Sorodsky v. Keyser et al
Petitioner: MICHAIL SORODSKY
Respondent: Wende Correctional Facility, New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision, Woodbourne Correctional Facility, SUPERINTENDENT William F. Keyser, People of The State of New York, Eastern Correctional Facility, William F. Keyser, Jr., Wende C.F., Eastern C.F., New York State Department of Correction and Community Supervision and Woodbourne C.F.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05389
Filed: June 7, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Paul A Engelmayer
Referring Judge: Barbara C Moses
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 st
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Mailed a copy of #13 Order to Answer, #5 Amended Petition, to Attorney General of the State of New York by certified mail to 28 Liberty Street, New York, New York, 10005 by Certified Mail # 7007 0220 0001 9979 1219. (nb)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO ANSWER, 28 U.S.C. 2254: The above-referenced habeas corpus action has been referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara Moses for report and recommendation. (Dkt. No. 12.) The Court, having examined this petition under 28 U.S.C. 2254, hereby ORDERS that: The Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of this order on the Attorney General of the State of New York by certified mail to 28 Liberty Street, New York, New York, 10005. Within sixty days of the date of this order, Respondents Keyser and the New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision shall file and serve (1) an answer to the petition and (2) the transcripts and briefs identified in Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Petitioner may file and serve reply papers, if any, within thirty days from the date he is served with Respondent's answer. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses on 7/11/2019) (cf) Transmission to Pro Se Assistants for processing.
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REFERRING CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. Order that case be referred to the Clerk of Court for assignment to a Magistrate Judge for Habeas Corpus. Referred to Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses. (Signed by Judge Paul A. Engelmayer on 6/10/2019) (anc)
June 10, 2019 Filing 11 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Petition for Habeas Corpus, Memorandum of Law in Support, Affirmation of Counsel with Exhibits, Individual Rules of Judge Engelmayer served on People of the State of New York on June 10, 2019. Service was accepted by PUJA NAG, CLERK. Document filed by Michail Sorodsky. (Kushner, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 10 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Petition for Habeas Corpus, Memorandum of Law in Support, Affirmation of Counsel with Exhibits, Individual Rules of Judge Engelmayer served on Wende C.F. on June 10, 2019. Service was accepted by PUJA NAG, CLERK. Document filed by Michail Sorodsky. (Kushner, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 9 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Petition for Habeas Corpus, Memorandum of Law in Support, Affirmation of Counsel with Exhibits, Individual Rules of Judge Engelmayer served on Eastern C.F. on June 10, 2019. Service was accepted by PUJA NAG, CLERK. Document filed by Michail Sorodsky. (Kushner, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Petition for Habeas Corpus, Memorandum of Law in Support, Affirmation of Counsel with Exhibits, Individual Rules of Judge Engelmayer served on Woodbourne, C.F. on June 10, 2019. Service was accepted by PUJA NAG, CLERK. Document filed by Michail Sorodsky. (Kushner, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 7 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Petition for Habeas Corpus, Memorandum of Law in Support, Affirmation of Counsel with Exhibits, Individual Rules of Judge Engelmayer served on New York State Department of Correction and Community Supervision on June 10, 2019. Service was accepted by PUJA NAG, CLERK. Document filed by Michail Sorodsky. (Kushner, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Petition for Habeas Corpus, Memorandum of Law in Support, Affirmation of Counsel with Exhibits, Individual Rules of Judge Engelmayer served on WILLIAM F. KEYSER, JR. on 06/10/2019. Service was accepted by PUJA NAG, CLERK. Document filed by Michail Sorodsky. (Kushner, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 AMENDED PETITION amending #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, against Eastern C.F., William F. Keyser, Jr., New York State Department of Correction and Community Supervision, People of The State of New York, Wende C.F., Woodbourne C.F..Document filed by Michail Sorodsky. Related document: #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Affidavit Affirmation of Counsel, #3 Exhibit Ex A: Petitioner's Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Ex B: Copy of Decision, People ex re. Negron v. Superintendent, #5 Exhibit Ex C: Parole Revocation Decision Notice, #6 Exhibit Ex D: Medical Records, #7 Exhibit Ex E: State Court Habeas Decision, #8 Exhibit Ex F: Parolee Chrono Report)(Kushner, Michael)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kushner, Michael)
June 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Michael Peter Kushner to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the pleading was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the pleading using the event type Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (dnh)
June 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Michael Peter Kushner. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: MICHAIL SORODSKY ; SUPERINTENDENT William F. Keyser ; New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision ; Woodbourne Correctional Facility ; Eastern Correctional Facility ; Wende Correctional Facility. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party name contained a typographical error; party name was entered in all caps; party text was omitted. (dnh)
June 10, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Paul A. Engelmayer. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
June 10, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Michael Peter Kushner to RE-FILE Document No. #2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; the PDF was not signed by the filing attorney. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (dnh)
June 10, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
June 10, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
June 7, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. Document filed by MICHAIL SORODSKY. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law, #2 Affidavit Affirmation of Counsel, #3 Exhibit Ex A: Petitioner's Affidavit, #4 Exhibit Ex B: Copy of Decision, People ex re. Negron v. Superintendent, #5 Exhibit Ex C: Parole Revocation Decision Notice, #6 Exhibit Ex D: Medical Records, #7 Exhibit Ex E: State Court Habeas Decision, #8 Exhibit Ex F: Parolee Chrono Report)(Kushner, Michael) Modified on 6/10/2019 (dnh).
June 7, 2019 Filing 2 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Kushner, Michael) Modified on 6/10/2019 (dnh).
June 7, 2019 Filing 1 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - SIGNATURE ERROR PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17045204)Document filed by MICHAIL SORODSKY.(Kushner, Michael) Modified on 6/10/2019 (dnh).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sorodsky v. Keyser et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: MICHAIL SORODSKY
Represented By: Michael Peter Kushner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wende Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: New York State Department of Corrections and Community Supervision
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Woodbourne Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: SUPERINTENDENT William F. Keyser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: People of The State of New York
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eastern Correctional Facility
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: William F. Keyser, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Wende C.F.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Eastern C.F.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: New York State Department of Correction and Community Supervision
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Woodbourne C.F.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?