New York Legal Assistance Group v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Plaintiff: New York Legal Assistance Group
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Case Number: 1:2019cv04028
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/18/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 21A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 6/25/2019) (kv)
June 24, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by United States Department of Veterans Affairs.(Lee, Casey)
June 6, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: United States Department of Veterans Affairs answer due 6/24/2019. (rjm)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Casey K. Lee dated June 6, 2019. Document filed by United States Department of Veterans Affairs. Application granted. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 6/6/2019) (rjm)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald from Casey K. Lee dated June 6, 2019. Document filed by United States Department of Veterans Affairs.(Lee, Casey)
May 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Casey Kyung-Se Lee on behalf of United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Lee, Casey)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE) Summons and Complaint served. United States Department of Veterans Affairs served on 5/9/2019, answer due 6/10/2019. Service was accepted by Lisa Ahearn, Civil Clerk Supervisor. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group. (Tarantolo, Danielle)
May 10, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE) Summons and Complaint served. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group. (Tarantolo, Danielle)
May 10, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED (FOIA CASE) Summons and Complaint served. United States Department of Veterans Affairs served on 5/8/2019, answer due 6/7/2019. Service was made by MAIL. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group. (Tarantolo, Danielle)
May 8, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (dnh)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Veterans Affairs, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group. (Tarantolo, Danielle)
May 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
May 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
May 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Danielle Feldman Tarantolo to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Use the FIOA summons form not the standard AO 440 summons form. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Department of Veterans Affairs, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group. (Tarantolo, Danielle) Modified on 5/7/2019 (pc).
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Tarantolo, Danielle)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of Veterans Affairs. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16826778)Document filed by New York Legal Assistance Group.(Tarantolo, Danielle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: New York Legal Assistance Group v. United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: New York Legal Assistance Group
Represented By: Danielle Feldman Tarantolo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Veterans Affairs
Represented By: Casey Kyung-Se Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?