City of New York v. Travelers Indemnity Company

Plaintiff: The City of New York and City of New York
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv04083
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332in
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 3, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STIPULATION: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between Eric Proshansky, of the New York City Law Department, counsel for Plaintiffs, The City of New York (the "City") and Central Park Conservancy, Inc. ("CPC") (collectively "Plaintiffs"), and Meg R. Reid of Keane and Associates, attorneys for Defendants, Travelers Indemnity Company and Travelers Property Casualty Company of America (collectively "Travelers") as follows: 1. Travelers is defending the City subject to a complete reservation of rights related to the Jamika Thompson v. City of New York, et al., Order to Show Cause (the "Thompson Action"). Travelers is defending the City in the following underlying matters: Jason Callahan and Norman Callahan v. The City of New York, Supreme Court of the State of New York, New York County, Index No. 162923/2015 (the "Callahan Action"); and Elizabeth Allen and Darkus Allen v. Mingyang Ling, et al., Supreme Court of the State of New York, Kings County, Index No. 503952/2018, Third-Party Index No. 503952/18 (the "Allen Action"). Plaintiffs further stipulate and agree to withdraw without prejudice all claims as to the Thompson Action, the Allen Action and/or the Callahan Action. (as further set forth in this Order). Plaintiffs and Travelers hereby stipulate and agree to the following briefing schedule, subject to the approval of the Court: a. Plaintiffs' Motion(s) for Summary Judgment filed by July 31, 2019; b. Travelers' Opposition and Cross Motion(s) for Summary Judgment filed by September 2, 2019; c. Plaintiffs' Reply and Opposition to Cross Motion(s) by October 2, 2019; and d. Travelers' Reply to Opposition to Cross Motion(s) by October 16, 2019. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 9/2/2019., Responses due by 10/2/2019, Replies due by 10/16/2019.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/2/2019) (kv)
July 1, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Motions due by 7/31/2019. Responses due by 10/2/2019, Replies due by 10/16/2019. (jca)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting [15 in 19cv2125 AJN] LETTER MOTION for Conference re: #5 Order for Initial Pretrial Conference (Proposal To Expedite). The parties are encouraged to commence discovery on the proposed expedited timeline. The joint letter the parties file on July 19, 2019 shall provide a status update to the Court concerning the parties' progress on discovery and intention to file the proposed stipulation. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/1/2019) (jca)
May 30, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Travelers Indemnity Company.(Reid, Meg)
May 30, 2019 Filing 10 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Travelers Property Casualty Corp., Corporate Parent The Travelers Companies, Inc., Corporate Parent Travelers Insurance Group Holdings, Inc. for Travelers Indemnity Company. Document filed by Travelers Indemnity Company.(Reid, Meg)
May 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: These cases have been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, July 26, 2019 at 3:15 p.m. in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) Initial Conference set for 7/26/2019 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 5/21/2019) (kv)
May 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
May 15, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
May 15, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-02125-AJN. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
May 10, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Travelers Indemnity Company served on 5/9/2019, answer due 5/30/2019. Service was accepted by Office of General Counsel of New York State Department of Financial Services, for Superintendent Linda Lacewell, on behalf of defendant Travelers Indemnity Company. Document filed by City of New York. (Mishra, Anjan)
May 8, 2019 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Mishra, Anjan)
May 8, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Travelers Indemnity Company. (jgo)
May 8, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Alison J. Nathan as possibly related to 19-cv-2125. (jgo)
May 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
May 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (jgo)
May 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Anjan Mishra. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: City of New York. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error;. (jgo)
May 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Anjan Mishra. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Fee Status code due (due);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
May 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Anjan Mishra to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the first listed related case number on the PDF is incorrect; Citizenship Defendant code - multiple selections;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
May 7, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Proshansky on behalf of The City of New York. (Proshansky, Eric)
May 7, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Travelers Indemnity Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by The City of New York. (Mishra, Anjan)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Anjan Mishra re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-2125, 19-cv-2746. Document filed by The City of New York.(Mishra, Anjan)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Mishra, Anjan) Modified on 5/8/2019 (jgo).
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Travelers Indemnity Company. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16835856)Document filed by The City of New York.(Mishra, Anjan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: City of New York v. Travelers Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Indemnity Company
Represented By: Meg R. Reid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The City of New York
Represented By: Eric Proshansky
Represented By: Anjan Mishra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: City of New York
Represented By: Eric Proshansky
Represented By: Anjan Mishra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?