Maersk A/S v. Interstate Commodities, Inc.
Plaintiff: Maersk A/S
Defendant: Interstate Commodities, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04787
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333mc
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 28, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/27/2019) (rro)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Interstate Commodities, Inc.. (pc)
May 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
May 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
May 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Garth S. Wolfson. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Dollar Demand $84,200,000; County code XX Out of State;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Dollar Demand has been modified to $84,000; the County code has been modified to XX Out of U.S.;. (pc)
May 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Garth S. Wolfson to RE-FILE Document #3 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): wrong case number indicated on document. (ldi)
May 23, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Interstate Commodities, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Maersk A/S. (Wolfson, Garth)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Maersk A/S.(Wolfson, Garth) Modified on 5/24/2019 (ldi).
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Wolfson, Garth)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Interstate Commodities, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16943615)Document filed by Maersk A/S.(Wolfson, Garth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Maersk A/S v. Interstate Commodities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Commodities, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maersk A/S
Represented By: Garth S. Wolfson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?