E.I. et al v. New York City Department Of Education
Plaintiff: E.I.
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2019cv05166
Filed: June 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1400
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #2 Complaint. Application GRANTED. All other deadlines remain as set in the IPTC Notice. See Dkt. 7. SO ORDERED. New York City Department of Education answer due 9/9/2019 (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/26/2019) (jca)
June 26, 2019 Filing 9 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #2 Complaint addressed to Judge Valerie E. Caproni from Jill Ellman dated June 26, 2019. Document filed by New York City Department of Education.(Ellman, Jill)
June 26, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jill Amy Ellman on behalf of New York City Department of Education. (Ellman, Jill)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE FOR CASES FILED UNDER 20 U.S.C. 1415(i)(3): Initial Conference set for 9/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 443, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Valerie E. Caproni. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Valerie E. Caproni on 6/20/2019) (jca)
June 7, 2019 Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to New York City Department of Education. (dnh)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by E.I.(individually,), E.I.(and on behalf of H.I., a child with a disability ). (Spratt, Andrea)
June 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Andrea Spratt to RE-FILE Document No. #4 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the filers were not selected;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to New York City Department of Education, re: #2 Complaint. Document filed by E.I.(individually,). (Spratt, Andrea) Modified on 6/5/2019 (jgo).
June 3, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Spratt, Andrea)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against New York City Department of Education. Document filed by E.I.(individually,).(Spratt, Andrea)
June 3, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
June 3, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
June 3, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
June 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Andrea Spratt. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: E.I. ; H.I.. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party text was entered incorrectly. (dnh)
June 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Andrea Spratt. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (dnh)
June 3, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Andrea Spratt to RE-FILE Document No. #1 Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the wrong filer/filers were selected for the pleading; All of the filers selected are not official parties of record. Re-file the pleading using the event type Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
June 2, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - FILER ERROR COMPLAINT against New York City Department Of Education ("DOE"). (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17000897)Document filed by E.I., H.I..(Spratt, Andrea) Modified on 6/3/2019 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: E.I. et al v. New York City Department Of Education
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New York City Department of Education
Represented By: Jill Amy Ellman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: E.I.
Represented By: Andrea Spratt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?