Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. Vista Engineering Corp.
Petitioner: The New York City District Council of Carpenters, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, The New York City and Vicinity Carpenters Labor-Management Corporation and Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund
Respondent: Vista Engineering Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05280
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Vernon S Broderick
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 8, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of 6.7.19 Order served on Vista Engineering Corp. on June 10, 2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, an authorized person in the Corporation Division of the Department of State. Document filed by The New York City District Council of Carpenters, The New York City and Vicinity Carpenters Labor-Management Corporation, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund. (Marimon, Nicole)
June 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Vista Engineering Corp. served on 6/10/2019, answer due 8/5/2019. Service was accepted by Sue Zouky, an authorized person in the Corporation Division of the Department of State. Document filed by Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund ; The New York City District Council of Carpenters; The New York City and Vicinity Carpenters Labor-Management Corporation; Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund. (Marimon, Nicole)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Vista Engineering Corp. answer due 8/5/2019. (rro)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: ORDERED that Petitioners shall file and serve any additional materials with which they intend to support their petition for confirmation by July 8, 2019. Respondent's opposition, if any, is due on August 5, 2019. Petitioners' reply, if any, is due on August 19, 2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Petitioners shall serve a copy of this Order on Respondent and to file an affidavit on ECF certifying that such service has been effected. SO ORDERED. (Responses due by 8/5/2019, Replies due by 8/19/2019.) (Signed by Judge Vernon S. Broderick on 6/7/2019) (rro)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Vista Engineering Corp.. (pne)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Case Designated ECF. (pne)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vernon S. Broderick. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,, . Document filed by The New York City District Council of Carpenters, The New York City and Vicinity Carpenters Labor-Management Corporation, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund. (Marimon, Nicole)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by The New York City District Council of Carpenters, The New York City and Vicinity Carpenters Labor-Management Corporation, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund.(Marimon, Nicole)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Vista Engineering Corp., re: #1 Petition to Compel/Confirm/Modify/Stay/Vacate Arbitration,,. Document filed by The New York City District Council of Carpenters, The New York City and Vicinity Carpenters Labor-Management Corporation, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund, Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund. (Marimon, Nicole)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Marimon, Nicole)
June 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 1 PETITION TO CONFIRM ARBITRATION. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17023758).Document filed by Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund, The New York City District Council of Carpenters, The New York City and Vicinity Carpenters Labor-Management Corporation, Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Errata G)(Marimon, Nicole)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund et al v. Vista Engineering Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Vista Engineering Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The New York City District Council of Carpenters
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees Of The New York City Carpenters Relief and Charity Fund
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: The New York City and Vicinity Carpenters Labor-Management Corporation
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Trustees Of The New York City District Council Of Carpenters Pension Fund, Welfare Fund, Annuity Fund, and Apprenticeship, Journeyman Retraining, Educational and Industry Fund
Represented By: Nicole Marimon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?