Moncayo v. United Parcel Service, Inc. et al.

Plaintiff: Mike D Moncayo
Defendant: United Parcel Service General Services Co., Lonnie Mishoe, III and United Parcel Service, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv05415
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Naomi Reice Buchwald
Referring Judge: Kenneth M Karas
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332tn
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 8, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2019 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 7/8/2019. (ade)
June 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: If any defendant has not appeared bycounsel, plaintiff's counsel must forthwith send a copy of this notice to any unrepresented party. IT IS SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 7/8/2019 at 03:45 PM in Courtroom 21A, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. (Signed by Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald on 6/25/2019) (kv)
June 21, 2019 Filing 8 LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Steven P. Orlowski dated June 21, 2019 re: Opposition to Plaintiff's Application to Remand Case to State Court. Document filed by United Parcel Service General Services Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Orlowski, Steven)
June 18, 2019 Filing 7 FIRST LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Jason S. Steinberg dated June 17, 2019 re: Remand. Document filed by Mike D Moncayo.(Steinberg, Jason)
June 18, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO RE-FILE DOCUMENT - EVENT TYPE ERROR. Notice to Attorney Jason Scott Steinberg to RE-FILE Document #6 LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Jason S. Steinberg dated June 17, 2019. Use the event type Letter found under the event list Other Documents. (db)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - WRONG EVENT TYPE SELECTED FROM MENU - LETTER MOTION for Oral Argument addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Jason S. Steinberg dated June 17, 2019. Document filed by Mike D Moncayo.(Steinberg, Jason) Modified on 6/18/2019 (db).
June 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jason Scott Steinberg on behalf of Mike D Moncayo. (Steinberg, Jason)
June 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker is so redesignated. (jc)
June 14, 2019 NOTICE OF CASE REASSIGNMENT to Judge Naomi Reice Buchwald. Judge Kenneth M. Karas is no longer assigned to the case. (jc)
June 12, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal served on BURNS & HARRIS on June 11, 2019. Service was made by mail. Document filed by Lonnie Mishoe, III, United Parcel Service General Services Co., United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Orlowski, Steven)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 DEMAND for Trial by Jury. Document filed by Lonnie Mishoe, III, United Parcel Service General Services Co., United Parcel Service, Inc.(Orlowski, Steven)
June 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Steven P. Orlowski. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Westchester. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to XX Out of State. (pne)
June 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Steven P. Orlowski. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: United Parcel Service, Inc., United Parcel Service General Services Co., Mike D Moncayo, Lonnie Mishoe, III. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party role was entered incorrectly. (pne)
June 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pne)
June 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Paul E. Davison is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pne)
June 11, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Kenneth M. Karas. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pne)
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Attachments: #1 Rule 7.1 Statement)(Orlowski, Steven)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Supreme Court, County of Bronx. Case Number: 30435/2018E. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17052462).Document filed by Lonnie Mishoe, III, United Parcel Service General Services Co., United Parcel Service, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Verified Answer, #3 Exhibit Demand for Damages, #4 Exhibit Supplemental Demand for Damages)(Orlowski, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moncayo v. United Parcel Service, Inc. et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service General Services Co.
Represented By: Steven P. Orlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lonnie Mishoe, III
Represented By: Steven P. Orlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Parcel Service, Inc.
Represented By: Steven P. Orlowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike D Moncayo
Represented By: Jason Scott Steinberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?