Cojocaru v. City University of New York et al
Plaintiff: Naomi Haber and Claudia Cojocaru
Defendant: Anthony Marcus, Barry Spunt, Leonardo Dominguez, City University of New York and Ric Curtis
Case Number: 1:2019cv05428
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alvin K Hellerstein
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 20:1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2019 Set/Reset Hearings: Initial Conference set for 9/27/2019 at 10:00 AM before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. (ne)
July 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #20 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer re #1 Complaint. So ordered. The parties shall appear for an initial conference on September 27, 2019 at 10:00 a.m. City University of New York answer due 9/16/2019; Ric Curtis (in his individual capacities) answer due 9/16/2019; Ric Curtis (in his professional capacities) answer due 9/16/2019; Anthony Marcus (in his professional capacities) answer due 9/16/2019; Anthony Marcus (in his individual capacities) answer due 9/16/2019; Barry Spunt (in his individual capacities) answer due 9/16/2019; Barry Spunt (in his professional capacities) answer due 9/16/2019. (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 7/11/2019) (ne)
July 12, 2019 Filing 21 LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from David E. Gottlieb dated July 12, 2019 re: #20 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Motion, or Response to Complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Elyce Matthews dated July 10, 2019. . Document filed by Claudia Cojocaru, Naomi Haber. (Gottlieb, David)
July 10, 2019 Filing 20 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer , Motion, or Response to Complaint addressed to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein from Elyce Matthews dated July 10, 2019. Document filed by City University of New York, Ric Curtis(in his individual capacities), Ric Curtis(in his professional capacities), Anthony Marcus(in his professional capacities), Anthony Marcus(in his individual capacities), Barry Spunt(in his individual capacities), Barry Spunt(in his professional capacities).(Matthews, Elyce)
June 17, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 NOTICE OF COURT CONFERENCE: It is Ordered that counsel to whom this Order is sent is responsible for faxing a copy to all counsel and retaining verification of such in the case file. Do not fax such verification to Chambers. Please include telephone numbers and fax numbers on all documents submitted to the Court. (Initial Conference set for 7/19/2019 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 14D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein.) (Signed by Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein on 6/17/2019) (jca)
June 12, 2019 Filing 18 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to City University of New York. (dnh)
June 12, 2019 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Barry Spunt. (dnh)
June 12, 2019 Filing 16 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Leonardo Dominguez. (dnh)
June 12, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Anthony Marcus. (dnh)
June 12, 2019 Filing 14 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Ric Curtis. (dnh)
June 11, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Hilary Joy Orzick on behalf of Claudia Cojocaru, Naomi Haber. (Orzick, Hilary)
June 11, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jeanne-Marie Bates Christensen on behalf of Claudia Cojocaru, Naomi Haber. (Christensen, Jeanne-Marie)
June 11, 2019 Filing 11 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to City University of New York, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Claudia Cojocaru, Naomi Haber. (Gottlieb, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 10 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Barry Spunt, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Claudia Cojocaru, Naomi Haber. (Gottlieb, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 9 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Leonardo Dominguez, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Claudia Cojocaru, Naomi Haber. (Gottlieb, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anthony Marcus, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Claudia Cojocaru, Naomi Haber. (Gottlieb, David)
June 11, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ric Curtis, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Claudia Cojocaru, Naomi Haber. (Gottlieb, David)
June 11, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney David Evan Gottlieb to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Request for Issuance of Summons, #6 Request for Issuance of Summons, #4 Request for Issuance of Summons, #5 Request for Issuance of Summons. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): 'C/o' Error; Include 'c/o' or 'via' before second party name (Ric Curtis via City University of New York). Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (dnh)
June 11, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
June 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Ona T. Wang is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
June 11, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alvin K. Hellerstein. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
June 10, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Barry Spunt, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Claudia Cojocaru, Naomi Haber. (Gottlieb, David) Modified on 6/11/2019 (dnh).
June 10, 2019 Filing 5 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Leonardo Dominguez, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Claudia Cojocaru, Naomi Haber. (Gottlieb, David) Modified on 6/11/2019 (dnh).
June 10, 2019 Filing 4 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Anthony Marcus, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Claudia Cojocaru, Naomi Haber. (Gottlieb, David) Modified on 6/11/2019 (dnh).
June 10, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Ric Curtis, re: #1 Complaint,,. Document filed by Claudia Cojocaru, Naomi Haber. (Gottlieb, David) Modified on 6/11/2019 (dnh).
June 10, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Gottlieb, David)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against City University of New York, Ric Curtis(in his individual capacities), Ric Curtis(in his professional capacities), Leonardo Dominguez(in his individual capacities), Leonardo Dominguez(in his professional capacities), Anthony Marcus(in his professional capacities), Anthony Marcus(in his individual capacities), Barry Spunt(in his individual capacities), Barry Spunt(in his professional capacities). (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17054737)Document filed by Claudia Cojocaru, Naomi Haber.(Gottlieb, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cojocaru v. City University of New York et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anthony Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Spunt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leonardo Dominguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City University of New York
Represented By: Elyce Noel Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ric Curtis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naomi Haber
Represented By: David Evan Gottlieb
Represented By: Hilary Joy Orzick
Represented By: Jeanne-Marie Bates Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Claudia Cojocaru
Represented By: David Evan Gottlieb
Represented By: Hilary Joy Orzick
Represented By: Jeanne-Marie Bates Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?