1979 Family Trust Licensor, LLC et al v. Darji et al
Plaintiff: Rockefeller & Co. LLC and 1979 Family Trust Licensor, LLC
Defendant: Mehal J. Darji, Rockefeller Management Co. and Mehal Rockefeller
Case Number: 1:2019cv04389
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1114
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER: granting #16 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application GRANTED. Plaintiff must serve a copy of this order on Defendant and file proof of service on ECF. The August 2 conference is adjourned sine die. SO ORDERED Show Cause Response due by 8/14/2019. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/11/2019) (ama)
July 11, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Show Cause Hearing set for 8/16/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (ama)
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from James D. Weinberger dated July 10, 2019. Document filed by 1979 Family Trust Licensor, LLC, Rockefeller & Co. LLC.(Weinberger, James)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Defendants Mehal J. Darji and Rockefeller Management Co. show cause before this Court, at Courtroom 443, United States Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, in the City, County, and State of New York on August 2, 2019, at 10:00 a.m. or as soon thereafter as counsel may be heard, why an order should not be issued pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 55 entering default judgment against Defendants; and it is further ORDERED that service of a copy of this Order, annexed affidavit and exhibits by personal service and email to gazingow1007@gmail.com and First Class Mail delivery upon Defendants on or before July 26, 2019, shall be deemed good and sufficient service. Plaintiffs must file proof of service on ECF no later than July 29, 2019. Any response papers from Defendants must be filed no later than July 31, 2019. IT IS SO ORDERED. Show Cause Hearing set for 8/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Show Cause Response due by 7/31/2019. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 7/09/2019) (ama)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT as to Mehal J. Darji a/k/a Mehal Rockefeller and Rockefeller Management Co. (km)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 DECLARATION of James D. Weinberger in Support re: #12 Proposed Clerk's Certificate of Default,. Document filed by 1979 Family Trust Licensor, LLC, Rockefeller & Co. LLC. (Weinberger, James)
June 20, 2019 Filing 12 PROPOSED CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF DEFAULT. Document filed by 1979 Family Trust Licensor, LLC, Rockefeller & Co. LLC. (Weinberger, James) Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of the Notice of Initial Pretrial Conference (Docket No. 10) served on defendants, Mehal J. Darji aka Mehal Rockefeller and Rockefeller Management Co., on 6/12/2019. Service was made by mail. Document filed by 1979 Family Trust Licensor, LLC, Rockefeller & Co. LLC. (Weinberger, James)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear before the undersigned for an Initial Pretrial Conference ("IPTC") in accordance with Rule 16 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on August 2, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 443 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York, 10007. Plaintiffs are encouraged to serve defendants promptly. Plaintiff's counsel, or the defendant's counsel in removed cases, is responsible for distributing copies of this Notice to all parties. And as set forth herein. SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 8/2/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/11/2019) (ama)
June 4, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Rockefeller Management Co. served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. Service was accepted by Mehal J. Darji aka Mehal Rockefeller, President. Document filed by 1979 Family Trust Licensor, LLC; Rockefeller & Co. LLC. (Weinberger, James)
June 4, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Mehal J. Darji served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. Service was accepted by Mehal J. Darji aka Mehal Rockefeller. Document filed by 1979 Family Trust Licensor, LLC; Rockefeller & Co. LLC. (Weinberger, James)
May 15, 2019 Filing 7 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 15 U.S.C. 1116, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following trademark(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (pc)
May 15, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mehal J. Darji, Rockefeller Management Co.. (pc)
May 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
May 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
May 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 14, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mehal J. Darji aka Mehal Rockefeller and Rockefeller Management Co., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by 1979 Family Trust Licensor, LLC, Rockefeller & Co. LLC. (Weinberger, James)
May 14, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Rockefeller Financial Services, Inc., Corporate Parent RFS Opco LLC, Corporate Parent Rockefeller Capital Management, L.P. for Rockefeller & Co. LLC. Document filed by 1979 Family Trust Licensor, LLC, Rockefeller & Co. LLC.(Weinberger, James)
May 14, 2019 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM TRADEMARK - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Weinberger, James)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weinberger, James)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mehal J. Darji, Rockefeller Management Co.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16883294)Document filed by 1979 Family Trust Licensor, LLC, Rockefeller & Co. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Registrations, #2 Exhibit B - Webpage screenshots)(Weinberger, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: 1979 Family Trust Licensor, LLC et al v. Darji et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mehal J. Darji
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rockefeller Management Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mehal Rockefeller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockefeller & Co. LLC
Represented By: James David Weinberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 1979 Family Trust Licensor, LLC
Represented By: James David Weinberger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?