Lajara v. United States of America

Plaintiff: Jacqueline Lajara
Defendant: United States of America
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: UNITED STATE OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv05361
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: William H Pauley
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346t
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Filing 9 CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to respond to the complaint addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Samuel Dolinger dated 8/5/2019., CONSENT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference scheduled for August 15, 2019 addressed to Judge William H. Pauley, III from Samuel Dolinger dated 8/5/2019. Document filed by United States of America.(Dolinger, Samuel)
July 18, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. All Defendants. Service was accepted by OSRICH GORDON - AUTHORIZED CLERK. Service was made by MAIL-US ATTORNEY GENERAL. Document filed by Jacqueline Lajara. (LiCalzi, James)
July 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Samuel Hilliard Dolinger on behalf of United States of America. (Dolinger, Samuel)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER FOR INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 20B, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge William H. Pauley III and further set forth in this Order. (Signed by Judge William H. Pauley, III on 6/19/2019) (rro)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to United States of America. (dnh)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jacqueline Lajara. (LiCalzi, James)
June 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney James N LiCalzi to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the issuance of summons is not correct. The PDF must be the official AO 440 form dated June 2012; party name on 'as to' docket entry text and the PDF 'To' section is not a party of record;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (jgo)
June 10, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 10, 2019 Magistrate Judge Sarah Netburn is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
June 10, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge William H. Pauley, III. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
June 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney James N LiCalzi. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: United States of America. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name was entered in all caps; party role was entered incorrectly;. (jgo)
June 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney James N LiCalzi. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1402; Fee Status code pend (IFP pending);. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1346; the Fee Status code has been modified to pd (paid);. (jgo)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to United States Attorney, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Jacqueline Lajara. (LiCalzi, James) Modified on 6/10/2019 (jgo).
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (LiCalzi, James)
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATE OF AMERICA. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17041138)Document filed by Jacqueline Lajara.(LiCalzi, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lajara v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacqueline Lajara
Represented By: James N LiCalzi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: UNITED STATE OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Represented By: Samuel Hilliard Dolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?