Lebela v. Barr et al
Plaintiff: Gilles Dieudonne Lebela
Defendant: Thomas Decker, Department Of Homeland Security, Kevin K. McAleenan and William Barr
Case Number: 1:2019cv05545
Filed: June 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Valerie E Caproni
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241in
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 20, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, the plaintiff(s) and or their counsel(s), hereby give notice that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, without prejudice and without costs against the defendant(s) William Barr, Thomas Decker, Department Of Homeland Security, Kevin K. McAleenan. Document filed by Gilles Dieudonne Lebela. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers).. (Whitney, Eric)
June 19, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Brandon Matthew Waterman on behalf of William Barr, Thomas Decker, Department Of Homeland Security, Kevin K. McAleenan. (Waterman, Brandon)
June 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Maren Greenberg on behalf of Gilles Dieudonne Lebela. (Greenberg, Jessica)
June 14, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (dnh)
June 14, 2019 Magistrate Judge Debra C. Freeman is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (dnh)
June 14, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Valerie E. Caproni. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (dnh)
June 14, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Eric Nevins Whitney. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: William Barr ; Kevin K. McAleenan, Thomas Decker. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted. (dnh)
June 13, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mitchell Russell Stern on behalf of Gilles Dieudonne Lebela. (Stern, Mitchell)
June 13, 2019 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Whitney, Eric)
June 13, 2019 Filing 1 PETITION FOR WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241. (Filing Fee $ 5.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17080721)Document filed by Gilles Dieudonne Lebela. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Jessica M. Greenberg, Esq.)(Whitney, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lebela v. Barr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilles Dieudonne Lebela
Represented By: Eric Nevins Whitney
Represented By: Mitchell Russell Stern
Represented By: Jessica Maren Greenberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Decker
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department Of Homeland Security
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin K. McAleenan
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Barr
Represented By: Brandon Matthew Waterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?