Green v. Schindler Elevator Corporation
Plaintiff: Debra J Green
Defendant: Schindler Elevator Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv04677
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Louis L Stanton
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Chad B Russell on behalf of Debra J Green. (Russell, Chad)
June 13, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 6/21/2019 is adjourned to 7/26/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (ml)
May 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER FOR CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 16(b): Initial Conference set for 6/21/2019 at 12:00 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Louis L. Stanton and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/22/2019) (rro)
May 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 150993/2018..Document filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons & Complaint, #2 Exhibit 4/5/18 St Dam & 5/3/19 Resp, #3 Exhibit Ct Orders 5/29/18 & 10/2/18, #4 Exhibit 1/10/19 Pltf Resp & 1/29/19 Ct Order, #5 Exhibit Pltf Response 1/29/19, #6 Exhibit Deft 4/24/19 Motion to Compel, #7 Affidavit Aff of Service for Notice of Removal)(Sabatini, Richard)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sabatini, Richard)
May 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Richard J Sabatini. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Origin code 1 (Original Proceeding); County code Albany; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Origin code has been modified to 2 (Removal from State Court); the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (pne)
May 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY RE-FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Richard J Sabatini. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. The Civil Cover Sheet should not be filed as an attachment to another document. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (pne)
May 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Richard J Sabatini to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Notice of Removal,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): As per Rule 13.3, Each attachment to the pleading must be clearly titled in the ECF entry so the subject of the exhibit is clear; exhibits should not be filed in the same PDF as the pleading. Re-file the pleading using the event type Notice of Removal found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. ***DO NOT USE GOOGLE CHROME OR SAFARI BROWSERS*** (pne)
May 22, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
May 22, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
May 22, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
May 21, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard J Sabatini on behalf of Schindler Elevator Corporation. (Sabatini, Richard)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Rule 7.1 Statement served on Debra J Green on 05/21/19. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation. (Sabatini, Richard)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on Debra J Green on 05/21/19. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation. (Sabatini, Richard)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Civil Cover Sheet served on Debra J Green on 05/21/19. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation. (Sabatini, Richard)
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - NOTICE OF REMOVAL from SUPREME COURT, County of NEW YORK. Case Number: 150993-18. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16925240).Document filed by Schindler Elevator Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 RULE 7.1 STATEMENT)(Sabatini, Richard) Modified on 5/22/2019 (pne).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Green v. Schindler Elevator Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schindler Elevator Corporation
Represented By: Richard J Sabatini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debra J Green
Represented By: Chad B Russell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?