Kiashek v. First Republic Bank
Plaintiff: Daniel Kiashek
Defendant: First Republic Bank
Case Number: 1:2019cv04482
Filed: May 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Analisa Torres
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Filing 15 AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against First Republic Bank with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Daniel Kiashek. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Kaiser, Daniel)
July 2, 2019 Filing 14 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by First Republic Bank.(Geelan, John)
July 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Defendant having filed a motion to compel arbitration, ECF No. 8, it is hereby ORDERED that by July 15, 2019, Plaintiff shall file his opposition, if any. By July 22, 2019, Defendant shall file its reply, if any. (Responses due by 7/15/2019, Replies due by 7/22/2019.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 7/1/2019) (cf)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (http://nysd.uscourts.gov/mediation). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 7/8/2019. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/15) (Chan, Tsz)
June 28, 2019 Filing 11 DECLARATION of Dipanwita Deb Amar in Support re: #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (DEFENDANT FIRST REPUBLIC BANK'S NOTICE OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION).. Document filed by First Republic Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Geelan, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 10 DECLARATION of Ester Trillana in Support re: #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (DEFENDANT FIRST REPUBLIC BANK'S NOTICE OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION).. Document filed by First Republic Bank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Geelan, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (DEFENDANT FIRST REPUBLIC BANK'S NOTICE OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION). (DEFENDANT FIRST REPUBLIC BANK'S PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION). Document filed by First Republic Bank. (Geelan, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION to Compel Arbitration (DEFENDANT FIRST REPUBLIC BANK'S NOTICE OF PETITION TO COMPEL ARBITRATION). Document filed by First Republic Bank.(Geelan, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by First Republic Bank.(Geelan, John)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Initial Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 11:40 AM in Courtroom 15D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Analisa Torres. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/17/2019) (cf)
May 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: To conserve resources, to promote judicial efficiency, and in an effort to achieve a faster disposition of this matter, it is hereby ORDERED that the parties discuss whether they are willing to consent, under 28 U.S.C. 636(c), to conducting all further proceedings before the assigned Magistrate Judge. (As further set forth in this Order.) The parties are free to withhold consent without negative consequences. (Signed by Judge Analisa Torres on 5/17/2019) (cf)
May 17, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to First Republic Bank. (pne)
May 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
May 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
May 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
May 16, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kaiser, Daniel)
May 16, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to First Republic Bank, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Daniel Kiashek. (Kaiser, Daniel)
May 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against First Republic Bank. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16897243)Document filed by Daniel Kiashek.(Kaiser, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kiashek v. First Republic Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Kiashek
Represented By: Daniel Jordan Kaiser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Republic Bank
Represented By: John D. Geelan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?