Stewart et al v. Trident General Contracting LLC et al

Plaintiff: Sean Thomas and Michael Stewart
Defendant: Trident General Contracting LLC, John McDonald (A/K/A "Fitz"), John Doe, Darren McNiff, Paul Doe, John McDonald and Fitz
Case Number: 1:2019cv05406
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1331ed
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: According to the affidavit of service filed on July 5, 2019, Defendant John McDonald's answer or other response to the complaint was due on or before July 11, 2019. Dkt. No. 12. As of this date, the Court is not in receipt of Defendant McDonald's answer. Within two weeks of this order, Plaintiffs shall move for default judgment against Defendant McDonald pursuant to this Court's Individual Practices in Civil Cases or file a status update with the Court explaining why a motion for default judgment against Defendant McDonald should not be filed at this time. Plaintiffs are on notice that failure to do so by this date may result in his claim being dismissed with prejudice for failure to prosecute. See United States ex rel. Drake v. Norden Systems, 375 F.3d 248, 250 (2d Cir. 2004) (noting "a district judge's authority to dismiss actions based on a plaintiffs failure to prosecute"). By August 5, 2019, Plaintiffs must serve this order on Defendant McDonald and file an affidavit of service on ECF. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/31/2019) (jca)
July 31, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher Aaron Seacord on behalf of Paul Doe, Darren McNiff, Trident General Contracting LLC. (Seacord, Christopher)
July 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER OF AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION (See M-10-468 Second Amended Standing Order). Please reference the Pilot Discovery Protocols, attached, and the Mediation Program Procedures (http://nysd.uscourts.gov/mediation). E-mail MediationOffice@nysd.uscourts.gov, telephone 212-805-0643. Mediator to be Assigned by 8/12/2019. (Signed by Judge Loretta A. Preska on 10/1/2015) (rpr)
July 30, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint. Document filed by Trident General Contracting LLC.(Blocker, Tanya)
July 30, 2019 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Trident General Contracting LLC.(Blocker, Tanya)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting #19 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Tanya N. Blocker dated July 19, 2019. Document filed by Paul Doe, Darren McNiff, Trident General Contracting LLC. So ordered. Paul Doe answer due 7/30/2019; Darren McNiff answer due 7/30/2019; Trident General Contracting LLC answer due 7/30/2019. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/22/2019) (rjm)
July 19, 2019 Filing 19 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re: #1 Complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Tanya N. Blocker dated July 19, 2019. Document filed by Paul Doe, Darren McNiff, Trident General Contracting LLC.(Blocker, Tanya)
July 19, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven John Fingerhut on behalf of Michael Stewart, Sean Thomas. (Fingerhut, Steven)
July 19, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gregory Calliste, Jr on behalf of Sean Thomas. (Calliste, Gregory)
July 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #14 Letter Motion to Substitute Attorney. SO ORDERED. Attorney Jessica Massimi terminated. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/16/2019) (kv)
July 16, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by H. Joseph Cronen on behalf of Michael Stewart, Sean Thomas. (Cronen, H.)
July 16, 2019 Filing 14 LETTER MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Old Attorney: Jessica Massimi, New Attorney: Steven Fingerhut addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Jessica Massimi dated July 16, 2019. Document filed by Michael Stewart, Sean Thomas.(Massimi, Jessica)
July 16, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Steven John Fingerhut on behalf of Michael Stewart. (Fingerhut, Steven)
July 5, 2019 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Paul Doe served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019; John McDonald served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019; Darren McNiff served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019; Trident General Contracting LLC served on 6/20/2019, answer due 7/11/2019. Service was accepted by TARRA "SMITH" Co-Worker person spoken to refused to state true last name. Document filed by Michael Stewart. (Phillips, William)
June 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/12/2019) (ks)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Trident General Contracting LLC. (jgo)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Paul Doe. (jgo)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to John McDonald. (jgo)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Darren McNiff. (jgo)
June 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
June 11, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
June 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Jessica Massimi. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: John McDonald; Darren McNiff; Paul Doe; John Doe. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted; alias was entered incorrectly. (jgo)
June 10, 2019 Civil Case Opening Fee Payment: for #1 Complaint. Filing fee $ 400.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17049291.(Massimi, Jessica)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Massimi, Jessica)
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Paul Doe, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Stewart, Sean Thomas. (Massimi, Jessica)
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Darren McNiff, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Stewart, Sean Thomas. (Massimi, Jessica)
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to John McDonald (A/K/A "Fitz"), re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Stewart, Sean Thomas. (Massimi, Jessica)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Trident General Contracting LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Michael Stewart, Sean Thomas. (Massimi, Jessica)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against John Doe, Paul Doe, John McDonald (A/K/A "Fitz"), Darren McNiff, Trident General Contracting LLC. Document filed by Michael Stewart, Sean Thomas.(Massimi, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stewart et al v. Trident General Contracting LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trident General Contracting LLC
Represented By: Tanya N. Blocker
Represented By: Christopher Aaron Seacord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McDonald (A/K/A "Fitz")
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darren McNiff
Represented By: Tanya N. Blocker
Represented By: Christopher Aaron Seacord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Doe
Represented By: Tanya N. Blocker
Represented By: Christopher Aaron Seacord
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John McDonald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean Thomas
Represented By: Jessica Massimi
Represented By: Steven John Fingerhut
Represented By: H. Joseph Cronen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Stewart
Represented By: Jessica Massimi
Represented By: Steven John Fingerhut
Represented By: H. Joseph Cronen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?