In Re: Fairfield Sentry Limited
Appellee: Rothschild Lugano Dublin, Quasar Funds SPC, ABN AMRO Schweiz AG, Rothschild Bank AG Zurich (Dublin), Banca Arner SA, Compagnie Bancaire Helvetique, Verwaltungs und Privat - Bank AG Aktiengesellschaft (AMS), Credit Suisse AG Zurich, BCV AMC Defensive Al Fund, UBS AG New York, NBK Banque Privee Suisse SA, Pictet & Cie, Centrum Bank AG (AMS), PKB Privatbank AG, National Bank of Kuwait, Rothschild Bank Geneva (Dublin), Lloyds TSB Bank Geneva, RBS Coutts Bank Ltd., Liechtensteinische LB Reinvest AMS, Caceis Bank Luxembourg, Six SIS Ltd., Banque Cantonale Vaudoise, Finter Bank Zurich, Societe Generale Bank & Trust, Corner Banca SA, EFG Bank SA Switzerland, Allianzbank SPA/Unifortune Conservative Side Pocket, Rothschild Bank AG, BSI Ex Banca Del Gottardo, Banca Unione di Credito, Quasar Fund SPC Class A and Class B CGCNV, Harmony Capital Fund Ltd., Dexia Banque Internationale a Luxembourg, BNP Paribas (Suisse) SA, Falcon Private Bank, Bank J. Safra Sarasin AG, Dresdner Bank Schweiz, Banca Privata Edmond de Rothschild Lugano S.A., Incore Bank AG, Fairfield Investment GCI, BNP Paribas (Suisse) SA Ex Fortis, BSI AG, Lombard Odier Darier Hentsch & Cie, FIF Advanced Ltd., HSBC, BNP Paribas (Suisse) SA Private, LGT Bank in Liechtenstein AG, EFG Eurofinancier D'Invest MCL, UBS Jersey Nominees, RBC Dexia Investor Service Julius Baer Sicav, UBS AG Zurich, Clariden Leu Ltd., Vorarlberger Landes UND Hypothekenbank Aktiengesellschaft, BBVA (Suisse) SA, SIS Seeganintersettle, Bank Hapoalim Switzerland Ltd., Fairfield Investment Fund Ltd., Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd., Edmond de Rothschild (Suisse) S.A., Ihag Handelsbank AG, T1 Global Fund Ltd. and ABN AMRO
Appellant: Fairfield Sentry Limited (In Liquidation), Kenneth Krys and Fairfield Sigma Limited (In Liquidation)
In Re: Fairfield Sentry Limited
Case Number: 1:2019cv04964
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Thomas James Giblin on behalf of ABN AMRO Schweiz AG. (Giblin, Thomas)
July 22, 2019 Filing 8 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent CBI Holding SA for ABN AMRO Schweiz AG. Document filed by ABN AMRO Schweiz AG.(Harris, Christopher)
July 22, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher R. Harris on behalf of ABN AMRO Schweiz AG. (Harris, Christopher)
June 28, 2019 Filing 6 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Caceis S.A., Other Affiliate Caceis Bank, Other Affiliate Credit Agricole S.A. for Caceis Bank Luxembourg. Document filed by Caceis Bank Luxembourg.(Vicens, Elizabeth)
June 28, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Matthew Aglialoro on behalf of Caceis Bank Luxembourg. (Aglialoro, Matthew)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elizabeth Vicens on behalf of Caceis Bank Luxembourg. (Vicens, Elizabeth)
June 5, 2019 Magistrate Judge Gabriel W. Gorenstein is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (bcu)
June 5, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Judge Unassigned is no longer assigned to the case. (bcu)
June 5, 2019 CASE ACCEPTED AS RELATED. Create association to 1:19-cv-03911-VSB. Notice of Assignment to follow. (bcu)
May 29, 2019 Filing 3 STATEMENT OF RELATEDNESS re: that this action be filed as related to 19-cv-03911. Document filed by Fairfield Sentry Limited (In Liquidation), Fairfield Sigma Limited (In Liquidation), Kenneth Krys.(Molton, David)
May 29, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (bkar)
May 29, 2019 BANKRUPTCY APPEAL CASE REFERRED BY ATTORNEY TO Judge Vernon S. Broderick as possibly related to 19-cv-3911. (bkar)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (bkar)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF APPEAL FROM THE BANKRUPTCY COURT TO THE S.D.N.Y. from the Order of Judge Stuart M. Bernstein dated April 15, 2019. Bankruptcy Court Case Numbers: 10-3635A, 10-B-13164 (SMB). Certified copies of file received.Document filed by Fairfield Sentry Limited (In Liquidation), Fairfield Sigma Limited (In Liquidation), Kenneth Krys. (Attachments: #1 Schedule A, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C)(bkar)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Fairfield Sentry Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rothschild Lugano Dublin
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Quasar Funds SPC
Represented By: Norris David Wolff
Represented By: Matthew J. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ABN AMRO Schweiz AG
Represented By: Christopher Harris
Represented By: Thomas James Giblin
Represented By: Christopher R. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rothschild Bank AG Zurich (Dublin)
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banca Arner SA
Represented By: Christopher P. Hall
Represented By: Rachel Ehrlich Albanese
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Compagnie Bancaire Helvetique
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Verwaltungs und Privat - Bank AG Aktiengesellschaft (AMS)
Represented By: David M. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Credit Suisse AG Zurich
Represented By: Daniel Steven Shamah
Represented By: William Joseph Sushon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BCV AMC Defensive Al Fund
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UBS AG New York
Represented By: Marshall Ross King
Represented By: Gabriel Herrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: NBK Banque Privee Suisse SA
Represented By: Richard A. Cirillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Pictet & Cie
Represented By: Emil A. Kleinhaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Centrum Bank AG (AMS)
Represented By: David M. Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: PKB Privatbank AG
Represented By: George Whitcomb Shuster
Represented By: Charles C. Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: National Bank of Kuwait
Represented By: Richard A. Cirillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rothschild Bank Geneva (Dublin)
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lloyds TSB Bank Geneva
Represented By: Anthony L. Paccione
Represented By: Mark Thomas Ciani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RBS Coutts Bank Ltd.
Represented By: Anthony L. Paccione
Represented By: Mark Thomas Ciani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Liechtensteinische LB Reinvest AMS
Represented By: Jascha Daniel Preuss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Caceis Bank Luxembourg
Represented By: Polina Markovna Bensman
Represented By: Elizabeth Vicens
Represented By: Lawrence B. Friedman
Represented By: Matthew Aglialoro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Six SIS Ltd.
Represented By: Erin Elaine Valentine
Represented By: Andreas Albert Frischknecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banque Cantonale Vaudoise
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Finter Bank Zurich
Represented By: George Whitcomb Shuster
Represented By: Charles C. Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Societe Generale Bank & Trust
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Corner Banca SA
Represented By: George Whitcomb Shuster
Represented By: Charles C. Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: EFG Bank SA Switzerland
Represented By: Adam Michael Lavine
Represented By: David Farrington Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Allianzbank SPA/Unifortune Conservative Side Pocket
Represented By: Kimberly Perrotta Cole
Represented By: Sara Berkowitz Gribbon
Represented By: Richard Beryl Levin
Represented By: Jonathan David Cogan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Rothschild Bank AG
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BSI Ex Banca Del Gottardo
Represented By: Adam Michael Lavine
Represented By: David Farrington Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banca Unione di Credito
Represented By: Adam Michael Lavine
Represented By: David Farrington Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Quasar Fund SPC Class A and Class B CGCNV
Represented By: Norris David Wolff
Represented By: Matthew J. Gold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Harmony Capital Fund Ltd.
Represented By: Anthony L. Paccione
Represented By: Mark Thomas Ciani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dexia Banque Internationale a Luxembourg
Represented By: Jeff Edward Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BNP Paribas (Suisse) SA
Represented By: Ari David MacKinnon
Represented By: Breon Stacey Peace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Falcon Private Bank
Represented By: Andrew Mark Troop
Represented By: Eric Xinis Fishman
Represented By: Samuel S. Cavior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank J. Safra Sarasin AG
Represented By: Jeffrey T. Scott
Represented By: Andrew John Finn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Dresdner Bank Schweiz
Represented By: Alexander Lees
Represented By: Stacey Jill Rappaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Banca Privata Edmond de Rothschild Lugano S.A.
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Incore Bank AG
Represented By: Andrew Mark Troop
Represented By: Eric Xinis Fishman
Represented By: Samuel S. Cavior
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fairfield Investment GCI
Represented By: Maxwell George Dillan
Represented By: Fletcher William Strong
Represented By: Frederick Reed Kessler
Represented By: Paul DeFilippo
Represented By: William Andrew Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BNP Paribas (Suisse) SA Ex Fortis
Represented By: Ari David MacKinnon
Represented By: Breon Stacey Peace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BSI AG
Represented By: Adam Michael Lavine
Represented By: David Farrington Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Lombard Odier Darier Hentsch & Cie
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: FIF Advanced Ltd.
Represented By: Maxwell George Dillan
Represented By: Fletcher William Strong
Represented By: Frederick Reed Kessler
Represented By: Paul DeFilippo
Represented By: William Andrew Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: HSBC
Represented By: Thomas J. Moloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BNP Paribas (Suisse) SA Private
Represented By: Ari David MacKinnon
Represented By: Breon Stacey Peace
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: LGT Bank in Liechtenstein AG
Represented By: Alexander Lees
Represented By: Stacey Jill Rappaport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: EFG Eurofinancier D'Invest MCL
Represented By: Adam Michael Lavine
Represented By: David Farrington Yates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UBS Jersey Nominees
Represented By: Marshall Ross King
Represented By: Gabriel Herrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: RBC Dexia Investor Service Julius Baer Sicav
Represented By: Anthony L. Paccione
Represented By: Mark Thomas Ciani
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: UBS AG Zurich
Represented By: Marshall Ross King
Represented By: Gabriel Herrmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Clariden Leu Ltd.
Represented By: Daniel Steven Shamah
Represented By: William Joseph Sushon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Vorarlberger Landes UND Hypothekenbank Aktiengesellschaft
Represented By: Stephen M. Harnik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: BBVA (Suisse) SA
Represented By: Keith Palfin
Represented By: Heather Lamberg Kafele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: SIS Seeganintersettle
Represented By: Erin Elaine Valentine
Represented By: Andreas Albert Frischknecht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank Hapoalim Switzerland Ltd.
Represented By: Scott Sonny Balber
Represented By: Jonathan Christopher Cross
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Fairfield Investment Fund Ltd.
Represented By: Maxwell George Dillan
Represented By: Fletcher William Strong
Represented By: Frederick Reed Kessler
Represented By: Paul DeFilippo
Represented By: William Andrew Maher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Bank Julius Baer & Co. Ltd.
Represented By: Virginia I Weber
Represented By: Eric B. Halper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Edmond de Rothschild (Suisse) S.A.
Represented By: John F. Zulack
Represented By: Lauren Jill Pincus
Represented By: Bianca Lin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ihag Handelsbank AG
Represented By: George Whitcomb Shuster
Represented By: Charles C. Platt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: T1 Global Fund Ltd.
Represented By: Christopher A. Lynch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: ABN AMRO
Represented By: Christopher Harris
Represented By: Thomas James Giblin
Represented By: Christopher R. Harris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Fairfield Sentry Limited (In Liquidation)
Represented By: Marek Patrick Krzyzowski
Represented By: Ronald John Krock, II
Represented By: David Lawrence Elsberg
Represented By: David J. Molton
Represented By: Yelena Konanova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Kenneth Krys
Represented By: Marek Patrick Krzyzowski
Represented By: Ronald John Krock, II
Represented By: David Lawrence Elsberg
Represented By: David J. Molton
Represented By: Yelena Konanova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Fairfield Sigma Limited (In Liquidation)
Represented By: Marek Patrick Krzyzowski
Represented By: Ronald John Krock, II
Represented By: David Lawrence Elsberg
Represented By: David J. Molton
Represented By: Yelena Konanova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Fairfield Sentry Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?