern Painting Contractors, Inc. (Signed by Judge Deborah A. Batts on 3/29/2019) (rro)
March 28, 2019 Filing 14 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Ahern Painting Contractors, Inc.. (Gilbert, Michael)
March 28, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Deborah A. Batts from Michael J. Gilbert dated March 28, 2019. Document filed by Ahern Painting Contractors, Inc..(Gilbert, Michael)
March 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by David J Kennedy on behalf of United States of America. (Kennedy, David)
March 13, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael J. Gilbert on behalf of Ahern Painting Contractors, Inc.. (Gilbert, Michael)
March 13, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Edward A. McDonald on behalf of Ahern Painting Contractors, Inc.. (McDonald, Edward)
March 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ronald P. Fischetti on behalf of Spectrum Painting Corp.. (Fischetti, Ronald)
March 12, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Tower Maintenance Corp.. (dnh)
March 12, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Spectrum Painting Corp.. (dnh)
March 12, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ahern Painting Contractors, Inc.. (dnh)
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Tower Maintenance Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America. (Folch, Monica)
March 11, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Spectrum Painting Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America. (Folch, Monica)
March 11, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ahern Painting Contractors, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States of America. (Folch, Monica)
March 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
March 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
March 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Deborah A. Batts. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
March 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Monica Pilar Folch. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to none (no fee required). (dnh)
March 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Folch, Monica)
March 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ahern Painting Contractors, Inc., Spectrum Painting Corp., Tower Maintenance Corp.. Document filed by United States of America.(Folch, Monica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Ahern Painting Contractors, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tower Maintenance Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahern Painting Contractors, Inc.
Represented By: Edward A. McDonald
Represented By: Michael J. Gilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Spectrum Painting Corp.
Represented By: Ronald P. Fischetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Monica Pilar Folch
Represented By: David J Kennedy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?