Tianhai Lace USA, Inc. v. Lord & Taylor LLC et al
Plaintiff: Tianhai Lace USA, Inc.
Defendant: LORD & TAYLOR, LLC, DOES 1-10, Bernard Chaus, Inc., and Lord & Taylor LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04850
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: P Kevin Castel
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 19, 2019 Filing 16 FIRST LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge P. Kevin Castel from Tianhai Lace USA, Inc. dated July 19, 2019. Document filed by Tianhai Lace USA, Inc..(Reuber, Cameron)
July 19, 2019 NOTICE: Initial conference is adjourned from July 30, 2019 to August 5, 2019 at 11:00 a.m. (Nacanther, Florence)
July 18, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Katherine Marguerite Lieb on behalf of Bernard Chaus, Inc.,, Lord & Taylor LLC. (Lieb, Katherine)
July 18, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Kenneth Roy Schachter on behalf of Bernard Chaus, Inc.,, Lord & Taylor LLC. (Schachter, Kenneth)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 7/30/2019 at 11:15 AM in Courtroom 11D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge P. Kevin Castel, as further set forth in this order. (Signed by Judge P. Kevin Castel on 7/9/2019) (jwh)
July 3, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge P. Kevin Castel. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (ad)
July 3, 2019 Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (ad)
July 3, 2019 CASE DECLINED AS NOT RELATED. Case referred as related to 1:19-cv-4850 and declined by Judge Ronnie Abrams and returned to wheel for assignment. (ad)
May 29, 2019 Filing 12 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Reuber, Cameron)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pc)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Bernard Chaus, Inc.,. (pc)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lord & Taylor LLC. (pc)
May 28, 2019 CASE REFERRED TO Judge Ronnie Abrams as possibly related to 17cv1328. (pc)
May 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 28, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Unassigned. (pc)
May 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Cameron Sean Reuber to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Related case number and judge is filled out on the wrong part of the civil cover sheet. Related cases that are currently OPEN need to be listed on the bottom half of the first page of the cover sheet, not the top half. (pc)
May 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Cameron Sean Reuber. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to Westchester;. (pc)
May 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Cameron Sean Reuber. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Bernard Chaus, Inc.,, LORD & TAYLOR, LLC, DOES 1-10. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted;. (pc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 1:17-cv-01328-RA. Document filed by Tianhai Lace USA, Inc..(Reuber, Cameron)
May 24, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Bernard Chaus, Inc.,, LORD & TAYLOR, LLC, DOES 1-10 added. Party added pursuant to #1 Complaint.Document filed by Tianhai Lace USA, Inc.. Related document: #1 Complaint.(Reuber, Cameron)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter T Busch on behalf of Tianhai Lace USA, Inc.. (Busch, Peter)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Bernard Chaus, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tianhai Lace USA, Inc.. (Reuber, Cameron)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lord & Taylor LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Tianhai Lace USA, Inc.. (Reuber, Cameron)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Tianhai Lace USA, Inc..(Reuber, Cameron)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Reuber, Cameron) Modified on 5/28/2019 (pc).
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Reuber, Cameron)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Bernard Chaus, Inc.,, LORD & TAYLOR, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16950663)Document filed by Tianhai Lace USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Reuber, Cameron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tianhai Lace USA, Inc. v. Lord & Taylor LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LORD & TAYLOR, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bernard Chaus, Inc.,
Represented By: Katherine Marguerite Lieb
Represented By: Kenneth Roy Schachter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lord & Taylor LLC
Represented By: Katherine Marguerite Lieb
Represented By: Kenneth Roy Schachter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tianhai Lace USA, Inc.
Represented By: Cameron Sean Reuber
Represented By: Peter T Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?