Kay v. Lavry Engineering, Inc
Plaintiff: Benny Kay
Defendant: Lavry Engineering, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv05059
Filed: May 30, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Andrew L Carter
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER denying as moot #7 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Amend. The Court is in receipt of the parties' letters dated July 1, 2019 and July 5, 2019, concerning Defendant's request for a pre-motion conference. ECF No. 6 & 7. Given that Plaintiff has amended his complaint, ECF No. 9, Defendant's request for a pre-motion conference is DENIED as moot. (Signed by Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr on 7/25/2019) (rro)
July 19, 2019 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Lavry Engineering, Inc.Document filed by Benny Kay. Related document: #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit AES Standard, #2 Exhibit Diagram of front of DA10, #3 Exhibit 2008 vs 2010 DA10 manuals, #4 Exhibit 6/26/18 email correspondence with Lavry, #5 Exhibit expert analysis and quote, #6 Exhibit repetition with DA10)(Reich, Carter)
July 9, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by James Erik Breitenbucher on behalf of Lavry Engineering, Inc. (Breitenbucher, James)
July 5, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend #6 Letter, #1 Complaint and in response to Defendant's letter requesting a pre-motion conference (motion to dismiss) addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from Carter A. Reich dated July 5, 2019. Document filed by Benny Kay.(Reich, Carter)
July 1, 2019 Filing 6 LETTER addressed to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. from James E. Breitenbucher dated July 1, 2019 re: Requesting Pre-Motion Conference. Document filed by Lavry Engineering, Inc.(Breitenbucher, James)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Lavry Engineering, Inc served on 6/8/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. Service was accepted by Marc Lavry. Document filed by Benny Kay. (Reich, Carter)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lavry Engineering, Inc. (pc)
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Lavry Engineering, Inc., re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Benny Kay. (Reich, Carter)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Reich, Carter)
May 31, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (sj)
May 31, 2019 Magistrate Judge Henry B. Pitman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (sj)
May 31, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Andrew L. Carter, Jr. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (sj)
May 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Carter August Reich. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code (none); Dollar Demand $583,000,000. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332; the Dollar Demand has been modified to $583,000. (sj)
May 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Carter August Reich. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (sj)
May 30, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Lavry Engineering, Inc. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-16989202)Document filed by Benny Kay.(Reich, Carter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kay v. Lavry Engineering, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benny Kay
Represented By: Carter August Reich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lavry Engineering, Inc
Represented By: James Erik Breitenbucher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?