Liss v. Heritage Health & Housing, Inc.
Plaintiff: Jane Liss
Defendant: Heritage Health & Housing, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04797
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Stewart D Aaron
Referring Judge: Laura Taylor Swain
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: False Claims Act
Cause of Action: 31:3729
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SCHEDULING INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: An Initial Pretrial Conference in accordance with Rule 16(b) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure will be held on Thursday, September 5, 2019 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 11C, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007. Initial Conference set for 9/5/2019 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 11C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 7/12/2019) (js)
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. Application Granted. So Ordered. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 7/10/2019) (js)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File motion, answer, or other response addressed to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron from Ian-Paul A. Poulos dated July 9, 2019. Document filed by Heritage Health & Housing, Inc..(Poulos, Ian-Paul)
July 9, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Ian-Paul Apostole Poulos on behalf of Heritage Health & Housing, Inc.. (Poulos, Ian-Paul)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF REFERENCE TO A MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Laura Taylor Swain on 6/28/2019) (ama)
June 27, 2019 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Heritage Health & Housing, Inc. served on 6/19/2019, answer due 7/10/2019. Service was accepted by Jennifer Martinez, authorized individual. Document filed by Jane Liss. (Buzzard, Lucas)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Heritage Health & Housing, Inc.. (pne)
May 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
May 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
May 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Heritage Health & Housing, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jane Liss. (Buzzard, Lucas)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Buzzard, Lucas)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Heritage Health & Housing, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16944835)Document filed by Jane Liss.(Buzzard, Lucas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liss v. Heritage Health & Housing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Heritage Health & Housing, Inc.
Represented By: Ian-Paul Apostole Poulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jane Liss
Represented By: Lucas Colin Buzzard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?