MTS Logistics, Inc. v. Mucho Macho Inc.
Plaintiff: MTS Logistics, Inc.
Defendant: Mucho Macho Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04453
Filed: May 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333mc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Document filed by MTS Logistics, Inc.. (Stewart, Gareth)
June 21, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Service was made by Mail, per CPLR Section 3215(g)(4)(i). Document filed by MTS Logistics, Inc.. (Stewart, Gareth)
June 21, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Mucho Macho Inc. served on 6/13/2019, answer due 7/5/2019. Service was accepted by Nancy Dougherty, Agent of New York Secretary of State. Document filed by MTS Logistics, Inc.. (Stewart, Gareth)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mucho Macho Inc.. (dnh)
May 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
May 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
May 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
May 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Gareth Winston Stewart. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Nature of Suit code 340 (Marine). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Nature of Suit code has been modified to 120 (Contract: Marine). (dnh)
May 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gareth Winston Stewart. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: MTS Logistics, Inc. ; Mucho Macho Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MTS Logistics, Inc..(Stewart, Gareth)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mucho Macho Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by MTS Logistics, Inc.. (Stewart, Gareth)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Stewart, Gareth)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Mucho Macho Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16894831)Document filed by MTS Logistics, Inc..(Stewart, Gareth)
May 16, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney MTS Logistics, Inc. to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 5/21/2019. (dnh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MTS Logistics, Inc. v. Mucho Macho Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MTS Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Gareth Winston Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mucho Macho Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?