Smart Team Global LLC v. Humbletech LLC et al
Plaintiff: Smart Team Global LLC
Defendant: Humbletech LLC and Lin Li
Case Number: 1:2019cv04873
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from George P. Barbatsuly dated July 10, 2019 re: Court's Order, dated July 9, 2019 (ECF No. 14). Document filed by Smart Team Global LLC.(Barbatsuly, George)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by Humbletech LLC. On July 3, 2019, Defendants Humbletech LLC, et al. filed a motion to dismiss. Pursuant to Rule 3.F of this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases, on or before July 15, 2019, Plaintiff must notify the Court and its adversaries in writing whether (1) it intends to file an amended pleading and when it will do so or (2) it will rely on the pleading being attacked. Plaintiff is on notice that declining to amend its pleadings to timely respond to a fully briefed argument in the Defendants' July 3 motion to dismiss may well constitute a waiver of the Plaintiff's right to use the amendment process to cure any defects that have been made apparent by the Defendants' briefing. See Loreley Fin. (Jersey) No. 3 Ltd v. Wells Fargo Sec., LLC., 797 F.3d 160, 190 (2d Cir. 2015) (leaving "unaltered the grounds on which denial of leave to amend has long been held proper, such as undue delay, bad faith, dilatory motive, and futility"). If Plaintiff chooses to amend, Defendants may then (a) file an answer; (b) file a new motion to dismiss; or (c) submit a letter stating that it relies on the initially-filed motion to dismiss. Nothing in this Order alters the time to amend, answer or move provided by the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure or Local Rules. The initial pretrial conference scheduled for September 27, 2019 is adjourned pending resolution of this motion. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/8/2019) (tro)
July 3, 2019 Filing 13 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by Humbletech LLC. (Abraham, Joshua)
July 3, 2019 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Joshua E. Abraham in Support re: #11 MOTION to Dismiss .. Document filed by Humbletech LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Abraham, Joshua)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by Humbletech LLC.(Abraham, Joshua)
June 19, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Humbletech LLC answer due 7/3/2019. (kv)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/19/2019) (kv)
June 19, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Joshua E. Abraham dated June 19, 2019. Document filed by Humbletech LLC.(Abraham, Joshua)
June 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joshua Eli Abraham on behalf of Humbletech LLC. (Abraham, Joshua)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, September 27, 2019 at 3:15pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 03:15 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/12/2019) (kv)
June 5, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Humbletech LLC served on 5/29/2019, answer due 6/19/2019. Service was accepted by Paul Hopeck. Document filed by Smart Team Global LLC. (Barbatsuly, George)
May 28, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Humbletech LLC. (pc)
May 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
May 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
May 28, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
May 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney George Peter Barbatsuly. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code New York;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State;. (pc)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Humbletech LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Smart Team Global LLC. (Barbatsuly, George)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Barbatsuly, George)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Smart Team Global LLC.(Barbatsuly, George)
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Humbletech LLC, Lin Li. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16953586)Document filed by Smart Team Global LLC.(Barbatsuly, George)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smart Team Global LLC v. Humbletech LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Humbletech LLC
Represented By: Joshua Eli Abraham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lin Li
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Smart Team Global LLC
Represented By: George Peter Barbatsuly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?