Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv04835
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Gregory H Woods
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Plaintiff's motion for leave to serve a third-party subpoena prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference is GRANTED. The Court ORDERS the following: (1) Plaintiff may serve a subpoena pursuant to Rule 45 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure on Defendants internet service provider, Spectrum (the "ISP"), to obtain the name and address of the subscriber identified by the IP allegedly employed by Defendant (the "IP Address"). Plaintiff's counsel is directed to attach a copy of this order to the subpoena. (2) Within seven (7) days of service of a subpoena, the ISP shall reasonably attempt to identify the subscriber and provide him or her with a copy of the subpoena and this order. If the ISP is unable to determine, to a reasonable degree of technical certainty, the identity of the subscriber identified by the IP Address, it shall so notify Plaintiff's counsel. (3) The ISP shall have twenty-one (21) days from the service date of the subpoena to move to quash or otherwise object to the subpoena. The identified subscriber shall have fourteen (14) days from receipt of the subpoena from the ISP to move to quash or otherwise object to the subpoena. (4) Absent any motion to quash or other objection the ISP shall produce the information sought to Plaintiff within twenty-one (21) days after notifying the subscriber pursuant to paragraph (2) above. (5) Plaintiff may only use the information disclosed pursuant to the subpoena for the purpose of protecting and enforcing Plaintiff's rights as set forth in the complaint. The Court ORDERS that the information not be disclosed to any person other than Plaintiff and Plaintiff's counsel without further leave of the Court. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Gregory H. Woods on 6/6/2019) (anc)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference and Request to Adjourn the Initial Rule 16 Scheduling Conference addressed to Judge Gregory H. Woods from Jacqueline M. James. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(James, Jacqueline)
May 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
May 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
May 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Gregory H. Woods. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
May 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Jacqueline Marie James to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (James, Jacqueline)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16948827)Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(James, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline Marie James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?