Atkinson et al v. Mount Sinai Health System, Inc. et al
Case Number: 1:2019cv03779
Filed: January 14, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Office: Foley Square Office
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 451 Employment Discrimination

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
May 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby: ORDERED that Defendant Mount Sinai Health System, Inc., is DISMISSED as a Defendant in this action, and in its place will be SUBSTITUTED Defendant Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai. The Clerk of Court is resp ectfully directed to update the docket to reflect the substitution. If the parties did in fact intend to dismiss claims, and not simply to effect substitution of a Defendant, they may inform me of this by no later than May 21, 2022. SO ORDERED., Icahn School of Medicine at Mount Sinai added. Mount Sinai Health System, Inc. terminated. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 5/16/2022) (ama)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 103 CLERK'S RULE 54(b) JUDGMENT re: 102 Memorandum & Opinion in favor of Mount Sinai Health System, Inc., Bruno Silva, Dennis S. Charney, Prabhjot Singh against Holly Atkinson, Humale Khan, Mary Caliendo, Natasha Anushri Anandaraja. It is h ereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated April 22, 2022, the Motion is GRANTED as it pertains to the Dismissed Plaintiffs' claims and DENIED as it pertains to Misiti's r etaliation claims. Final judgment is entered pursuant to Rule 54(b) against the Dismissed Plaintiffs and in favor of Defendants.It is hereby ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED: That for the reasons stated in the Court's Opinion and Order dated Apr il 22, 2022, the Motion is GRANTED as it pertains to the Dismissed Plaintiffs' claims and DENIED as it pertains to Misiti's retaliation claims. Final judgment is entered pursuant to Rule 54(b) against the Dismissed Plaintiffs and in favor of Defendants. (Signed by Clerk of Court Ruby Krajick on 4/25/2022) (Attachments: # 1 Right to Appeal) (km)
April 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 102 OPINION AND ORDER re: 85 MOTION for Judgment on Partial Findings . filed by Emilie Bruzelius, Amanda Misiti, Geraldine Llames, Mary Caliendo, Natasha Anushri Anandaraja, Holly Atkinson, Humale Khan, Stella Safo. For the forego ing reasons, the Motion is GRANTED as it pertains to the Dismissed Plaintiffs' claims and DENIED as it pertains to Misiti's retaliation claims. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the open motion at docket number 85 and to enter final judgment pursuant to Rule 54(b) against the Dismissed Plaintiffs and in favor of Defendants. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 4/22/2022) (kv) Transmission to Orders and Judgments Clerk for processing.
March 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 98 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby: ORDERED that, in light of the public health crisis, the Court will not be holding an initial pretrial conference. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that , by April 12, 2022, the parties shall submit a joint letter, not to exceed three (3) pages. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties also jointly submit to the Court a proposed case management plan and scheduling order. A template for the order is av ailable at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judge/Broderick. The status letter and the proposed case management plan should be filed electronically on ECF, consistent with Section 13.1 of the Court's Electronic Case Filing (ECF) Rules & Instructions, available at https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-relatedinstructions. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 3/29/2022) (jca)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 81 OPINION AND ORDER re: 38 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Defendants' Partial Motion to Dismiss the Amended Complaint. filed by Dennis S. Charney, Prabhjot Singh, Bruno Silva, Mount Sinai Health System, Inc., 36 MOTION to Strike Document No. 30 First Amended Complaint. filed by Dennis S. Charney, Prabhjot Singh, Bruno Silva, Mount Sinai Health System, Inc., 33 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion to Dismiss. filed by David Berman, 65 M OTION for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint . filed by Emilie Bruzelius, Amanda Misiti, Geraldine Llames, Mary Caliendo, Natasha Anushri Anandaraja, Holly Atkinson, Humale Khan, Stella Safo. For the foregoing reasons, Bermans mo tion to dismiss is GRANTED; the Sinai Defendants motion to dismiss is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART; their motion to strike is DENIED; and Plaintiffs' motion for leave to file the SAC is DENIED. Given my disposition, Plaintiffs Atkinson 9;s, Anandaraja's, Khan's, and Caliendo's federal claims are DISMISSED with prejudice, and their state law claims are DISMISSED without prejudice. Plaintiff Misiti's federal and state law retaliation claims under the Thirteenth Ca use of Action are DISMISSED with prejudice. Plaintiffs Safo's and Llames' claims against Berman are DISMISSED with prejudice. In summary, Plaintiffs Atkinson, Anandaraja, Khan, and Caliendo no longer have causes of action in this case; prop osed Plaintiff Beddoe cannot join this action; and Defendant Berman is dismissed from this action. SO ORDERED. David Berman, Mary Caliendo, Humale Khan, Natasha Anushri Anandaraja and Holly Atkinson terminated. (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 1/14/2022) (kv)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Atkinson et al v. Mount Sinai Health System, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?