Starr Indemnity and Liability Company v. Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. et al
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity and Liability Company as subrogee of Tasman Industries, Inc. and Starr Indemnity and Liability Company
Defendant: Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. and M.V. MSC ASYA
Case Number: 1:2019cv04088
Filed: May 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333mc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, September 6, 2019 at 3:15pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/6/2019 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/12/2019) (kv)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint. Document filed by Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A..(Pallas, William)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A..(Pallas, William)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO ANSWER, MOVE, OR OTHERWISEAPPEAR: IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED by and between the undersigned attorneys for the Plaintiff and the attorneys for Defendant, that the time within which the Defendant may answer, move, or otherwise appear, is hereby extended up to and including June 10, 2019. SO ORDERED. M.V. MSC ASYA answer due 6/10/2019; Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. answer due 6/10/2019. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/5/2019) (jca)
May 31, 2019 Filing 5 PROPOSED STIPULATION AND ORDER. Document filed by Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (Pallas, William)
May 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Edward C. Radzik. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Starr Indemnity and Liability Company as subrogee of Tasman Industries, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (pc)
May 8, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to M.V. MSC ASYA, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (pc)
May 8, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 8, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
May 8, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
May 8, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Edward C. Radzik. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand blank;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $18,000;. (pc)
May 7, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Starr Indemnity and Liability Company, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Starr Indemnity and Liability Company as subrogee of Tasman Industries, Inc.. (Radzik, Edward)
May 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Radzik, Edward)
May 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against M.V. MSC ASYA, Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16837295)Document filed by Starr Indemnity and Liability Company as subrogee of Tasman Industries, Inc..(Radzik, Edward)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starr Indemnity and Liability Company v. Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mediterranean Shipping Company S.A.
Represented By: William Joseph Pallas, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M.V. MSC ASYA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity and Liability Company as subrogee of Tasman Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Edward C. Radzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Starr Indemnity and Liability Company
Represented By: Edward C. Radzik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?