Newell v. Apple Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daniel William Newell
Defendant: Apple Inc., Zackary Bloomfield and City of New York
Case Number: 1:2019cv04018
Filed: May 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lily Anne Ockert on behalf of Apple Inc.. (Ockert, Lily)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION to Stay Pending Resolution of Criminal Proceeding addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Zachary Kalmbach dated June 14, 2019. Document filed by City of New York.(Kalmbach, Zachary)
June 3, 2019 Filing 8 MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Zackary Bloomfield served on 5/22/2019, answer due 7/22/2019. Service was accepted by Zackary Bloomfield - Self. Document filed by Daniel William Newell. (aea)
May 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INFORMATION PACKAGE MAILED to Daniel William Newell 3491803878 Anna M. cross Center (AMKC) 18-18 Hazen Street East Elmhurst, NY 11370, at, on 5/14/2019 Re: #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: a copy of the order of service or order to answer and other orders entered to date, the individual practices of the district judge and magistrate judge assigned to your case, Instructions for Litigants Who Do Not Have Attorneys, Notice Regarding Privacy and Public Access to Electronic Case Files, a Motions guide, a notice that the Pro Se Manual has been discontinued, a Notice of Change of Address form to use if your contact information changes, a handout explaining matters handled by magistrate judges and consent form to complete if all parties agree to proceed for all purposes before the magistrate judge. (nb)
May 14, 2019 FRCP 4 SERVICE PACKAGE HAND DELIVERED TO U.S.M.: on 5/14/2019 Re: Judge J. Paul Oetken #6 Order of Service. The following document(s) were enclosed in the Service Package: Summons, IFP, Order of Service, Completed U.S.M. form(s) for defendant(s) Apple Inc., Zackary Bloomfield, City of New York. (nb)
May 14, 2019 SUMMONS ISSUED as to Apple Inc., Zackary Bloomfield, City of New York. (nb)
May 13, 2019 Transmission to Pro Se Assistants. Transmitted re: #6 Order of Service,, to the Pro Se Assistants for processing. (mro)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF SERVICE: The Clerk of Court is directed to mail a copy of this order to Plaintiff, together with an information package. The Clerk of Court is further instructed to complete the USM-285 forms with the addresses for Apple, Inc., Officer Bloomfield, and the City of New York, and deliver all documents necessary to effect service to the U.S. Marshals Service. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 5/13/2019) (mro)
May 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
May 13, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
May 13, 2019 Mailed a copy of #4 Order Granting IFP Application in Prisoner Case, to Daniel William Newell 3491803878 Anna M. cross Center (AMKC) 18-18 Hazen Street East Elmhurst, NY 11370. (aea)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING IFP APPLICATION IN PRISONER CASE: Plaintiff's application for leave to proceed without prepayment of fees is granted. A prisoner bringing a civil action is required to pay the full $350 filing fee even when proceeding in forma pauperis (IFP), that is, without prepayment of fees.... The Court must collect, when funds exist in a prisoner's account, an initial partial filing fee plus monthly payments. The Clerk of Court is directed to send a copy of this order and the prisoner authorization to the agency having custody of Plaintiff. That agency is directed to forward copies of Plaintiff's prison trust fund account for the past six months and to disburse the payments required under 28 U.S.C. 1915 to the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York and to include the above docket number on the disbursement before sending it to the Court. If Plaintiff is transferred to another facility, the current facility shall provide a copy of this order to the facility to which Plaintiff is transferred. The Clerk of Court is also directed to send a copy of this order to Plaintiff and note service on the docket. Finally, it is Plaintiff's obligation to promptly submit a written notification to the Court if Plaintiff's address changes, and the Court may dismiss the action if Plaintiff fails to do so. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 5/9/2019) (sac) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
May 3, 2019 Filing 3 PRISONER AUTHORIZATION. Document filed by Daniel William Newell.(rdz)
May 3, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (rdz)
May 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Apple Inc., Zackary Bloomfield, City of New York. Document filed by Daniel William Newell.(rdz)
May 3, 2019 Filing 1 REQUEST TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS. Document filed by Daniel William Newell.(rdz)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Newell v. Apple Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Apple Inc.
Represented By: Lily Anne Ockert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zackary Bloomfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of New York
Represented By: Zachary Kalmbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel William Newell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?