Burr v. Equity Bancshares, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Stephen Burr
Defendant: Gregory H. Kossover, Equity Bancshares, Inc. and Brad S. Elliott
Case Number: 1:2019cv04346
Filed: May 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Emily Despres Wolf to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (Nathan, Alison) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Ryan Eric Meltzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (Nathan, Alison) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #6 Motion for Mark Thomas Oakes to Appear Pro Hac Vice (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Alison J. Nathan)(Text Only Order) (Nathan, Alison) Transmission to Attorney Services/Help Desk.
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, September 13, 2019 at 3:00pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/12/2019) (kv)
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MEMO ENDORSEMENT granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time. ENDORSEMENT: SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/10/2019) (kv)
June 7, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #8 MOTION for Emily Despres Wolf to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-17039192. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
June 7, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Emily Despres Wolf to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-17039192. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Brad S. Elliott, Equity Bancshares, Inc., Gregory H. Kossover. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Emily Despres Wolf in support of Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Wolf, Emily)
June 7, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Ryan Eric Meltzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17039767. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
June 7, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Ryan Eric Meltzer to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17039767. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Brad S. Elliott, Equity Bancshares, Inc., Gregory H. Kossover. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Ryan Eric Meltzer, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Meltzer, Ryan)
June 7, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #6 MOTION for Mark Thomas Oakes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17039670. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 MOTION for Mark Thomas Oakes to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17039670. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Brad S. Elliott, Equity Bancshares, Inc., Gregory H. Kossover. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Mark Thomas Oakes, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice)(Oakes, Mark)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 JOINT MOTION for Extension of Time and Entry of Scheduling Order. Document filed by Brad S. Elliott, Equity Bancshares, Inc., Gregory H. Kossover. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Oakes, Mark)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Brad S. Elliott, Equity Bancshares, Inc., Gregory H. Kossover. (sj)
May 14, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
May 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
May 14, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
May 13, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to EQUITY BANCSHARES, INC., BRAD S. ELLIOTT, and GREGORY H. KOSSOVER, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stephen Burr. (Portnoy, Lesley)
May 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Portnoy, Lesley)
May 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Brad S. Elliott, Equity Bancshares, Inc., Gregory H. Kossover. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16876715)Document filed by Stephen Burr.(Portnoy, Lesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burr v. Equity Bancshares, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Burr
Represented By: Lesley Frank Portnoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gregory H. Kossover
Represented By: Mark Thomas Oakes
Represented By: Ryan Eric Meltzer
Represented By: Emily Despres Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equity Bancshares, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Thomas Oakes
Represented By: Ryan Eric Meltzer
Represented By: Emily Despres Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brad S. Elliott
Represented By: Mark Thomas Oakes
Represented By: Ryan Eric Meltzer
Represented By: Emily Despres Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?