Fernandez Rodriguez et al v. SMA Deli Grocery, Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Margarito Fernandez Rodriguez
Defendant: Mohamed Alrobye, Ahmed Alrobye, Ahmed Alrobeal, Shareqi Doe, SMA Deli Grocery, Corp. and Mohamed Alrobeal
Case Number: 1:2019cv04746
Filed: May 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: George B Daniels
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 NOTICE OF MEDIATOR ASSIGNMENT - Notice of assignment of mediator. Mediator Schedule due by 8/12/2019.(mf)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEDIATION REFERRAL ORDER FOR CASES FILED UNDER THE FAIR LABOR STANDARDS ACT 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq. This case, involving claims under the Fair Labor Standards Act (FLSA), 29 U.S.C. Sec. 201 et seq., has been assigned to this Court for all purposes. In the Courts experience, cases involving FLSA claims often benefit from early mediation. To that end, prior to a Rule 16(b) case management conference the Court is referring this case to the Mediation Office for settlement purposes under Local Civil Rule 83.9. To facilitate mediation the parties shall, within four weeks of this Order, confer and provide the items set forth in this Order. Mediator to be Assigned by 7/1/2019. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 9/8/2016) (Chan, Tsz)
June 19, 2019 Filing 17 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Ahmed Alrobye, Mohamed Alrobye, Shareqi Doe, SMA Deli Grocery, Corp..(Tembeck, Gregory)
June 19, 2019 Filing 16 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by SMA Deli Grocery, Corp..(Tembeck, Gregory)
June 11, 2019 Filing 15 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Shareqi Doe served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. Service was accepted by Ali Alrubyu, co-worker. Document filed by Margarito Fernandez Rodriguez(individually); Margarito Fernandez Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Mohamed Alrobye served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. Service was accepted by Ali Alrubyu, co-worker. Document filed by Margarito Fernandez Rodriguez(individually); Margarito Fernandez Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Ahmed Alrobye served on 5/31/2019, answer due 6/21/2019. Service was accepted by Ali Alrubyu, co-worker. Document filed by Margarito Fernandez Rodriguez(individually); Margarito Fernandez Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
June 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Clifford Ryan Tucker on behalf of Margarito Fernandez Rodriguez(individually), Margarito Fernandez Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Tucker, Clifford)
May 28, 2019 Filing 11 INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 11A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge George B. Daniels. (Signed by Judge George B. Daniels on 5/28/2019) (ks)
May 23, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Shareqi Doe. (dnh)
May 23, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ahmed Alrobye. (dnh)
May 23, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mohamed Alrobye. (dnh)
May 23, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to SMA Deli Grocery, Corp.. (dnh)
May 23, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
May 23, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
May 23, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge George B. Daniels. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
May 22, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Shareqi Doe, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Margarito Fernandez Rodriguez(individually), Margarito Fernandez Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ahmed Alrobye, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Margarito Fernandez Rodriguez(individually), Margarito Fernandez Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mohamed Alrobye, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Margarito Fernandez Rodriguez(individually), Margarito Fernandez Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to SMA Deli Grocery, Corp., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Margarito Fernandez Rodriguez(individually), Margarito Fernandez Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated). (Faillace, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Faillace, Michael)
May 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ahmed Alrobye, Mohamed Alrobye, Shareqi Doe, SMA Deli Grocery, Corp.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16938670)Document filed by Margarito Fernandez Rodriguez(individually), Margarito Fernandez Rodriguez(on behalf of others similarly situated).(Faillace, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fernandez Rodriguez et al v. SMA Deli Grocery, Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohamed Alrobye
Represented By: Gregory Jon Tembeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmed Alrobye
Represented By: Gregory Jon Tembeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ahmed Alrobeal
Represented By: Gregory Jon Tembeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shareqi Doe
Represented By: Gregory Jon Tembeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SMA Deli Grocery, Corp.
Represented By: Gregory Jon Tembeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mohamed Alrobeal
Represented By: Gregory Jon Tembeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margarito Fernandez Rodriguez
Represented By: Michael Antonio Faillace
Represented By: Clifford Ryan Tucker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?