Yang v. Inside Edition Inc.
Plaintiff: Stephen Yang
Defendant: Inside Edition Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04402
Filed: May 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 9, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Inside Edition Inc..(Penchina, Robert)
July 9, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent CBS Corporation for Inside Edition Inc.. Document filed by Inside Edition Inc..(Penchina, Robert)
June 3, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Inside Edition Inc. answer due 7/3/2019. (cf)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. The Application is granted. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/3/2019) (cf)
May 31, 2019 Filing 7 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Robert Penchina dated May 31, 2019. Document filed by Inside Edition Inc..(Penchina, Robert)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Penchina on behalf of Inside Edition Inc.. (Penchina, Robert)
May 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 705, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Paul G. Gardephe. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 5/20/2019) (jca)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Liebowitz, Richard)
May 15, 2019 Filing 3 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Inside Edition Inc.. (dnh)
May 15, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
May 15, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
May 15, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
May 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
May 15, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard Liebowitz. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
May 14, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Inside Edition Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Stephen Yang. (Liebowitz, Richard)
May 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Inside Edition Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16885485)Document filed by Stephen Yang. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Liebowitz, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yang v. Inside Edition Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inside Edition Inc.
Represented By: Robert Penchina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Yang
Represented By: Richard Liebowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?