Hensley v. Kirby Offshore Marine, Inc. et al

Plaintiff: Jon Hensley
Defendant: Kirby Offshore Marine, Inc., Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, LLC and Penn Maritime, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05221
Filed: June 4, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: John G Koeltl
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 46:30104
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2019 Filing 15 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Kirby Corporation, Other Affiliate Kirby Offshore Marine, LLC for Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, LLC. Document filed by Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, LLC.(Canevari, Thomas)
July 31, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY ERROR. Notice to Attorney Thomas Mark Canevari to RE-FILE Document #12 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement. ERROR(S): Not All Corporate Parents/Other affiliates were added. Please re-file this document and when prompted: Are there any corporate parents or other affiliates?, select the YES radio button and enter the Corporate Parent(s) or Affiliate(s). (ldi)
July 30, 2019 Filing 14 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint,. Document filed by Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, LLC, Penn Maritime, Inc..(Canevari, Thomas)
July 30, 2019 Filing 13 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Kirby Corporation for Penn Maritime, Inc.. Document filed by Penn Maritime, Inc..(Canevari, Thomas)
July 30, 2019 Filing 12 FILING ERROR - NOT ALL CORPORATE PARENTS/OTHER AFFILIATES WERE ADDED - RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Kirby Corporation for Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, LLC. Document filed by Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, LLC.(Canevari, Thomas) Modified on 7/31/2019 (ldi).
July 26, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Dismissal of Defendant Kirby Offshore Marine, Inc.. Document filed by Jon Hensley. (O'Bryan, Dennis)
July 25, 2019 ADD PARTY FOR PLEADING. Defendants/Respondents Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, LLC, Kirby Offshore Marine, Inc., Penn Maritime, Inc. added. Party added pursuant to #10 Amended Complaint,.Document filed by Jon Hensley. Related document: #10 Amended Complaint,.(O'Bryan, Dennis)
July 25, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Dennis Michael O'Bryan re: Document No. #10 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): all of the parties listed on the pleading were not entered on CM ECF. Add party Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, LLC;. Docket the event type Add Party to Pleading found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents... (jgo)
July 24, 2019 Filing 10 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending #1 Complaint against Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, LLC, Penn Maritime, Inc..Document filed by Jon Hensley. Related document: #1 Complaint.(O'Bryan, Dennis) Modified on 7/25/2019 (jgo).
July 15, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge John G. Koeltl: Initial Conference set for 9/4/2019 at 04:30 PM in Courtroom 14A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge John G. Koeltl. (Fletcher, Donnie)
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, LLC, Kirby Offshore Marine, Inc.. (dnh)
July 12, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kirby Offshore Marine, Inc and Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jon Hensley. (O'Bryan, Dennis)
June 18, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. #7 MOTION for Dennis M. O'Bryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (bcu)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION for Dennis M. O'Bryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jon Hensley. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Affidavit of Dennis M. O'Bryan, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(O'Bryan, Dennis)
June 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Dennis Michael O'Bryan to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): both party names whom summons is being requested for must be included on the PDF 'To' section;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
June 5, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 5, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
June 5, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge John G. Koeltl. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
June 5, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT RELATED CASE STATEMENT. Notice to attorney Dennis Michael O'Bryan to RE-FILE Document No. #5 Statement of Relatedness,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the related case statement is not correct; (jgo)
June 4, 2019 >>>NOTICE REGARDING DEFICIENT MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE. Notice to RE-FILE Document No. #4 MOTION for Dennis M. O'Bryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17013817. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff... The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): missing Certificate of Good Standing from Supreme Court of Texas and Michigan; missing Proposed Order; Pursuant to Rule 1.3. the Attorney Affidavit missing the language of disciplinary.;. Re-file the motion as a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice - attach the correct signed PDF - select the correct named filer/filers - attach valid Certificates of Good Standing issued within the past 30 days - attach Proposed Order.. (wb)
June 4, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - PROPOSED ORDER. Document filed by Jon Hensley. Related Document Number: #4 . (O'Bryan, Dennis) Proposed Order to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Modified on 6/4/2019 (wb).
June 4, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - RELATED CASE AFFIDAVIT of Dennis M. O'Bryan re: that this action be filed as related to 19-05221. Document filed by Jon Hensley.(O'Bryan, Dennis) Modified on 6/5/2019 (jgo).
June 4, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - MOTION for Dennis M. O'Bryan to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17013817. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Jon Hensley.(O'Bryan, Dennis) Modified on 6/4/2019 (wb).
June 4, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Kirby Offshore Marine, Inc. and Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jon Hensley. (O'Bryan, Dennis) Modified on 6/5/2019 (jgo).
June 4, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (O'Bryan, Dennis)
June 4, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, LLC, Kirby Offshore Marine, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17012155)Document filed by Jon Hensley.(O'Bryan, Dennis)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hensley v. Kirby Offshore Marine, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirby Offshore Marine, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kirby Offshore Marine Operating, LLC
Represented By: Thomas Mark Canevari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penn Maritime, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Mark Canevari
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Hensley
Represented By: Dennis Michael O'Bryan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?