Dicarlo v. Best Western International, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Dicarlo
Defendant: Best Western International, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05052
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Kevin Nathaniel Fox
Referring Judge: Paul G Gardephe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441ada
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 LETTER addressed to Judge Paul G. Gardephe from Evan B. Citron dated June 6, 2019 re: Request for a Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Best Western International, Inc..(Citron, Evan)
June 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for General Pretrial (includes scheduling, discovery, non-dispositive pretrial motions, and settlement). Referred to Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox. (Signed by Judge Paul G. Gardephe on 6/3/2019) (cf)
May 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Evan Benjamin Citron. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Best Western International, Inc., David Dicarlo. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly; party text was omitted. (pne)
May 31, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
May 31, 2019 Magistrate Judge Kevin Nathaniel Fox is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
May 31, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul G. Gardephe. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
May 30, 2019 Filing 3 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Best Western International, Inc..(Citron, Evan)
May 30, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Citron, Evan)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court of the State of New York, County of New York. Case Number: 153398/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16988167).Document filed by Best Western International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint)(Citron, Evan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dicarlo v. Best Western International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Dicarlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Best Western International, Inc.
Represented By: Evan Benjamin Citron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?