Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe

Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe
Case Number: 1:2019cv04836
Filed: May 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Motion for Discovery. Accordingly, Plaintiff's motion for leave to file a third-party subpoena on the ISP in order to obtain Defendant's name and address is GRANTED. Plaintiff is not permitted to subpoena the ISP for Defendant's email address or telephone number. Plaintiff does not oppose allowing Defendant to proceed anonymously. (Pl. Mem. at 10). Accordingly, it is ORDERED that Defendant may proceed anonymously as John Doe unless and until the Court orders otherwise. In addition, Plaintiff states in its memorandum that it has a policy of not initiating settlement discussions prior to serving a Complaint on Defendant. (Id. at 4). It is therefore further ORDERED that Plaintiff shall not initiate settlement discussions prior to service of the Complaint without leave of Court. Nevertheless, if Defendant initiates such discussions, Plaintiff is permitted to participate therein and to settle the case. It is further ORDERED that the ISP shall have 60 days from the date of service of the Rule 45 subpoena upon it to serve upon Defendant along with a copy of the subpoena, a copy of this Order, and a copy of the "Notice to Defendant" attached hereto as Exhibit A. The Order should be attached to the "Notice to Defendant" such that the "Notice to Defendant" is the first page of the materials enclosed with the subpoena. The ISP may serve Defendant using any reasonable means, including written notice sent to his or her last known address, transmitted either by first class mail or via overnight service. further ORDERED that any information ultimately disclosed to Plaintiff in response to a Rule 45 subpoena may be used solely for the purpose of protecting Plaintiff's rights as set forth in its Complaint. The Clerk of the Court is directed to terminate the motion at Docket Entry 7. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/11/2019) (rro)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #7 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. . Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(James, Jacqueline)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Discovery for Leave to Serve a Third Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(James, Jacqueline)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document: Application GRANTED. Plaintiff shall submit a Motion seeking Leave to File a Third Party Subpoena Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(d)(1) with whatever speed Plaintiff deems appropriate. In addition, the Court will not schedule an initial conference until Defendant is named and served. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 6/6/2019) (jwh)
June 5, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference and Request to Adjourn the Initial Rule 16 Scheduling Conference addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Jacqueline M. James. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(James, Jacqueline)
May 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
May 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
May 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
May 24, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO SUBMIT AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT. Notice to Attorney Jacqueline Marie James to submit a completed AO 121 Form Copyright to court for review. Use the event type AO 121 Copyright - Notice of Submission by Attorney found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
May 23, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.(James, Jacqueline)
May 23, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (James, Jacqueline)
May 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16948831)Document filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(James, Jacqueline)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Jacqueline Marie James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?