Kothman v. Zimmer Inc et al
Plaintiff: Thomas Kothman
Defendant: Zimmer Inc. and Zimmer Holdings Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv04852
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Crotty
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332pl
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED SCHEDULE: Upon consideration of the parties' agreed-to proposed amended schedule, the Court adopts the following deadlines: Motions due by 8/13/2020. Responses due by 9/17/2020 Replies due by 10/5/2020. Fact Discovery due by 1/31/2020. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Crotty on 7/18/2019) Filed In Associated Cases: 1:18-md-02859-PAC et al. Pursuant to instructions from Chambers on 7/18/2019. (ks)
May 24, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE - TRANSFER CASE: This case is assigned to: Judge Paul A. Crotty. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sjo)
May 24, 2019 NOTE TO OUT OF STATE ATTORNEYS: Please visit the Court's website at http://www.nysd.uscourts.gov for information regarding admission to the S.D.N.Y. Bar and the CM/ECF Rules & Filing Instructions. (sjo)
May 24, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sjo)
May 24, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sjo)
May 24, 2019 CONSOLIDATED MDL CASE: Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
May 24, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:18-md-02859-PAC. (sjo)
May 24, 2019 Filing 8 MDL TRANSFERRED IN from the United States District Court - District of Connecticut; Case Number: 3:19-cv-00339. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket entries received. (sjo)
May 17, 2019 Filing 7 MDL Transfer Order. Case transferred to the Southern District of New York, Signed by Clerk Ruby J. Krajick, MDL Panel on 5/17/2019.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/24/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4 and LR 4 as to *Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Inc* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joseph M. Barnes* *Reardon Law Firm* *160 Hempstead St., PO Drawer 1430* *New London, CT 06320*. (Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/24/2019.]
March 11, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE TO COUNSEL/SELF-REPRESENTED PARTIES : Counsel or self-represented parties initiating or removing this action are responsible for serving all parties with attached documents and copies of #4 Standing Protective Order, #3 Electronic Filing Order, #2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines, #1 Complaint filed by Thomas Kothman Signed by Clerk on 3/11/2019.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/24/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/7/2019.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/24/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Victor A. Bolden on 3/7/2019.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/24/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/6/2019. Discovery due by 9/6/2019. Dispositive Motions due by 10/11/2019. Signed by Clerk on 3/7/3019.(Fazekas, J.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/24/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Judge Victor A. Bolden added. (Oliver, T.) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/24/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Request for Clerk to issue summons as to Zimmer Holdings, Inc., Zimmer Inc. (Barnes, Joseph) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/24/2019.]
March 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $400 receipt number ACTDC-5185030.), filed by Thomas Kothman.(Barnes, Joseph) [Transferred from Connecticut on 5/24/2019.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kothman v. Zimmer Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zimmer Holdings Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas Kothman
Represented By: Joseph M. Barnes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?