MTS Logistics, Inc. v. Golden Voyage America LLC
Plaintiff: MTS Logistics, Inc.
Defendant: Golden Voyage America LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04457
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333mc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. GRANTED. THE INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CURRENTLY SCHEDULED FOR JULY 2, 2019, IS ADJOURNED TO AUGUST 2, 2019, AT 2:45 PM. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 10 CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled July 2, 2019 addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from Gareth W. Stewart dated June 26, 2019. Document filed by MTS Logistics, Inc.. Return Date set for 7/2/2019 at 02:45 PM.(Stewart, Gareth)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Counsel for all parties are directed to appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on July 2, 2019, at 2:45 p.m. The conference will be held in Courtroom 706 of the Thurgood Marshall United States Court House, 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Counsel who appear at the pretrial conference must be authorized to negotiate terms of settlement. So Ordered. Initial Conference set for 7/2/2019 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 706, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 6/20/2019) (js)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Golden Voyage America LLC.(Powers, Robert)
June 19, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Golden Voyage America LLC.(Powers, Robert)
May 31, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Golden Voyage America LLC served on 5/24/2019, answer due 6/14/2019. Service was accepted by Person Served Refused to Provide Name. Document filed by MTS Logistics, Inc.. (Stewart, Gareth)
May 17, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Golden Voyage America LLC. (pc)
May 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
May 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
May 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Gareth Winston Stewart. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: MTS Logistics, Inc., Golden Voyage America LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly;. (pc)
May 16, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by MTS Logistics, Inc..(Stewart, Gareth)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Golden Voyage America LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by MTS Logistics, Inc.. (Stewart, Gareth)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Stewart, Gareth)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Golden Voyage America LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16895269)Document filed by MTS Logistics, Inc..(Stewart, Gareth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MTS Logistics, Inc. v. Golden Voyage America LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Voyage America LLC
Represented By: Robert S. Powers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MTS Logistics, Inc.
Represented By: Gareth Winston Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?