Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp. v. Momentum Logistics Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp., a foreign corporation and Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.
Defendant: DOES 1-10, Momentum Logistics Corporation, a California corporation and Momentum Logistics Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv04697
Filed: May 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: J Paul Oetken
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:40101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court approves the parties' proposed case management plan. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for July 15, 2019, is cancelled. The parties are directed to appear for a pretrial conference on November 1, 2019, at 12:15 PM in Courtroom 706 of the Thurgood Marshall Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, NY 10007. Pretrial Conference set for 11/1/2019 at 12:15 PM in Courtroom 706, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. All parties do not consent to conducting all further proceedings before a United States Magistrate Judge, including motions and trial. Amended pleadings may not be filed and additional parties may not be joined except with leave of the Court. Any motion to amend or to join additional parties shall be filed within 45 days from the date of this Order. Fact Discovery due by 10/28/2019. Non-Expert Deposition due by 10/28/2019. Expert Deposition due by 12/12/2019. Expert Discovery due by 12/12/2019. Ready for Trial by 5/18/2020. This case is not to be tried to a jury. Counsel for the parties have conferred and their present best estimate of the length of trial is four (4) days. Case Management Conference set for 11/1/2019 at 12:15 PM before Judge J. Paul Oetken. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 7/15/2019) (jwh)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order ORDER: THE PRETRIAL CONFERENCE SCHEDULED FOR JULY 15, 2019 IS ADJOURNED SINE DIE. A SUBSEQUENT ORDER WILL POST ADVISING THE PARTIES OF THE NEXT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. SO ORDERED. (Judge J. Paul Oetken) (bh)
July 10, 2019 Filing 16 PROPOSED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN. Document filed by Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.. (Modica, Robert)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER: Initial Conference set for 7/15/2019 at 02:45 PM in Courtroom 706, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge J. Paul Oetken. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge J. Paul Oetken on 6/28/2019) (jca)
June 28, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Momentum Logistics Corporation.(Sandercock, John)
June 28, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Momentum Logistics Corporation.(Sandercock, John)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. GRANTED. DEFENDANT MOMENTUM LOGISTICS CORPORATION SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE COMPLAINT ON OR BEFORE JUNE 28, 2019. SO ORDERED. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge J. Paul Oetken)(Text Only Order) (bh)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 LETTER RESPONSE in Support of Motion addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from John Sandercock dated June 10, 2019 re: #10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from John Sandercock dated June 6, 2019. . Document filed by Momentum Logistics Corporation. (Sandercock, John)
June 6, 2019 Filing 10 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge J. Paul Oetken from John Sandercock dated June 6, 2019. Document filed by Momentum Logistics Corporation.(Sandercock, John)
June 5, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by John Sandercock on behalf of Momentum Logistics Corporation. (Sandercock, John)
May 30, 2019 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Momentum Logistics Corporation served on 5/21/2019, answer due 6/11/2019. Service was made by ELECTRONIC MAIL. Document filed by Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.. (Modica, Robert)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Momentum Logistics Corporation. (dnh)
May 23, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Momentum Logistics Corporation, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.. (Modica, Robert)
May 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Robert Modica, Jr. to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct; Defendant name must exactly match the party of record. Do not use abbreviations. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
May 22, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
May 22, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
May 22, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge J. Paul Oetken. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
May 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Robert Modica, Jr.. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1333mc; Origin code 5 (Transfer-in from Other District); Dollar Demand left blank; County code New York. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 46:40101; the Origin code has been modified to 1 (Original Proceeding); the Dollar Demand has been modified to 797,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.. (dnh)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Modica, Robert)
May 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Robert Modica, Jr. to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct. The Origin selected on CM/ECF must correspond with the selection reflected on the PDF. Only one Basis of Jurisdiction may be selected, Only complete the Citizenship of Principal Parties if Diversity is chosen for the Basis of Jurisdiction. A Courthouse Assignment must be reflected on the PDF. The dollar demand, county code and all other selections on CM/ECF will be modified to reflect the updated Civil Cover Sheet. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh)
May 22, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Robert Modica, Jr.. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: DOES 1-10, Momentum Logistics Corporation, a California corporation, Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp., a foreign corporation. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
May 21, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Momentum Logistics Corp., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp., a foreign corporation. (Modica, Robert) Modified on 5/22/2019 (dnh).
May 21, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp., a foreign corporation.(Modica, Robert)
May 21, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Modica, Robert) Modified on 5/22/2019 (dnh).
May 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1-10, Momentum Logistics Corporation, a California corporation. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16929166)Document filed by Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp., a foreign corporation.(Modica, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp. v. Momentum Logistics Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Momentum Logistics Corporation, a California corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Momentum Logistics Corporation
Represented By: John Sandercock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp., a foreign corporation
Represented By: Robert Modica, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yang Ming Marine Transport Corp.
Represented By: Robert Modica, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?