Trans Commodities, Inc. v. Sarsenov et al
Plaintiff: Trans Commodities, Inc.
Defendant: Helios LLP, Rashid Sarsenov, Gulinara Sarbagyshevna, JSC Helios, Sofia Sarsenova, AZS Helios LLC, Sergei Alimov, Valikhan Koshumbayev, Ravil Saratov, Caspian Progressive Technology, Ltd., Gulnara Sarbagyshevna, Joint Stock Company Helios, Rashid Temirbulatovich Sarsenov and Sofia Temirbulatovna Sarsenova
Case Number: 1:2019cv03874
Filed: April 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Stockholders Suits
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 1/5/2021) (jwh)
January 4, 2021 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jeffrey C. Dannenberg dated 01/04/2021. Document filed by Trans Commodities, Inc...(Dannenberg, Jeffrey)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #17 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: The July 21, 2020 initial conference is adjourned to January 7, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. (Initial Conference set for 1/7/2021 at 09:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/14/2020) (jwh)
July 12, 2020 Filing 17 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jeffrey C. Dannenberg, Esq. dated 07/12/2020. Document filed by Trans Commodities, Inc...(Dannenberg, Jeffrey)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: The May 26, 2020 conference is adjourned to July 21, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/5/2020) Initial Conference set for 7/21/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels. (ks)
February 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: The initial conference scheduled for February 18, 2020 is adjourned to May 26, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. (Initial Conference set for 5/26/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 2/12/2020) (jwh)
February 12, 2020 ***DELETED DOCUMENT. Deleted document number #15 Order. The document was incorrectly filed in this case. (ama)
February 11, 2020 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jeffrey C. Dannenberg dated 02/11/2020. Document filed by Trans Commodities, Inc...(Dannenberg, Jeffrey)
November 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #12 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference: The initial conference is adjourned from November 12, 2019 to February 18, 2020 at 9:30 a.m. (Initial Conference set for 2/18/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 11/12/2019) (jwh)
November 7, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jeffrey C. Dannenberg dated 11/07/2019. Document filed by Trans Commodities, Inc..(Dannenberg, Jeffrey)
July 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #10 Letter filed by Trans Commodities, Inc.. ENDORSEMENT: The initial conference is adjourned from August 13, 2019 to November 12, 2019 at 9:45 a.m. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 7/30/2019) ( Initial Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 09:45 AM before Judge George B. Daniels.) (ks)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER addressed to Judge George B. Daniels from Jeffrey C. Dannenberg dated 07/29/2019 re: Adjournment of Initial Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Trans Commodities, Inc..(Dannenberg, Jeffrey)
May 6, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to AZS Helios LLC, Sergei Alimov, Caspian Progressive Technology, Ltd., Helios LLP, Joint Stock Company Helios, Valikhan Koshumbayev, Ravil Saratov, Gulnara Sarbagyshevna, Rashid Temirbulatovich Sarsenov, Sofia Temirbulatovna Sarsenova. (dnh)
May 5, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rashid Temirbulatovich Sarsenov, Sofia Temirbulatovna Sarsenova, Sergei Alimov, Ravil Saratov, Valikhan Koshumbayev, Gulnara Sarbagyshevna, Caspian Progressive Technology, Ltd., Helios LLP, AZS Helios LLC, JSC Helios, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Trans Commodities, Inc.. (Dannenberg, Jeffrey)
May 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jeffrey Craig Dannenberg to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; party name error (Gulnara Sarbagyshevna). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (sj)
May 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/13/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/1/2019) (jwh)
May 2, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - PDF ERROR REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rashid Temirbulatovich Sarsenov, Sofia Temirbulatovna Sarsenova, Sergei Alimov, Ravil Saratov, Valikhan Koshumbayev, Gulnara Sarbagyshevna, Caspian Progressive Technology, Ltd., Helios LLP, AZS Helios LLC, Joint Stock Company Helios, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Trans Commodities, Inc.. (Dannenberg, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/3/2019 (sj).
May 2, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jeffrey Craig Dannenberg to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Caption Error; the caption on the Summons PDF must exactly match the caption on the pleading. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
May 1, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rashid Temirbulatovich Sarsenov, Sofia Temirbulatovna Sarsenova, Sergei Alimov, Ravil Saratov, Valikhan Koshumbayev, Gulnara Sarbagyshevna, Caspian Progressive Technology, Ltd., Helios LLP, AZS Helios LLC, Joint Stock Company Helios, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Trans Commodities, Inc.. (Dannenberg, Jeffrey) Modified on 5/2/2019 (dnh).
May 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jeffrey Craig Dannenberg. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: JSC Helios ; Gulinara Sarbagyshevna ; Rashid Sarsenov ; Sofia Sarsenova. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error. (dnh)
May 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jeffrey Craig Dannenberg. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
May 1, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
May 1, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
May 1, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
May 1, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Jeffrey Craig Dannenberg to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; The caption on the summons must exactly match the caption on the pleading. If the entire caption does not fit, list the leading party followed by 'et al'. The spelling of the party names in the docket entry and on the PDF must exactly match the party of record. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
April 30, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Rashid Sarsenov, Sofia Sarsenova, Sergei Alimov, Ravil Saratov, Valikhan Koshumbayev, Gulnara Sarbagyshevna, Caspian Progressive Technology, Ltd., Helios LLP, AZS Helios LLC, JSC Helios, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Trans Commodities, Inc.. (Dannenberg, Jeffrey)
April 30, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Trans Commodities, Inc..(Dannenberg, Jeffrey)
April 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dannenberg, Jeffrey)
April 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against AZS Helios LLC, Sergei Alimov, Caspian Progressive Technology, Ltd., Helios LLP, JSC Helios, Valikhan Koshumbayev, Ravil Saratov, Gulinara Sarbagyshevna, Rashid Sarsenov, Sofia Sarsenova. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16797368)Document filed by Trans Commodities, Inc..(Dannenberg, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trans Commodities, Inc. v. Sarsenov et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Helios LLP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rashid Sarsenov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulinara Sarbagyshevna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JSC Helios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sofia Sarsenova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AZS Helios LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergei Alimov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Valikhan Koshumbayev
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ravil Saratov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caspian Progressive Technology, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gulnara Sarbagyshevna
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joint Stock Company Helios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rashid Temirbulatovich Sarsenov
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sofia Temirbulatovna Sarsenova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trans Commodities, Inc.
Represented By: Jeffrey Craig Dannenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?