Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC v. Merkury Innovations, LLC.

Plaintiff: Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC
Defendant: Merkury Innovations, LLC.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04275
Filed: May 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 18:1341
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 18, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 7/23/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER granting #13 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge John G. Koeltl on 6/7/2019) Merkury Innovations, LLC. answer due 7/19/2019 (ks)
June 5, 2019 Filing 13 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge John G. Koeltl from Richard S. Mandaro dated June 5, 2019. Document filed by Merkury Innovations, LLC..(Mandaro, Richard)
June 4, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Scott Mandaro on behalf of Merkury Innovations, LLC.. (Mandaro, Richard)
June 4, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Anthony F. Lo Cicero on behalf of Merkury Innovations, LLC.. (Lo Cicero, Anthony)
June 3, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Merkury Innovations, LLC. served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. Service was accepted by Steven Levy. Document filed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Heidelberger, Louis)
May 15, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge John G. Koeltl, Patent Judge. Judge Paul A. Engelmayer is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
May 14, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Merkury Innovations, LLC.. (dnh)
May 13, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Merkury Innovations, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Heidelberger, Louis)
May 13, 2019 Filing 7 COMPLAINT against Merkury Innovations, LLC.. Document filed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit RE:41,685, #2 Exhibit Infringement Claim Chart)(Heidelberger, Louis)
May 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Louis Mark Heidelberger. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC, Merkury Innovations, LLC.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (pne)
May 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Louis Mark Heidelberger. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Arbitration code v (Voluntary); Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Arbitration code has been deleted; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pne)
May 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Louis Mark Heidelberger to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): attorney information was omitted from PDF. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pne)
May 13, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Louis Mark Heidelberger to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong party/parties whom the pleading is against were selected. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. ***DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS*** (pne)
May 13, 2019 Filing 6 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (pne)
May 13, 2019 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (pne)
May 13, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
May 13, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
May 13, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
May 10, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Merkury Innovations, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Heidelberger, Louis) Modified on 5/13/2019 (pne).
May 10, 2019 Filing 4 FIRST RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC.(Heidelberger, Louis)
May 10, 2019 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Heidelberger, Louis)
May 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Heidelberger, Louis)
May 10, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - FILED AGAINST PARTY ERROR -COMPLAINT against Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16863705)Document filed by Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit US Pat RE41,685, #2 Exhibit Infrg Claim Chart)(Heidelberger, Louis) Modified on 5/13/2019 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC v. Merkury Innovations, LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merkury Innovations, LLC.
Represented By: Richard Scott Mandaro
Represented By: Anthony F. Lo Cicero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Technical LED Intellectual Property, LLC
Represented By: Louis Mark Heidelberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?