Febo v. James et al
Plaintiff: Aracelis Febo
Defendant: Jermaine James and Bozzuto's, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv03159
Filed: April 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1446nr
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER. It having been reported to this Court that this case has been settled, it is hereby ORDERED that the above-captioned action is discontinued without costs to any party and without prejudice to restoring the action to this Court's calendar if the application to restore the action is made within thirty (30) days. To be clear, any application to reopen must be filed within thirty days of this Order; any application to reopen filed thereafter may be denied solely on that basis. All scheduled conferences are hereby adjourned, and as further set forth in this Order. So ordered. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 3/31/2020) (rjm)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER: The settlement conference scheduled for Friday March 27, 2020, at 2:30 p.m. is changed to a telephone conference. The parties are directed to arrange for a conference call (preferably toll free) that all parties and the Court may dial into. Th e parties shall provide the dial-in number to the court by means of an email sent to gorensteinsettlement@nysd.uscourts.gov in advance of the conference. The submissions required by Docket # 21 remain due on March 23, 2020. SO ORDERED., ( Telephone Conference set for 3/27/2020 at 02:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 3/16/2020) (ama)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER: The above-referenced action has been referred to the undersigned for general pre-trial purposes. See 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A). All pre-trial applications, including those relating to scheduling and discovery, shall be made to the undersig ned ( except motions to dismiss or for judgment on the pleadings, for injunctive relief, for summary judgment, or for classcertification). All applications must comply with this Court's Individual Practices, which are available through the Clerk 's Office or at: https://nysd.uscourts.gov/hon-gabriel-w-gorenstein. If a recipient of this Order is aware of any attorneys or parties who should receive notice of Court action in this case other than any attorneys or parties currently listed on the docket sheet, please notify Deputy Clerk Richalyn Chambers at (212) 805-4260 immediately. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 2/28/2020) (ama)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER SCHEDULING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE: Settlement Conference set for 3/27/2020 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 6B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein on 2/7/2020) (jwh)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER. Pursuant to the Case Management Plan and Scheduling Order entered in this case, the parties were to submit a letter by December 4, 2019, indicating whether they sought referral to the Southern District's Mediation Program or to a Magist rate Judge for a settlement conference. See Dkt. No. 15. The Court is not in receipt of that letter. The parties are hereby ordered to submit such a letter on or before December 15, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 12/11/19) (yv)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Febo v. James et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jermaine James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bozzuto's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aracelis Febo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?