Gueye v. Core Car Inc. et al
Plaintiff: ARONA GUEYE
Defendant: CORE CAR INC. and VINCENZO DIMAGGIO
Case Number: 1:2019cv04033
Filed: May 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST LETTER addressed to Judge Analisa Torres from Stephen Willig dated 07/02/2019 re: Pretrial Conference. Document filed by Core Car Inc., Vincenzo DiMaggio.(Willig, Stephen)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. If all parties consent to proceed before the Magistrate Judge, counsel for Defendants shall, by July 2, 2019, email a fully executed Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form. If any party does not consent to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge, the parties must file a joint letter, by July 2, 2019, advising the Court that the parties do not consent, but without disclosing the identity of the party or parties who do not consent. The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/09/2019) (ama)
May 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference, in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, at 12:00 p.m., on July 9, 2019, in Courtroom 15D of the United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York. Principal trial counsel must appear at this and all subsequent conferences. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 7/9/2019 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/09/2019) (ama)
May 9, 2019 Filing 5 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Arona Gueye(McMahon, Gregory)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Condon McMahon on behalf of Arona Gueye. (McMahon, Gregory)
May 7, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 7, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
May 7, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
May 7, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Stephen Frederick Willig. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Albany;. (pc)
May 6, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Willig, Stephen)
May 6, 2019 Filing 2 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by CORE CAR INC., VINCENZO DIMAGGIO.(Willig, Stephen)
May 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York, County of New York. Case Number: 161630/2018. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16828708).Document filed by VINCENZO DIMAGGIO, CORE CAR INC..(Willig, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gueye v. Core Car Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARONA GUEYE
Represented By: Gregory Condon McMahon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CORE CAR INC.
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Willig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VINCENZO DIMAGGIO
Represented By: Stephen Frederick Willig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?