Tianhai Lace USA, Inc. v. Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tianhai Lace USA, Inc.
Defendant: Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., DOES 1-10 and Frame LA Brands, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv04879
Filed: May 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Colleen McMahon
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 20 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Saturday Brand USA, Inc. for Frame LA Brands, LLC. Document filed by Frame LA Brands, LLC.(Convissar, Craig)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Ok. Response due 8/9/19 for both Defendants. Pl's reply due 8/14/19. Frame LA Brands, LLC answer due 8/9/2019; Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. answer due 8/9/2019. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/22/2019) (mml)
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Move Or Otherwise Respond To The Complaint, addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Craig A. Convissar dated July 19, 2019. Document filed by Frame LA Brands, LLC, Neiman Marcus Group, Inc..(Convissar, Craig)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Craig Andrew Convissar on behalf of Frame LA Brands, LLC, Neiman Marcus Group, Inc.. (Convissar, Craig)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: OK. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 7/12/2019) (jwh)
July 10, 2019 Filing 15 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Joint Case Management Plan addressed to Judge Colleen McMahon from Cameron Reuber dated July 10, 2019. Document filed by Tianhai Lace USA, Inc..(Reuber, Cameron)
July 9, 2019 Filing 14 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. Service was accepted by Amy McLaren, Managing Agent. Document filed by Tianhai Lace USA, Inc.. (Reuber, Cameron)
July 9, 2019 Filing 13 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint,. Frame LA Brands, LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. Service was accepted by Lindsey Lewis, Office Manager. Document filed by Tianhai Lace USA, Inc.. (Reuber, Cameron)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SCHEDULING AN INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 24A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Colleen McMahon. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 6/12/2019) (mro)
May 29, 2019 Filing 11 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Reuber, Cameron)
May 28, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Neiman Marcus Group, Inc.. (pne)
May 28, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Frame LA Brands, LLC. (pne)
May 28, 2019 Filing 8 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - CASE OPENING - SUBMITTED. In compliance with the provisions of 17 U.S.C. 508, the Register of Copyrights is hereby advised that a court action has been filed on the following copyright(s) in the U.S. District Court Southern District of New York. Form e-mailed to Register of Copyrights. (pne)
May 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Cameron Sean Reuber. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Does 1-10, Frame LA Brands, LLC, Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., Tianhai Lace USA, Inc.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (pne)
May 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Cameron Sean Reuber. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Jury Demand code n (None); County code Albany. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Jury Demand code has been modified to p (Plaintiff); the County code has been modified to Westchester. (pne)
May 28, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Cameron Sean Reuber to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the form used for the civil cover sheet is not the S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet form dated June 2017. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (pne)
May 28, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
May 28, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
May 28, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Colleen McMahon. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
May 24, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Peter T Busch on behalf of Tianhai Lace USA, Inc.. (Busch, Peter)
May 24, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Neiman Marcus Group, Inc., re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Tianhai Lace USA, Inc.. (Reuber, Cameron)
May 24, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to FRAME LA BRANDS, LLC, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Tianhai Lace USA, Inc.. (Reuber, Cameron)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Tianhai Lace USA, Inc..(Reuber, Cameron)
May 24, 2019 Filing 3 AO 121 FORM COPYRIGHT - NOTICE OF SUBMISSION BY ATTORNEY. AO 121 Form Copyright for case opening submitted to court for review.(Reuber, Cameron)
May 24, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Reuber, Cameron) Modified on 5/28/2019 (pne).
May 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against DOES 1-10, Frame LA Brands, LLC, Neiman Marcus Group, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16954312)Document filed by Tianhai Lace USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Reuber, Cameron)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tianhai Lace USA, Inc. v. Neiman Marcus Group, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Neiman Marcus Group, Inc.
Represented By: Craig Andrew Convissar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frame LA Brands, LLC
Represented By: Craig Andrew Convissar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tianhai Lace USA, Inc.
Represented By: Cameron Sean Reuber
Represented By: Peter T Busch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?