State of Qatar v. First Abu Dhabi Bank PJSC et al
Plaintiff: State of Qatar
Defendant: Samba Financial Group SJSC, First Abu Dhabi Bank PJSC and John Doe Defendants 1-20
Case Number: 1:2019cv05567
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Alison J Nathan
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Cause of Action: 28:1441nr
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: This case has been assigned to me for all purposes. It is hereby ORDERED that counsel for all parties appear for an initial pretrial conference with the Court on Friday, October 11, 2019 at 3:30pm in Courtroom 906 of the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York, Thurgood Marshall U.S. Courthouse at 40 Foley Square, New York, New York. Parties ordered to submit via ECF proposed case management plan and joint letter seven days before conference. (As further set forth in this Order.) SO ORDERED. Initial Conference set for 10/11/2019 at 03:30 PM in Courtroom 906, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Alison J. Nathan. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 7/15/2019) (kv)
July 12, 2019 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Geoffrey R. Chepiga in Support re: #25 MOTION to Remand .. Document filed by State of Qatar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Abdulaziz I. Al-Missaind)(Kramer, Daniel)
July 12, 2019 Filing 26 MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re: #25 MOTION to Remand . . Document filed by State of Qatar. (Kramer, Daniel)
July 12, 2019 Filing 25 MOTION to Remand . Document filed by State of Qatar.(Kramer, Daniel)
June 24, 2019 Filing 24 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jessica Goudreault on behalf of First Abu Dhabi Bank PJSC. (Goudreault, Jessica)
June 24, 2019 Filing 23 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Richard Roy Williams, Jr on behalf of First Abu Dhabi Bank PJSC. (Williams, Richard)
June 24, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Mary Christine Slavik on behalf of First Abu Dhabi Bank PJSC. (Slavik, Mary)
June 24, 2019 Filing 21 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by First Abu Dhabi Bank PJSC.(Pees, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Robert Hardy Pees on behalf of First Abu Dhabi Bank PJSC. (Pees, Robert)
June 24, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 8/26/2019 Replies due by 9/25/2019. (jca) Modified on 6/25/2019 (jca).
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting #18 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. No further extensions. SO ORDERED. Motions due by 7/12/2019. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/24/2019) (jca)
June 20, 2019 Filing 18 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Daniel J. Kramer dated June 20, 2019. Document filed by State of Qatar.(Kramer, Daniel)
June 20, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Samba Financial Group SJSC answer due 6/21/2019. (jca)
June 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time in which to seek extension of deadline to respond to the complaint. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Alison J. Nathan on 6/20/2019) (jca)
June 20, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Geoffrey Rogers Chepiga on behalf of State of Qatar. (Chepiga, Geoffrey)
June 20, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew James Ehrlich on behalf of State of Qatar. (Ehrlich, Andrew)
June 20, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Theodore Von Wells, Jr on behalf of State of Qatar. (Wells, Theodore)
June 20, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel Jonathan Kramer on behalf of State of Qatar. (Kramer, Daniel)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time in which to seek extension of deadline to respond to the complaint addressed to Judge Alison J. Nathan from Joseph Serino, Jr. dated June 19, 2019. Document filed by Samba Financial Group SJSC.(Serino, Joseph)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Appearance of Eric F. Leon served on State of Qatar; First Abu Dhabi Bank PJSC on June 18, 2019. Service was made by Electronic Mail. Document filed by Samba Financial Group SJSC. (Lacovara, Michael)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Notice of Removal, State Court Records and Proceedings Pursuant to Local Rule 81, Civil Cover Sheet, Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice of Consent to Removal, Notice of Appearance of Michael Lacovara, Notice of Appearance of Joseph Serino, Jr., Case Docket Sheet, Individual Rules and Practices of Judge Alison J. Nathan, Individual Rules and Practices of Magistrate Judge James L. Cott, United States District Court for the Southern District of New York ECF Rules and Instructions served on State of Qatar; First Abu Dhabi Bank PJSC on June 17, 2019. Service was made by Electronic Mail. Document filed by Samba Financial Group SJSC. (Lacovara, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Eric Foster Leon on behalf of Samba Financial Group SJSC. (Leon, Eric)
June 17, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Joseph Serino, JR on behalf of Samba Financial Group SJSC. (Serino, Joseph)
June 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Lacovara on behalf of Samba Financial Group SJSC. (Lacovara, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Filing 6 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lacovara, Michael)
June 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
June 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge James L. Cott is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (jgo)
June 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Alison J. Nathan. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (jgo)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney Michael Lacovara to RE-FILE Document No. #3 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Jury Demand code - no selection;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated June 2017. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated June 2017 is located at#http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo)
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Consent to Removal. Document filed by First Abu Dhabi Bank PJSC. (Pees, Robert)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. No Corporate Parent. Document filed by Samba Financial Group SJSC.(Lacovara, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Lacovara, Michael) Modified on 6/17/2019 (jgo).
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 STATE COURT RECORDS AND PROCEEDINGS PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE 81. Document filed by Samba Financial Group SJSC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-2)(Lacovara, Michael)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from New York Supreme Court, County of New York. Case Number: 153601/2019. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17085250).Document filed by Samba Financial Group SJSC.(Lacovara, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State of Qatar v. First Abu Dhabi Bank PJSC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Samba Financial Group SJSC
Represented By: Michael Lacovara
Represented By: Eric Foster Leon
Represented By: Joseph Serino, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Abu Dhabi Bank PJSC
Represented By: Robert Hardy Pees
Represented By: Richard Roy Williams, Jr.
Represented By: Jessica Goudreault
Represented By: Mary Christine Slavik
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Defendants 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State of Qatar
Represented By: Theodore Von Wells, Jr
Represented By: Daniel Jonathan Kramer
Represented By: Geoffrey Rogers Chepiga
Represented By: Andrew James Ehrlich
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?