Consiglio v. New York State Civil Service Commission et al
Plaintiff: Karen Consiglio
Defendant: Anatapur Panduranga, in his official capacity, Richard Ciulla, individually, New York State Office for People with Developmental Disabilities, Anatapur Panduranga, individually, New York State Civil Service Commission, Richard Ciulla, in his official capacity, Anatapur Panduranga and Richard Ciulla
Case Number: 1:2019cv04997
Filed: May 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #11 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. APPLICATION GRANTED. SO ORDERED. (Richard Ciulla(individually) answer due 8/27/2019; Richard Ciulla(in his official capacity) answer due 8/27/2019; New York State Civil Service Commission answer due 8/27/2019; New York State Office for People with Developmental Disabilities answer due 8/27/2019; Anatapur Panduranga(in his official capacity) answer due 8/27/2019; Anatapur Panduranga(individually) answer due 8/27/2019.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 7/8/2019) (rro)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer on Consent addressed to Judge Vernon S. Broderick from Shari M. Goodstein dated July 3, 2019. Document filed by Richard Ciulla(individually), Richard Ciulla(in his official capacity), New York State Civil Service Commission, New York State Office for People with Developmental Disabilities, Anatapur Panduranga(in his official capacity), Anatapur Panduranga(individually).(Goodstein, Shari)
June 14, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anatapur Panduranga. (dnh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Richard Ciulla.(dnh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York State Office for People with Developmental Disabilities. (dnh)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York State Civil Service Commission. (dnh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to ANATAPUR PANDURANGA, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Karen Consiglio. (Allen, Rachel)
June 13, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to RICHARD CIULLA, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Karen Consiglio. (Allen, Rachel)
June 13, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NEW YORK STATE OFFICE FOR PEOPLE WITH DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITIES, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Karen Consiglio. (Allen, Rachel)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to NEW YORK STATE CIVIL SERVICE COMMISSION, re: #1 Complaint,. Document filed by Karen Consiglio. (Allen, Rachel)
May 30, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
May 30, 2019 Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
May 30, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
May 29, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Allen, Rachel)
May 29, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Richard Ciulla, in his official capacity, Richard Ciulla, individually, New York State Civil Service Commission, New York State Office for People with Developmental Disabilities, Anatapur Panduranga, in his official capacity, Anatapur Panduranga, individually. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16980498)Document filed by Karen Consiglio.(Allen, Rachel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Consiglio v. New York State Civil Service Commission et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anatapur Panduranga, in his official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Ciulla, individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Office for People with Developmental Disabilities
Represented By: Shari M. Goodstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anatapur Panduranga, individually
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York State Civil Service Commission
Represented By: Shari M. Goodstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Ciulla, in his official capacity
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anatapur Panduranga
Represented By: Shari M. Goodstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Ciulla
Represented By: Shari M. Goodstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Consiglio
Represented By: Rachel Adele Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?