Geigtech East Bay LLC v. Lutron Electronics Co., Inc.
Plaintiff: Geigtech East Bay LLC
Defendant: Lutron Electronics Co., Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04693
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #19 MOTION for Scott W. Breedlove to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17263762. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
July 17, 2019 Filing 19 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Scott W. Breedlove to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17263762. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Lutron Electronics Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit SWB Affidavit, #2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing, #3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Breedlove, Scott) Modified on 7/18/2019 (wb).
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF GARY R. SORDEN granting #13 Motion for Gary R. Sorden to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is hereby admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/20/2019) (mml)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE ON BEHALF OF BRIAN L. KING granting #14 Motion for Brian L. King to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Applicant is hereby admitted to practice pro hac vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this Court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/20/2019) (mml)
June 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Lutron Electronics Co., Inc. answer due 7/22/2019. (mml)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/20/2019) (mml)
June 20, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jc)
June 20, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Colleen McMahon. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
June 20, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-cv-05290-CM. Notice of Assignment to follow. (jc)
June 13, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the Complaint addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from James Herschlein dated June 13, 2019. Document filed by Lutron Electronics Co., Inc..(Herschlein, James)
June 13, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #14 MOTION for Brian L. King, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., #13 MOTION for Gary R. Sorden, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (ma)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Brian L. King, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Geigtech East Bay LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit /Affirmation in Support of King Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing re King, #3 Text of Proposed Order re King Pro Hac Vice)(King, Brian)
June 12, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION for Gary R. Sorden, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Geigtech East Bay LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit /Affirmation in Support of Sorden Pro Hac, #2 Certificate of Good Standing re Sorden, #3 Text of Proposed Order re Sorden Pro Hac Vice)(Sorden, Gary)
June 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #12 MOTION for Brian L. King, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-17067587. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
June 12, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #11 Proposed Order, #10 MOTION for Gary R. Sorden, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17067338. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas; attach the Proposed Order as an exhibt to the motion. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
June 12, 2019 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Brian L. King, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number BNYSDC-17067587. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Geigtech East Bay LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit /Affirmation in Support of King Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing re King, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(King, Brian) Modified on 6/12/2019 (wb).
June 12, 2019 Filing 11 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Geigtech East Bay LLC. Related Document Number: #10 . (Sorden, Gary) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 6/12/2019 (wb).
June 12, 2019 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Gary R. Sorden, Esq. to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17067338. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Geigtech East Bay LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affirmation in Support of Sorden Pro Hac Vice, #2 Certificate of Good Standing re Sorden)(Sorden, Gary) Modified on 6/12/2019 (wb).
June 11, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Colleen McMahon as possibly related to 1:18-cv-05290-CM. (dnh)
May 24, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lutron Electronics Co., Inc.. (dnh)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 AO 120 FORM PATENT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 35 U.S.C. 290, the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following patent(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office electronically notified via Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (dnh)
May 24, 2019 Case Eligible for Patent Pilot Program. (dnh)
May 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
May 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (dnh)
May 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Jed Matthew Weiss. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York; Fee Status code due (due). The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid). (dnh)
May 24, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Paid electronically via Pay.gov: for #5 Complaint. Filing fee $ $ 400.00. Pay.gov receipt number ANYSDC-16928124, paid on 05/21/2019. (dnh)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 RELATED CASE AFFIRMATION of Jed M. Weiss, Esq. re: that this action be filed as related to 18-cv-5290 (CM). Document filed by Geigtech East Bay LLC.(Weiss, Jed)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LUTRON ELECTRONICS CO, INC., re: #5 Complaint. Document filed by Geigtech East Bay LLC. (Weiss, Jed)
May 23, 2019 Filing 5 COMPLAINT against Lutron Electronics Co., Inc.. Document filed by Geigtech East Bay LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Geiger 717 Patent)(Weiss, Jed)
May 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Geigtech East Bay LLC to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 5/28/2019. (dnh)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Geigtech East Bay LLC.(Weiss, Jed)
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 AO 120 FORM PATENT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 120 Form Patent/Trademark for case opening submitted to court for review.(Weiss, Jed)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR SUMMONS NOT LINKED TO CORRESPONDING PLEADING- REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lutron Electronics Co. Inc., re: Complaint. Document filed by Geigtech East Bay LLC. (Weiss, Jed) Modified on 5/24/2019 (dnh).
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Weiss, Jed)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Geigtech East Bay LLC v. Lutron Electronics Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Geigtech East Bay LLC
Represented By: Brian King
Represented By: Jed Matthew Weiss
Represented By: Gary Sorden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lutron Electronics Co., Inc.
Represented By: James D. Herschlein
Represented By: Scott W. Breedlove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?