Jones v. Bakshiev et al

Plaintiff: CAPRI M. JONES
Defendant: EPHRAIM BAKSHIEV, MURRAY ENTERPRISES LTD. and Murray Enterprises Ltd
Case Number: 1:2019cv04064
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Ronnie Abrams
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332pi
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. 28 U.S.C. 636(c). This case is to be tried to a jury. Amended Pleadings due by 9/28/2019. Joinder of Parties due by 9/28/2019. Deposition due by 1/28/2020. Fact Discovery due by 12/28/2019. Expert Discovery due by 1/28/2020. Discovery due by 2/28/2020. Status Conference set for 1/31/2020 at 11:15 AM before Judge Ronnie Abrams. The parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is 4-5 days. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 6/28/2019) (ks)
June 28, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Ronnie Abrams: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 6/28/2019. (arc)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Sharon Beth Kaufman on behalf of Ephraim Bakshiev, Murray Enterprises Ltd. (Kaufman, Sharon)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 26(f) DISCOVERY PLAN REPORT.Document filed by Ephraim Bakshiev, Murray Enterprises Ltd.(Reiter, Lorne)
June 13, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of to court that plaintiff served with court order. Document filed by Ephraim Bakshiev, Murray Enterprises Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Reiter, Lorne)
May 20, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 26 DISCLOSURE.Document filed by Capri M. Jones.(Altman, Richard)
May 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Morris Altman on behalf of Capri M. Jones. (Altman, Richard)
May 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER AND NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 6/28/2019 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 1506, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Ronnie Abrams. (Signed by Judge Ronnie Abrams on 5/13/2019) (ks)
May 9, 2019 Filing 4 ANSWER to Complaint with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Ephraim Bakshiev, Murray Enterprises Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of service)(Reiter, Lorne)
May 9, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Ephraim Bakshiev, Murray Enterprises Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Certification of service)(Reiter, Lorne)
May 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
May 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Ronnie Abrams. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
May 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Lorne Mitchell Reiter. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Capri M. Jones; Ephraim Bakshiev; Murray Enterprises Ltd. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps;. (jgo)
May 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Lorne Mitchell Reiter. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Bronx;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.;. (jgo)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Reiter, Lorne)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 23750-19. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16833421).Document filed by MURRAY ENTERPRISES LTD., EPHRAIM BAKSHIEV. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Summons, #3 Exhibit C - demand for ad damnum, #4 Exhibit D - Response to demand for ad damnum, #5 Affidavit Cert. of Service)(Reiter, Lorne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jones v. Bakshiev et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CAPRI M. JONES
Represented By: Richard Morris Altman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPHRAIM BAKSHIEV
Represented By: Lorne Mitchell Reiter
Represented By: Sharon Beth Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MURRAY ENTERPRISES LTD.
Represented By: Lorne Mitchell Reiter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray Enterprises Ltd
Represented By: Lorne Mitchell Reiter
Represented By: Sharon Beth Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?