Grablis v. OneCoin Ltd. et al
Plaintiff: Christine Grablis
Defendant: Mark Scott, Konstantin Ignatov, Ruja Ignatova, Sebastian Greenwood, OneCoin Ltd., David Pike, Nicole J. Huesmann, Irina Andreeva Dilinska, Gilbert Armenta, The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation and The Bank of New York Mellon
Lead Plaintiff: Donald Berdeux and Donald Berdeaux
Case Number: 1:2019cv04074
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 77
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 215 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). Related Document Number: #210 ..(Enright, Donald) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 214 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). Related Document Number: #210 ..(Enright, Donald) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 6/8/2021 (dt).
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 213 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). Related Document Number: #210 ..(Enright, Donald) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 6/8/2021 (dt).
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 212 AFFIDAVIT of Donald J. Enright in Support re: #211 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief, #210 Proposed Default Judgment,. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 exhibits).(Enright, Donald)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 211 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). Related Document Number: #210 ..(Enright, Donald) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 6/8/2021 (dt).
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 210 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Enright, Donald) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #215 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief, was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Donald Enright to RE-FILE Document #211 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief,. ERROR(S): Missing one of the Parties names in Title of Document, see Proposed Judgment Doc.# 210. (dt)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. #210 Proposed Default Judgment, was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Donald Enright to RE-FILE Document #214 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief. ERROR(S): Defendant's name ONECOIN LTD.,is missing from Title of Document. (dt)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 209 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Sebastian Greenwood, issued June 7, 2021.(dt)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 208 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #204 Response to Order to Show Cause, filed by Donald Berdeux, Donald Berdeaux, Christine Grablis. ENDORSEMENT: That Plaintiffs dismissed Defendant Greenwood without prejudice does not mean that Plaintiffs were entitled to reinstate their claims against him in this action without first seeking the Court's permission to do so. "When fewer than all defendants are dismissed voluntarily,... the Court retains plenary power to reinstate those defendants until the claim has been adjudicated as to the remaining defendants." Charles Alan Wright & Arthur R. Miller, Federal Practice & Procedure 2367 (4th ed. 2021) (emphasis added). Nevertheless, the Court grants Plaintiffs' request to reinstate their claims against Defendant Greenwood, nunc pro tunc to September 25, 2020, the date of filing of Plaintiffs' Second Amended Complaint, having found that good cause exists for Plaintiffs' request. Accordingly, Plaintiffs may proceed with their application for default judgment against Defendant Greenwood. Not later than June 14, 2021, Plaintiffs must file updated versions of their Proposed Order to Show Cause, Proposed Default Judgment, and Affidavit (Dkts. 205-207) to incorporate their application for default judgment against Defendant Greenwood. SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 6/14/2021.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/07/2021) (ama)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT. Document No. #205 Proposed Default Judgment was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document No. #206 Proposed Order to Show Cause Without Emergency Relief was reviewed and approved as to form. (km)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 207 AFFIDAVIT of Donald J. Enright in Support re: #205 Proposed Default Judgment,. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(Enright, Donald)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 206 PROPOSED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WITHOUT EMERGENCY RELIEF. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). Related Document Number: #205 ..(Enright, Donald) Proposed Order to Show Cause to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 205 PROPOSED DEFAULT JUDGMENT pursuant to FRCP 55(b)(2). Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Enright, Donald) Proposed Default Judgment to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 204 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re: #198 Order to Show Cause,. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Enright, Donald)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER: granting #202 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. Counsel is reminded to heed this Court's Individual Practices mandating that requests for extension be submitted at least 48 hours in advance of the original deadline. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/19/2021) (ama)
May 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 202 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to file response to the Court's May 14, 2021 Order to Show Cause addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Donald J. Enright dated 5/19/2021. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Enright, Donald)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 201 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Gilbert Armenta, issued May 17, 2021.(dt)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 200 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Ruja Ignatova, issued May 17, 2021.(dt)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 199 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to OneCoin Ltd., issued May 17, 2021.(dt)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no later than May 19, 2021, Plaintiffs must show cause why the Court should proceed toward a default judgment against Defendant Greenwood inasmuch as Plaintiffs added him as a Defendant without seeking or obtaining the Court's permission to reinstate their claims against him. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/14/2021) (ama)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 197 DECLARATION of Donald J. Enright in Support re: #196 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. Document filed by Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(Enright, Donald)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 196 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Enright, Donald) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 195 DECLARATION of Donald J. Enright in Support re: #194 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. Document filed by Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(Enright, Donald)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 194 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Enright, Donald) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 193 DECLARATION of Donald J. Enright in Support re: #192 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. Document filed by Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(Enright, Donald)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 192 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Enright, Donald) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 191 DECLARATION of Donald J. Enright in Support re: #190 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. Document filed by Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(Enright, Donald)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 190 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Enright, Donald) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 189 DECLARATION of Donald J. Enright in Support re: #188 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. Document filed by Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Supplement).(Enright, Donald)
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 188 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Enright, Donald) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). Modified on 5/10/2021 (dt).
May 10, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT: Notice to Attorney Donald Enright. RE-FILE Document No. #188 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the proposed clerk's certificate of default lists the wrong name of the person that was personally served; the proposed clerk's certificate of default does not cite to the filing and the service of the amended complaint; Use 1 Clerk's Certificate of Default for each Defendant citing to the the action having been filed on (Date) with the filing of a summons and complaint, and then an amended complaint having been filed on (Date), (Before the complaint having been served, if that was the case) a copy of the summons and amended complaint was served on Defendant (Name), by personally (or other means) serving (Name of Person), and proof of service was therefore filed on (Date) Doc.#. Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default found under the event list Proposed Orders - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct PDF that - lists the correct filed date of the complaint, lists the correct name(s) of the party(ies)who was/were served, lists the correct date the party(ies) was/were served, lists the correct filed date of the proof of service, cites the service of the amended complaint. You can prepare your own Clerk's Certificate of default as to the format as the one on the Court's Website under forms, also see instruction with the sample Clerk's Certificate of Default. (dt)
May 8, 2021 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Donald J. Enright to RE-FILE Document #187 MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants OneCoin LTD, Ruja Ignatova, Gilbert Armenta, and Sebastian Greenwood. Use the event type Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default found under the event list Proposed Orders. NOTE: The Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default would be the main document to the filing. The supporting declaration (with exhibit) must be filed separately, using the event type: Declaration in Support (non-motion), found under the event list Other Answers. (ldi)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 187 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - MOTION for Default Judgment as to Defendants OneCoin LTD, Ruja Ignatova, Gilbert Armenta, and Sebastian Greenwood. Document filed by Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Donald J. Enright, #2 Exhibit to Affidavit of Donald J. Enright, #3 Text of Proposed Order).(Enright, Donald) Modified on 5/8/2021 (ldi).
April 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 186 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #185 Letter, filed by Donald Berdeux, Donald Berdeaux, Christine Grablis. ENDORSEMENT: Upon review of the Second Amended Complaint, the Court agrees that service of the SAC on Defendants OneCoin Ltd. and Ruja Ignatova is not necessary under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 5(a)(2). Accordingly, no later than May 10, 2021, Plaintiffs must apply for certificates of default against Defendants OneCoin Ltd. and Ruja Ignatova. Within fourteen days of receiving such certificates, Plaintiffs must apply for a default judgment against Defendant OneCoin and Defendant Ignatova, consistent with the procedures described in Attachment A to the undersigned's Individual Practices in Civil Cases. SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 5/10/2021.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/26/2021) (ama)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 185 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Donald J. Enright dated April 22, 2021 re: Dkt. 184 - Service on Certain Defendants. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Enright, Donald)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 184 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no later than May 5, 2021, Plaintiff must apply for certificates of default against Defendants Armenta and Greenwood. Within fourteen days of receiving such certificates, Plaintiff must apply for a default judgment against Defendant Armenta and Defendant Greenwood, consistent with the procedures described in Attachment A to the undersigned's Individual Practices in Civil Cases. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no later than May 5, 2021, Plaintiffs must submit an update on the status of service of the Second Amended Complaint on Defendants OneCoin Ltd. and Ruja Ignatova. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to mail a copy of this order to: (1) Defendant Armenta at Gilbert Armenta, 1460 S. Ocean Blvd. #301, Lauderdale by the Sea, FL 33062; and(2) Defendant Greenwood at Karl Sebastian Greenwood, # 76231-054, MCC New York,Metropolitan Correction Center, 150 Park Row, New York, NY 10007. SO ORDERED., ( Motions due by 5/5/2021.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/21/2021) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing.
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #184 Order, Set Deadlines/Hearings, to Defendant Armenta at Gilbert Armenta, 1460 S. Ocean Blvd. #3 01, Lauderdale by the Sea, FL 33062; and Defendant Greenwood at Karl Sebastian Greenwood, # 76231-054, MCC New York, Metropolitan Correction Center, 150 Park Row, New York, NY 10007. (dsh)
March 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 183 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #152 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Nicole J. Huesmann..(Silverman, Bradley)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 182 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #155 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Mark Scott..(Quill, Timothy)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 181 DECLARATION of Daniel S. Sinnreich in Support re: #157 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit H - Armenta Transcript).(Sinnreich, Daniel)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 180 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #157 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by The Bank of New York Mellon..(Soloway, Audra)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 179 REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #160 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by David Pike..(Raskin, Martin)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 178 ORDER granting #177 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #177 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #173 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Bradley A. Silverman dated March 5, 2021. Application GRANTED. Replies due by 3/15/2021. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 3/5/2021) (cf)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 177 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #173 Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion, addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Bradley A. Silverman dated March 5, 2021. Document filed by Nicole J. Huesmann..(Silverman, Bradley)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 176 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #175 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Counsel have represented Mr. Armenta for less than one month and have received Mr. Armenta's consent to withdraw. Mr. Armenta must obtain new counsel not later than March 17, 2021. If no counsel has entered an appearance on the record as of that date, the Court will presume Mr. Armenta to be proceeding pro se. Mr. Armenta's February 26, 2021 deadline to respond is adjourned to April 7, 2021. Mr. Krantz is instructed to provide Mr. Armenta with a copy of the Court's order. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to terminate Mr. Krantz and Mr. Sandler as attorneys of record for Defendant Gilbert Armenta. So Ordered. Attorney Larry Howard Krantz and Hugh Daniel Sandler terminated. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/17/2021) (js)
February 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Gilbert Armenta answer due 4/7/2021. (js)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 175 FIRST MOTION for Larry Krantz and Hugh Sandler to Withdraw as Attorney for Gilbert Armenta. Document filed by Gilbert Armenta..(Krantz, Larry)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 174 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #157 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Enright, Donald)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 173 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re: #155 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint., #152 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint., #160 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Enright, Donald)
January 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 172 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #171 Letter filed by Gilbert Armenta. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. Absent extenuating circumstances, the Court is highly unlikely to grant any further extensions of Mr. Armenta's time to respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. Gilbert Armenta answer due 2/26/2021. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/29/2021) (jca)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 171 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Larry H. Krantz dated January 28, 2021 re: Request for Adjournment of Deadline. Document filed by Gilbert Armenta..(Krantz, Larry)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 170 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Larry Howard Krantz on behalf of Gilbert Armenta..(Krantz, Larry)
January 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 169 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hugh Daniel Sandler on behalf of Gilbert Armenta..(Sandler, Hugh)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 MARSHAL'S PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN OF SERVICE EXECUTED. Summons and Amended Complaint, served. Service was accepted by Karl Sebastian Greenwod. Document filed by Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Donald Berdeaux. (sc)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' LETTER MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO SERVE DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN GREENWOOD: granting #162 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Letter Motion is GRANTED. This Court hereby orders as follows: Plaintiffs' request for an extension of time to serve Defendant Sebastian Greenwood is GRANTED; Plaintiffs have until January 27, 2021 to serve Defendant Sebastian Greenwood unless otherwise ordered by this Court. SO ORDERED. Service due by 1/27/2021. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 12/23/2020) (ama)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 NOTICE of Withdrawl of Dkt. 162 Letter Motion re: #162 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Sebastian Greenwood addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Donald J. Enright dated December 22, 2020., #164 Proposed Order, #163 Declaration in Support of Motion,. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Enright, Donald)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Sebastian Greenwood served on 12/23/2020, answer due 1/13/2021. Service was accepted by Sebastian Greenwood. Document filed by Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Donald Berdeaux; Donald Berdeux. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - USM 285 Service Receipt).(Enright, Donald)
December 23, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #164 Proposed Order, was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). Related Document Number: #162 ..(Enright, Donald) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 DECLARATION of Donald J. Enright in Support re: #162 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Sebastian Greenwood addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Donald J. Enright dated December 22, 2020.. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-B).(Enright, Donald)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Serve Defendant Sebastian Greenwood addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Donald J. Enright dated December 22, 2020. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Enright, Donald)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #160 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by David Pike..(Raskin, Martin)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by David Pike..(Raskin, Martin)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 DECLARATION of Daniel S. Sinnreich in Support re: #157 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint.. Document filed by The Bank of New York Mellon. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - BNY Mellon - 10K, #2 Exhibit B - OCC Interpretive Letter, #3 Exhibit C - USA v. Scott transcript 11-15-19, #4 Exhibit D - SDNY - Scott Press Release, #5 Exhibit E - BuzzFeed Article, #6 Exhibit F - FinCEN Guidance, #7 Exhibit G - USA v. Scott transcript 11-18-19).(Sinnreich, Daniel)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 158 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #157 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. . Document filed by The Bank of New York Mellon..(Soloway, Audra)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 157 MOTION to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint. Document filed by The Bank of New York Mellon..(Soloway, Audra)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #155 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Mark Scott. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mark S. Scott).(Quill, Timothy)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Mark Scott..(Quill, Timothy)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU (SEE DOCUMENT #161) - MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by David Pike..(Raskin, Martin) Modified on 12/22/2020 (ldi).
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #152 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Nicole J. Huesmann. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicole J. Huesmann).(Silverman, Bradley)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Nicole J. Huesmann..(Silverman, Bradley)
December 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU (SEE DOCUMENT #160) - NOTICE of Motion to Dismiss the Second Amended Complaint re: #125 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by David Pike..(Raskin, Martin) Modified on 12/22/2020 (ldi).
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Mailed a copy of #150 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer to Gilbert Armenta at 1460 S. Ocean Blvd. #301, Lauderdale by the Sea, FL 33062. (kh)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on NOTICE OF MOTION OF DEFENDANT GILBERT ARMENTA FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFFS SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT: granting in part #149 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED in part. Defendant Gilbert Armenta's time to respond to the Complaint is extended to February 1, 2021. Three months is ample time for Defendant to obtain counsel and respond to the Complaint. The Clerk of Court is respectfully requested to mail a copy of the Court's order to Mr. Armenta at: 1460 S. Ocean Blvd. #301, Lauderdale by the Sea, FL 33062. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/25/2020) (ama) Transmission to Docket Assistant Clerk for processing. Modified on 11/29/2020 (ama).
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Gilbert Armenta answer due 2/1/2021. (ama)
November 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 NOTICE OF MOTION OF DEFENDANT GILBERT ARMENTA FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER PLAINTIFF'S SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT, re: for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #125 Amended Complaint. Document filed by Gilbert Armenta. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit)(sc)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SERVE DEFENDANT SEBASTIAN GREENWOOD BY U.S. MARSHAL granting #145 Motion to Appoint Special Process Server. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' Letter Motion is GRANTED. This Court hereby orders as follows: (i) Plaintiffs' request to serve Defendant Sebastian Greenwood by U.S. Marshal is GRANTED. SO ORDERED on this 17th day of November, 2020. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/17/2020) (ks)
November 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #147 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). Related Document Number: #145 ..(Enright, Donald) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 DECLARATION of Donald J. Enright in Support re: #145 MOTION to Appoint Special Process Server to Serve Defendant Sebastian Greenwood.. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-C).(Enright, Donald)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MOTION to Appoint Special Process Server to Serve Defendant Sebastian Greenwood. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Enright, Donald)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Gilbert Armenta served on 11/2/2020, answer due 11/23/2020. Service was accepted by Marc Weinstein. Document filed by Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Donald Berdeaux; Donald Berdeux. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A).(Enright, Donald)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 STIPULATION TO SUBSTITUTE DEFENDANT AND AMEND COMPLAINT: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Plaintiffs and The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, through their undersigned counsel, and subject to the approval of the Court, that: Page 59 of the Complaint shall be deemed amended to reflect that Count X ("Civil Conspiracy") is asserted "Against the OneCoin Defendants and the Scott Group Defendants," and not "Against All Defendants." The Bank of New York Mellon shall be deemed substituted as a defendant in this action in place of currently named defendant The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation, and that the caption shall be changed to Donald Berdeaux and Christine Grablis, Individually and Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated v. OneCoin Ltd.; Ruja Ignatova; Sebastian Greenwood; Mark Scott; David Pike; Nicole J. Huesmann; Gilbert Armenta; and The Bank of New York Mellon. The Bank of New York Mellon, through its undersigned counsel, agrees to waive service of the Complaint, without prejudice and without waiver of any of its defenses, objections or arguments, except as to sufficiency of service of process. The Court's October 22, 2020 scheduling order shall apply to substituted defendant The Bank of New York Mellon as though it were the party named in the order instead of The Bank of New York Mellon Corporation. Accordingly, The Bank of New York Mellon'sdeadline to respond to the Complaint is December 21, 2020. To the extent The Bank of New York Mellon moves to dismiss the Complaint, Plaintiffs' response shall be due no later than February 4, 2021, and The Bank of New York Mellon's reply shall be due no later than March 8, 2021. IT IS SO ORDERED. The Bank of New York Mellon and The Bank of New York Mellon added. The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation terminated., The Bank of New York Mellon answer due 12/21/2020.( Responses due by 2/4/2021, Replies due by 3/8/2021.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/10/2020) (ama)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation..(Soloway, Audra)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Donald J. Enright dated October 26, 2020 re: Service of Process on Defendants Greenwood and Armenta. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Enright, Donald)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER: granting #139 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Defendants' time to file an Answer to the Second Amended Complaint is extended to November 9, 2020. To the extent Defendants instead intend to file motions to dismiss, the following briefing schedule shall apply: Defendants' motions to dismiss are due not later than December 21, 2020. Plaintiff's response is duenot later than February 4, 2021. Defendants may reply not later than March 8, 2021. SO ORDERED. Nicole J. Huesmann answer due 11/9/2020. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/26/2020) (ama)
October 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 12/21/2020. Responses due by 2/4/2021 Replies due by 3/8/2021. (ama)
October 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #125 Amended Complaint,, addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Bradley A. Silverman dated October 23, 2020. Document filed by Nicole J. Huesmann..(Silverman, Bradley)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 ORDER: granting #137 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. Defendant BNYM's time to respond to the Second Amended Complaint is extended to December 21, 2020. No further extensions will be granted. To the extent Defendant BNYM moves to dismiss the SAC, Plaintiffs' response shall be due not later than February 4, 2021, and Defendant BNYM's reply shall be due not later than March 8, 2021. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 10/22/2020) (ama)
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation answer due 12/21/2020. Responses due by 2/4/2021 Replies due by 3/8/2021. (ama)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Audra J. Soloway dated October 21, 2020. Document filed by The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation..(Soloway, Audra)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation..(Soloway, Audra)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Shiah Sinnreich on behalf of The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation..(Sinnreich, Daniel)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Audra Jan Soloway on behalf of The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation..(Soloway, Audra)
October 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth M. Sacksteder on behalf of The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation..(Sacksteder, Elizabeth)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sebastian Greenwood..(pc)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation..(pc)
September 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Gilbert Armenta..(pc)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation, re: #125 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Enright, Donald)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sebastian Greenwood, re: #125 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Enright, Donald)
September 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Gilbert Armenta, re: #125 Amended Complaint,,. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Enright, Donald)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER denying as moot #109 Motion to Dismiss; denying as moot #110 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants' motions to dismiss are denied as moot. No later than October 26, 2020, Defendants must either answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the Second Amended Complaint. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/28/2020) (cf)
September 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Gilbert Armenta answer due 10/26/2020; Sebastian Greenwood answer due 10/26/2020; Nicole J. Huesmann answer due 10/26/2020; Ruja Ignatova answer due 10/26/2020; OneCoin Ltd. answer due 10/26/2020; David Pike answer due 10/26/2020; Mark Scott answer due 10/26/2020; The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation answer due 10/26/2020. (cf)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #124 Amended Complaint,, #121 Amended Complaint,, #40 Amended Complaint, against Gilbert Armenta, Nicole J. Huesmann, Ruja Ignatova, OneCoin Ltd., David Pike, Mark Scott, The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation, Sebastian Greenwood with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux. Related document: #124 Amended Complaint,, #121 Amended Complaint,, #40 Amended Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline_First Amended Complaint to Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Court Order Granting Refiling).(Enright, Donald)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Donald J. Enright to RE-FILE Document No. #124 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; Sebastian Greenwood was previously terminated, if an active party they must be added to the docket again. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #121 Amended Complaint,, #40 Amended Complaint against Sebastian Greenwood, Nicole J. Huesmann, Ruja Ignatova, OneCoin Ltd., David Pike, Mark Scott, Gilbert Armenta, The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux. Related document: #121 Amended Complaint, #40 Amended Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Redline_First Amended Complaint to Second Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Court Order Granting Refiling).(Enright, Donald) Modified on 9/25/2020 (sj).
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #122 Letter, filed by Donald Berdeux, Donald Berdeaux, Christine Grablis. ENDORSEMENT: Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/25/2020) (rro)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Donald J. Enright dated September 24, 2020 re: Dkt. 121 Second Amended Complaint Deficient Filing. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Enright, Donald)
September 24, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Donald J. Enright to RE-FILE re: Document No. #121 Amended Complaint,,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF; the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected; The amended complaint was filed incorrectly on the due date. Permission from Chambers will be needed to refile the Amended Complaint. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents.. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (pc)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #40 Amended Complaint, against Sebastian Greenwood, Nicole J. Huesmann, Ruja Ignatova, OneCoin Ltd., David Pike, Mark Scott with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux. Related document: #40 Amended Complaint,. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Redlined version between the First Amended Complaint and the Second Amended Complaint).(Enright, Donald) Modified on 9/24/2020 (pc).
September 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #119 Letter, filed by Donald Berdeux, Donald Berdeaux, Christine Grablis. ENDORSEMENT: Not later than the September 23, 2020 deadline, Plaintiffs may either file a Second Amended Complaint or oppose Defendants' motions to dismiss; Plaintiffs may not do both. (Amended Pleadings due by 9/23/2020., Responses due by 9/23/2020) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/18/2020) (cf)
September 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 119 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Donald J. Enright dated 09/16/2020 re: Clarification requested regarding leave to file Second Amended Complaint and responding to Motions to Dismiss. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Enright, Donald)
August 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the Parties and/or their respective counsel as follows: Plaintiffs hereby agree that the above-captioned action is dismissed and discontinued without prejudice solely as to defendant Konstantin Ignatov pursuant to Rule 41(a) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure; This Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal is not intended to, and shall not have, any effect on any claims asserted by any other parties to this litigation, or the defenses to those claims; Konstantin Ignatov will make himself available to Plaintiffs' counsel as expediently as possible to be debriefed and will truthfully and fully provide information and documentation to the best of his abilities concerning the subject matter of Plaintiffs' claims, OneCoin, and the remaining defendants in this case; The United States Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York shall be notified in advance by Plaintiffs' counsel of any such debriefing and have the right and ability to participate and attend; If called upon, Mr. Ignatov will agree to testify on behalf of Plaintiffs at a trial or other court proceeding without invoking his Fifth Amendment protections as they apply to facts already acknowledged in United States v. Scott, et al., 17 CR 630 (SDNY) (ER) upon the conclusion of his cooperation with the U.S. Attorney's Office for the Southern District of New York, or upon their approval, whichever occurs first; The Parties agree to toll any applicable statute of limitations and/or statute of repose during the pendency of this arrangement; If Konstantin Ignatov makes good faith efforts to provide complete and accurate information and documentation to the best of his abilities and otherwise complies with the terms set forth herein, this stipulation of discontinuance shall be construed as a dismissal with prejudice in full satisfaction of Plaintiffs' claims, which are the subject of the Amended Complaint, upon judgment, settlement, or other resolution of the above-captioned action; This Stipulation and any Order entered thereon shall have no precedential value or effect whatsoever and shall not be admissible in any other action or proceeding as evidence or for any other purpose except in an action or proceeding to enforce this Stipulation; So Ordered. (Konstantin Ignatov terminated.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/20/20) (yv)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #117 Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Valerie E. Caproni for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice against the defendant(s) All Parties and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Enright, Donald)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 ORDER granting in part #114 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #114 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #110 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint., #109 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint, #107 Notice (Other), #111 Memor. Application GRANTED in part. Plaintiffs' deadline to respond to the motions to dismiss is extended to September 23, 2020; replies are due October 14, 2020. Plaintiffs' request for jurisdictional discovery is denied without prejudice. Their request is premature. They may renew their request in their opposition to the motions to dismiss. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 9/23/2020 Replies due by 10/14/2020. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/27/2020) (ama)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Timothy J. Quill, Jr. dated July 24, 2020 re: #114 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #110 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint., #109 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint., #107 Notice (Other), #111 Memor . Document filed by Mark Scott..(Quill, Timothy)
July 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #110 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint., #109 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint., #107 Notice (Other), #111 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion, #108 MOTION to Dismiss . addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Donald J. Enright dated July 22, 2020. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order).(Enright, Donald)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER granting #112 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application Granted. So Ordered. Konstantin Ignatov answer due 8/6/2020. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/14/2020) (js)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 8/6/2020. Responses due by 9/23/2020 Replies due by 10/14/2020. (js)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Jeffrey Lichtman, Esq. dated July 13, 2020. Document filed by Konstantin Ignatov..(Lichtman, Jeffrey)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 111 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #110 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint. . Document filed by Mark Scott..(Brown, Kevin)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 110 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Mark Scott..(Brown, Kevin)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 109 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Class Action Complaint. Document filed by Nicole J. Huesmann. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of Nicole J. Huesmann).(Silverman, Bradley)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 108 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by David Pike..(Raskin, Martin)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 107 NOTICE of of Motion to Dismiss Complaint Pursuant to Fed. R. CIV. PROC. 12 (B)(2) and 12 (B)(6) re: #40 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by David Pike..(Raskin, Martin)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 ORDER granting #105 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #40 Amended Complaint. Application GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Konstantin Ignatov answer due 7/16/2020.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/19/2020) (rro)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 105 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Jeffrey Lichtman, Esq. dated June 19, 2020. Document filed by Konstantin Ignatov..(Lichtman, Jeffrey)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 7/16/2020. Responses due by 9/2/2020 Replies due by 9/23/2020. (rro)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 104 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #103 Letter filed by Mark Scott. ENDORSEMENT: The parties' proposed briefing schedule is ADOPTED. SO ORDERED. Nicole J. Huesmann answer due 6/25/2020; Konstantin Ignatov answer due 6/25/2020; David Pike answer due 6/25/2020; Mark Scott answer due 6/25/2020. (Motions due by 6/25/2020., Responses due by 8/12/2020, Replies due by 9/2/2020.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/8/2020) (jca)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Timothy J. Quill, Jr. dated May 8, 2020 re: Proposed Schedule for Defendants to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to the Amended Complaint. Document filed by Mark Scott..(Quill, Timothy)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Valerie E. Caproni: Telephone Conference held on 5/1/2020. (anc)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the stay on this case is lifted. No later than May 8, 2020, the parties must jointly submit a proposed schedule for Defendants to answer, move to dismiss, or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 5/01/2020) (ama)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Case Stay Lifted. (ama)
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #100 Motion for Donald James Enright to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/30/2020) (ama)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 100 MOTION for Donald James Enright to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19635157. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Text of Proposed Order).(Enright, Donald)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #100 MOTION for Donald James Enright to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-19635157. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 99 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #98 Letter filed by Donald Berdeaux. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Court will proceed with the conference scheduled May 1, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. Dial-in: (888) 363-4749 // Access code: 3121171# //Security code: 4074#. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/28/2020) (ama)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 98 JOINT LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Adam M. Apton dated April 27, 2020 re: Joint Status Report / Telephonic Conference. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux..(Apton, Adam)
April 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 96 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Steven G. Mintz dated 04/19/2020 re: #95 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #49 Memo Endorsement, #46 Order Staying Case,,,, addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Adam M. Apton dated April 16, 2020. . Document filed by Mark Scott..(Brown, Kevin)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER granting #95 Letter Motion for Conference. WHEREAS on August 23, 2019, the Court stayed this proceeding until all Defendants have been served and ordered that "[o]nce all Defendants have been served and Lead Plaintiff has posted proof of such service on ECF, Lead Plaintiff must so notify the Court by letter, which anticipates scheduling a conference to discuss next steps" (Dkt. 46); WHEREAS on April 10, 2020, the Court ordered Lead Plaintiff to show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute (Dkt. 91); WHEREAS Lead Plaintiff has shown cause why this case should continue and has served all remaining Defendants; IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a teleconference to discuss next steps is tentatively scheduled for May 1, 2020, at 11:00 a.m. (Dial-in: (888) 363-4749 // Access code: 3121171# // Security code: 4074#). The parties must submit a joint letter no later than April 27, 2020, proposing next steps and stating whether they believe a teleconference is necessary at all. In this joint letter, Defendants must state whether they object to lifting the stay on this case and why. So Ordered. Telephone Conference set for 5/1/2020 at 11:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/17/2020) (js)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 95 LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #49 Memo Endorsement, #46 Order Staying Case,,,, addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Adam M. Apton dated April 16, 2020. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Apton, Adam)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Adam M. Apton to RE-FILE Document #94 LETTER MOTION to Reopen Case and Schedule Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Adam M. Apton dated April 16, 2020. Use the event type Conference found under the event list Motion (Letter). (db)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION to Reopen Case and Schedule Conference addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Adam M. Apton dated April 16, 2020. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Apton, Adam) Modified on 4/17/2020 (db).
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 DECLARATION of Adam M. Apton re: #92 Response . Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit).(Apton, Adam)
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 92 RESPONSE re: #91 Memorandum & Opinion, . Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Apton, Adam)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 91 MEMORANDUM AND OPINION AND ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Lead Plaintiff must show cause no later than April 16, 2020, why this case should not be dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b). Lead Plaintiff is sternly warned that failing to comply with the Court's orders going forward could result in sanctions. So Ordered (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 4/10/2020) (js)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 90 PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANTS SEBASTIAN GREENWOOD AND IRINA ANDREEVA DILINSKA: Lead Plaintiff Donald Berdeaux ("Berdeaux") and Plaintiff Christine Grablis ("Grablis" and together with Berdeaux, "Plaintiffs"), by and through their undersigned counsel and pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i), hereby give notice that this action shall be, and is, DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE only as between Plaintiffs and Defendants Sebastian Greenwood ("Greenwood") and Irina Andreeva Dilinska ("Dilinska"). (As further set forth in this Order.) Irina Andreeva Dilinska and Sebastian Greenwood terminated. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/28/2020) (cf)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) Irina Andreeva Dilinska, Sebastian Greenwood. Document filed by Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Donald Berdeaux. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers)...(Apton, Adam)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL Document No. #89 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal was reviewed and referred to Judge Valerie E. Caproni for approval for the following reason(s): the plaintiff(s) filed their voluntary dismissal and it did not dismiss all of the parties or the action in its entirety. (km)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 STATUS REPORT. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit).(Apton, Adam)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 87 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #84 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. ENDORSEMENT: IT IS SO ORDERED. Attorney William Fields terminated. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 2/3/2020) (mro)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 86 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from William J. Fields dated 1/31/2020 re: Withdrawal. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit).(Fields, William)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 PROPOSED ORDER FOR WITHDRAWAL OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). Related Document Number: #84 . (Fields, William)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 MOTION for William J. Fields to Withdraw as Attorney . Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated)..(Fields, William)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 83 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Timothy Joseph Quill, Jr on behalf of Mark Scott. (Quill, Timothy)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 82 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven Glen Mintz on behalf of Mark Scott. (Mintz, Steven)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 81 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kevin Michael Brown on behalf of Mark Scott. (Brown, Kevin)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 STIPULATION AND ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL: Notice is hereby given that, subject to approval of the court, Mark Scott substitutes the law firm of Mintz & Gold LLP, and its attorney Steven G. Mintz, as counsel of record in place of the law firm Binder & Schwartz LLP, and its attorneys Wendy H. Schwartz and Lindsay A. Bush. The substitution ofcounsel is hereby approved and is SO ORDERED., Attorney Lindsay A. Bush and Wendy Helene Schwartz terminated. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/28/2020) (ama)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 PROPOSED ORDER FOR SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY. Document filed by Mark Scott. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit /Declaration of Wendy H. Schwartz) (Schwartz, Wendy)
January 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MEMORANDUM OPINION & ORDER: re: #71 MOTION for Service by Publication filed by Donald Berdeux, Donald Berdeaux, Christine Grablis. For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion for alternative service is GRANTED in part. Plaintiffs may effect service upon Defendants OneCoin and Ignatova using the means proposedin Plaintiffs' motion papers. Plaintiffs must notify the Court in writing whether they received a sender-return error for Ignatova. Service of Ignatova will not be considered proper unless no such error is received. Similarly, if International Registered Mail allows tracking of the package, Plaintiffs must post proof of delivery to ECF once it has been effected. Plaintiffs' motion for leave to use alternative means of service against Dilinska and Greenwood is DENIED without prejudice. The Clerk is respectfully directed to terminate the open motion at Dkt. 71. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 1/24/2020) (ama)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Adam M. Apton on behalf of Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Apton, Adam)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from William J. Fields dated 1/2/2020 re: Service of Defendants. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated).(Fields, William)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 75 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from William J. Fields dated 12/3/2019 re: Proposed Order. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Fields, William)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 74 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). Related Document Number: #71 . (Fields, William) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 73 DECLARATION of John Carriel in Support re: #71 MOTION for Service by Publication .. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Fields, William)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 72 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #71 MOTION for Service by Publication . . Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Fields, William)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 71 MOTION for Service by Publication . Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated).(Fields, William)
December 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 70 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from William J. Fields dated 12/2/2019 re: Service of Defendants. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated).(Fields, William)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE: granting #67 Motion for Bradley A. Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/26/2019) (js)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 68 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Bradley A. Silverman, Esq. dated November 25, 2019 re: Proposed Order For Admission Pro Hac Vice. Document filed by Nicole J. Huesmann. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice)(Silverman, Bradley)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 67 MOTION for Bradley A. Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18141452. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Nicole J. Huesmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Florida Supreme Court, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Silverman, Bradley)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #67 MOTION for Bradley A. Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-18141452. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (aea)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER denying without prejudice #59 Motion for Service by Publication: For the foregoing reasons, Plaintiffs' motion for alternative service is DENIED without prejudice. The Clerk is respectfully directed to terminate the open motion at Dkt. 59. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 11/1/2019) (jwh)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 65 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from William J. Fields dated 11/1/2019 re: Service of Defendants. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated).(Fields, William)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 64 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Bradley A Silverman on behalf of Nicole J. Huesmann. (Silverman, Bradley)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 63 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Bradley A. Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Nicole J. Huesmann. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit in Support of Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice, #2 Exhibit Florida Bar Certificate of Good Standing)(Silverman, Bradley) Modified on 11/1/2019 (aea).
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #63 MOTION for Bradley A. Silverman to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Florida Supreme Court; Re-file the motion as a Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order. (aea)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from William J. Fields dated 10/1/2019 re: Status of Service. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated).(Fields, William)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 61 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). Related Document Number: #59 . (Fields, William) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #59 MOTION for Service by Publication . . Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Fields, William)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 59 MOTION for Service by Publication . Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated).(Fields, William)
October 1, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #61 Proposed Order, was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER denying as moot #55 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application DENIED AS MOOT. All proceedings in this case have been stayed per the Court's Order on August 23, 2019 (Dkt. 46). Mr. Pike's answer is not due until further order by this Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 9/26/2019) (ama)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 57 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. Nicole J. Huesmann served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. Service was accepted by Nicole Huesmann. Document filed by Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Donald Berdeaux; Donald Berdeux. (Fields, William)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 56 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Amended Complaint,. David Pike served on 9/9/2019, answer due 9/30/2019. Service was accepted by Maria Palacio. Document filed by Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated); Donald Berdeaux; Donald Berdeux. (Fields, William)
September 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 55 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Martin R. Raskin dated September 25, 2019. Document filed by David Pike.(Raskin, Martin)
September 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ELECTRONIC AMENDED SUMMONS ISSUED as to Nicole J. Huesmann. (jgo)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 53 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF AMENDED SUMMONS as to Nicole J. Huesmann, re: #40 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Fields, William)
September 4, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney William Fields to RE-FILE Document No. #52 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong event type was used to file the request for issuance of summons; summons previously issued to party. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of AMENDED Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Nicole J. Huesmann, re: #40 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Fields, William) Modified on 9/4/2019 (pne).
September 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 51 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from William J. Fields dated 09/03/2019 re: Service of Defendants. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated).(Fields, William)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 50 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Irina Andreeva Dilinska, Nicole J. Huesmann, David Pike. (pc)
August 26, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney William Fields. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Nicole Huesmann. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (pc)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 49 MEMO ENDORSEMENT: on re: #47 Letter filed by Donald Berdeux, Donald Berdeaux, Christine Grablis. ENDORSEMENT: Starting on September 3, 2019, Lead Plaintiff must file a letter on the first business day of each month updating the Court on his efforts to effect service on all Defendants who have not been served. Lead Counsel is warned against missing these deadlines and must be diligent in effecting service. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/23/2019) (ama)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 48 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Irina Andreeva Dilinska; David Pike; Nicole J. Huesmann, re: #40 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Fields, William)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 47 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from William J. Fields dated 08/23/2019 re: Service of Defendants. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated).(Fields, William)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no later than 5:00 P.M. on August 23, 2019, Lead Plaintiff must file a letter stating the status of service on Defendants OneCoin Ltd., Ruja Ignatova, and Sebastian Greenwood. If Plaintiff has served these Defendants, he mustby the same deadlinefile on ECF proof of such service. If Plaintiff has not served these Defendants, he must show cause why those Defendants should not be dismissed for failure to serve under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, for the reasons discussed at the conference, all proceedings in this case are STAYED until all Defendants (except those dismissed pursuant to the above paragraph) have been served. Once all Defendants have been served and Lead Plaintiff has posted proof of such service on ECF, Lead Plaintiff must so notify the Court by letter, which anticipates scheduling a conference to discuss next steps. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to flag this case as stayed. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/23/2019) (kv)
August 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Valerie E. Caproni: Status Conference held on 8/23/2019. (anc)
August 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 45 MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re: #44 Response in Opposition to Motion,, filed by Donald Berdeux, Donald Berdeaux, Christine Grablis. ENDORSEMENT: The parties must appear for a conference on Defendant Scott's request for a stay on August 23, 2019 at 10:00 A.M. The conference will be in Room 443 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York 10007. SO ORDERED. (Status Conference set for 8/23/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/15/19) (yv)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 44 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from William J. Fields dated 8/14/2019 re: #41 LETTER MOTION for Conference Regarding Mr. Scott's Request for a Stay Pending Criminal Trial addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Wendy H. Schwartz dated August 8, 2019. . Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux, Christine Grablis(Individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated), Christine Grablis(individually and on behalf of all others similarly situated). (Fields, William)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 43 LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Jeffrey Lichtman, Esq. dated August 13, 2019 re: #41 LETTER MOTION for Conference Regarding Mr. Scott's Request for a Stay Pending Criminal Trial addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Wendy H. Schwartz dated August 8, 2019. . Document filed by Konstantin Ignatov. (Lichtman, Jeffrey)
August 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER with respect to #41 Letter Motion for Conference. No later than August 14, 2019, Lead Plaintiff and my defendant who has appeared must respond to this motion. So Ordered. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 8/8/2019) (js)
August 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 41 LETTER MOTION for Conference Regarding Mr. Scott's Request for a Stay Pending Criminal Trial addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Wendy H. Schwartz dated August 8, 2019. Document filed by Mark Scott.(Schwartz, Wendy)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney William Fields. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Irina Andreeva Dilinska, Christine Grablis. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text contained a typographical error. (pne)
August 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 40 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Sebastian Greenwood, Konstantin Ignatov, Ruja Ignatova, OneCoin Ltd., Mark Scott, IRINA ANDREEVA DILINSKA, David Pike, Nicole Huesmann with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Christine Grablis(Individually), Donald Berdeaux. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Fields, William)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER GRANTING LEAD PLAINTIFF DONALD BERDEAUX'S MOTION FOR APPROVAL OF SELECTION OF CO-LEAD COUNSEL granting #32 Motion to Appoint Counsel. No later than August 2, 2019, Lead Plaintiff must file an Amended Complaint with a caption amended to reflect the Court's selection of him as Lead Plaintiff, along with any further amendments which Lead Plaintiff may wish to make. Defendants must Answer or otherwise respond to the Amended Complaint no later than September 6, 2019. To the extent it is possible for Defendants to consolidate their briefing, they are encouraged to do so. If Defendants move to dismiss the Amended Complaint, Lead Plaintiff must file either a Second Amended Complaint or an opposition to the motion(s) to dismiss, see Fed. R. Civ. P. 15(a)(1)(B); Individual Practices in Civil Cases 4(E)(i), no later than October 4, 2019. If Lead Plaintiff opposes the motion to dismiss, Defendants must file any repl(ies) in support of their motion(s) no later than October 18, 2019. All discovery will be stayed pending resolution of any motion to dismiss. If Defendants answer the Amended Complaint, counsel for all parties must appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC"), see Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, on September 20, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the open motion at Dkt. 32. ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that Lead Plaintiff Berdeaux's Motion for Approval of Selection of Co-Lead Counsel is GRANTED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/23/2019) (ne)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Benson Einhorn on behalf of Konstantin Ignatov. (Einhorn, Jeffrey)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeffrey Harris Lichtman on behalf of Konstantin Ignatov. (Lichtman, Jeffrey)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: (Amended Pleadings due by 10/4/2019., Responses due by 10/4/2019, Replies due by 10/18/2019.) Set/Reset Hearings: (Initial Conference set for 9/20/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni.) (ne)
July 23, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #35 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 36 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Konstantin Ignatov served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. Service was accepted by Konstantin Ignatov. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux. (Fields, William)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux. Related Document Number: #31 . (Fields, William) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 34 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from William J. Fields dated 7/22/2019 re: Proposed Order. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux.(Fields, William)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #32 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . . Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux. (Fields, William)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MOTION to Appoint Counsel . Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux.(Fields, William)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 31 BRIEF re: #30 Order,,, . Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Donald Berdeux.(Fields, William)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no later than July 26, 2019, Lead Plaintiff Berdeaux must show cause why this case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute because, having moved the Court to be appointed Lead Plaintiff on the assurance that, among other things, he would "supervise counsel and actively oversee the prosecution of the action for the benefit of the [putative] Class by, among other things, reviewing pleadings, instructing counsel and/or attending hearings, as necessary," Dkt. 22 ex. 3 Paragraph 9, he has nonetheless failed to comply with a court-ordered deadline for fulfilling an essential preliminary step-the appointment of lead counsel-in this litigation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/22/2019) (ama)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER: granting in part and denying in part #21 Motion to Appoint DONALD BERDEAUX as Lead Plaintiff(s). IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the joint motion for appointment as co-lead plaintiffs and for approval of co-lead counsel [Dkts. 21-23] is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Movant Berdeaux is appointed as the sole Lead Plaintiff of this action under 15 U.S.C 78u-4(a)(3)(B)(i) and (iii). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that all further submissions in this case must use theamended caption featured at the top of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that no later than July 19, 2019, Lead Plaintiff Berdeaux must file a motion for the approval of Lead Counsel under 15 U.S.C 78u-4(a)(3)(B)(v). If Lead Plaintiff Berdeaux continues to prefer that both Levi & Korsinsky LLP and Silver Miller be approved as co-Lead Counsel, his motion must explain why the retention of two law firms is appropriate and necessary to adequately represent the putative class. The Court notes that it does not, at this juncture, see any reason to doubt that either firm is qualified or generally able to conduct the litigation. Nor is the Court categorically opposed to the appointment of co-lead counsel. It is, however, keen on avoiding duplicative work in litigating this case, particularly as it bears on the approval of any class-wide settlement that provides for attorneys' fees, costs, and expenses. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to (1) close the open motion at Dkt. 21; (2) designate Donald Berdeaux as "Lead Plaintiff" on the docket; (3) and permit the filing of future documents in this case under the amended caption featured at the top of this order. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/11/2019) (ama) Modified on 7/11/2019 (ama).
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 7/19/2019. (ama)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Christine Grablis. Related Document Number: #21 . (Fields, William) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 27 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from William J. Fields dated 7/10/2019 re: Proposed Order. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Christine Grablis.(Fields, William)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Christine Grablis. (Attachments: #1 Letter to the Court) Related Document Number: #21 . (Fields, William) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 7/10/2019 (km).
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 AFFIDAVIT of David C. Silver in Support re: #21 MOTION to Appoint Christine Grablis, Donald Berdeaux to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Christine Grablis. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Donald Berdeaux)(Fields, William)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED ORDER. Notice to attorney William Fields to RE-FILE Document No. #26 Proposed Order. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): The order and the letter need to be filed as separate entries. (km)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO COURT REGARDING PROPOSED ORDER. Document No. #28 Proposed Order was reviewed and approved as to form. (dt)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that no later than 5:00 P.M. on July 10, 2019, Movant Berdeaux must submit an affidavit, signed either by him or by his attorney, specifying and explaining the approximate amount of the losses he allegedly suffered, if any, as a result of Defendants' alleged misconduct. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/09/2019) (ama)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PROPOSED ORDER. Notice to attorney William Fields to RE-FILE Document No. #23 Proposed Order. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the proposed order is not correct; Re-file the document using the event type Proposed Order found under the event list Proposed Orders. - select the correct filer/filers - attach the correct signed (scanned signature image) and dated PDF, then separately file the Letter under Other Documents as a Letter. (dt)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Christine Grablis. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) Related Document Number: #21 . (Fields, William) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 7/9/2019 (dt).
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 DECLARATION of William J. Fields in Support re: #21 MOTION to Appoint Christine Grablis, Donald Berdeaux to serve as lead plaintiff(s) .. Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Christine Grablis. (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Certification, #3 Joint Declaration, #4 PSLRA Notice, #5 Firm Resume, #6 Firm Resume)(Fields, William)
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION to Appoint Christine Grablis, Donald Berdeaux to serve as lead plaintiff(s) . Document filed by Donald Berdeaux, Christine Grablis. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law)(Fields, William) Modified on 9/10/2019 (ldi).
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by William Fields on behalf of Christine Grablis, Donald Berdeaux. (Fields, William)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time for all Defendants to answer, move, or otherwise respond is stayed until (1) lead plaintiff/s are appointed and (2) either (a) an Amended Complaint is filed or (b) the time for filing such an Amended Complaint has expired. Absent further order of this Court, after both of the above conditions are satisfied, Defendants' time to answer, move, or otherwise respond will be governed by Fed. R. Civ. P. 12. The Clerk is respectfully directed to terminate the open motion at Dkt. 17. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/26/2019) (ama)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Lindsay A. Bush on behalf of Mark Scott. (Bush, Lindsay)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 LETTER addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Wendy H. Schwartz dated June 25, 2019 re: Extension of time to answer, move or otherwise respond to Complaint. Document filed by Mark Scott.(Schwartz, Wendy)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Wendy Helene Schwartz on behalf of Mark Scott. (Schwartz, Wendy)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Mark Scott served on 6/4/2019, answer due 6/25/2019. Service was accepted by Mark Scott, Defendant. Document filed by Christine Grablis. (Braunstein, Michael)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Braunstein, Michael)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Sebastian Greenwood. (jgo)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ruja Ignatova. (jgo)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to OneCoin Ltd.. (jgo)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark Scott. (jgo)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Konstantin Ignatov. (jgo)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Louis Braunstein. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Christine Grablis; Ruja Ignatova; Konstantin Ignatov; Sebastian Greenwood; Mark Scott. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Michael Louis Braunstein to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Citizenship Plaintiff and Citizenship Defendant codes must only be selected when Diversity Jurisdiction code is selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Michael Louis Braunstein. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1331; Dollar Demand $4000000000; County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 15:77; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $9999000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of of Filing Certification of Representative Plaintiff pursuant to Federal Securities Laws re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christine Grablis. (Braunstein, Michael)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark Scott, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christine Grablis. (Braunstein, Michael)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Sebastian Greenwood, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christine Grablis. (Braunstein, Michael)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Konstantin Ignatov, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christine Grablis. (Braunstein, Michael)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ruja Ignatova, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christine Grablis. (Braunstein, Michael)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to OneCoin Ltd., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Christine Grablis. (Braunstein, Michael)
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Braunstein, Michael) Modified on 5/8/2019 (jgo).
May 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Sebastian Greenwood, Konstantin Ignatov, Ruja Ignatova, OneCoin Ltd., Mark Scott. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16834011)Document filed by Christine Grablis.(Braunstein, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grablis v. OneCoin Ltd. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Scott
Represented By: Lindsay A. Bush
Represented By: Wendy Helene Schwartz
Represented By: Steven Glen Mintz
Represented By: Timothy Joseph Quill, Jr.,
Represented By: Kevin Michael Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Konstantin Ignatov
Represented By: Jeffrey Harris Lichtman
Represented By: Jeffrey Benson Einhorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ruja Ignatova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sebastian Greenwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneCoin Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Pike
Represented By: Martin R. Raskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nicole J. Huesmann
Represented By: Bradley A Silverman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Irina Andreeva Dilinska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gilbert Armenta
Represented By: Hugh Daniel Sandler
Represented By: Larry Howard Krantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank Of New York Mellon Corporation
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Sacksteder
Represented By: Daniel Shiah Sinnreich
Represented By: Audra Jan Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Bank of New York Mellon
Represented By: Elizabeth M. Sacksteder
Represented By: Daniel Shiah Sinnreich
Represented By: Audra Jan Soloway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Grablis
Represented By: Michael Louis Braunstein
Represented By: William Fields
Represented By: Adam M. Apton
Represented By: Donald J. Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Lead plaintiff: Donald Berdeux
Represented By: William Fields
Represented By: Donald J. Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Lead plaintiff: Donald Berdeaux
Represented By: William Fields
Represented By: Adam M. Apton
Represented By: Donald J. Enright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?