Securities and Exchange Commission v. Wagner et al
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Defendant: David Wagner, Downing Partners, LLC, Mark Lawrence, Downing Digital Healthcare Group, LLC and Downing Investment Partners, LP
Case Number: 1:2019cv05570
Filed: June 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of New York
Presiding Judge: Katherine Polk Failla
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Cause of Action: 15:77
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting #23 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Application GRANTED. Defendant Lawrence's time to answer or otherwise respond is hereby extended until August 23, 2019. Mark Lawrence answer due 8/23/2019. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/24/2019) (mro)
July 24, 2019 Filing 23 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer addressed to Judge Katherine Polk Failla from Andrew St. Laurent dated 07/24/2019. Document filed by Mark Lawrence.(St. Laurent, Andrew)
July 24, 2019 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Andrew M. St. Laurent on behalf of Mark Lawrence. (St. Laurent, Andrew)
July 22, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE OF INITIAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Conference set for 10/4/2019 at 03:00 PM in Courtroom 618, 40 Centre Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Katherine Polk Failla. (Signed by Judge Katherine Polk Failla on 7/22/2019) (rro)
July 10, 2019 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Downing Partners, LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. Service was accepted by David Wagner. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dunnigan, Christopher)
July 10, 2019 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Downing Investment Partners, LP served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. Service was accepted by David Wagner. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dunnigan, Christopher)
July 10, 2019 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Downing Digital Healthcare Group, LLC served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. Service was accepted by David Wagner. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dunnigan, Christopher)
July 10, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. David Wagner served on 7/8/2019, answer due 7/29/2019. Service was accepted by David Wagner. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dunnigan, Christopher)
July 3, 2019 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint. Mark Lawrence served on 7/3/2019, answer due 7/24/2019. Service was accepted by Mark Lawrence. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dunnigan, Christopher)
June 18, 2019 Filing 15 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Downing Digital Healthcare Group, LLC. (dnh)
June 17, 2019 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Downing Digital Healthcare Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dunnigan, Christopher)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS. Notice to Attorney Christopher John Dunnigan to RE-FILE Document No. #6 Request for Issuance of Summons,. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): Include the complete party name as listed on the complaint caption title;. Re-file the document using the event type Request for Issuance of Summons found under the event list Service of Process - select the correct filer/filers - and attach the correct summons form PDF. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 13 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Mark Lawrence. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 12 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Downing Investment Partners, LP. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 11 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Downing Partners, LLC. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Filing 10 ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to David Wagner. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Case Designated ECF. (pc)
June 17, 2019 Magistrate Judge Barbara C. Moses is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link: #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php. (pc)
June 17, 2019 CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Katherine Polk Failla. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District. Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at #http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php. (pc)
June 17, 2019 ***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Marc Peter Berger. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: County code Albany;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the County code has been modified to New York;. (pc)
June 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Jorge Gerardo Tenreiro on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Tenreiro, Jorge)
June 14, 2019 Filing 8 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Downing Partners, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dunnigan, Christopher)
June 14, 2019 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Downing Investment Partners, LP, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dunnigan, Christopher)
June 14, 2019 Filing 6 FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT PLEADING - SUMMONS REQUEST PDF ERROR - REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Downing Digital Healthcare Group, LLC, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dunnigan, Christopher) Modified on 6/17/2019 (pc).
June 14, 2019 Filing 5 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Mark Lawrence, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dunnigan, Christopher)
June 14, 2019 Filing 4 REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to David Wagner, re: #1 Complaint. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dunnigan, Christopher)
June 14, 2019 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Dunnigan, Christopher)
June 14, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Christopher John Dunnigan on behalf of Securities and Exchange Commission. (Dunnigan, Christopher)
June 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Downing Digital Healthcare Group, LLC, Downing Investment Partners, LP, Downing Partners, LLC, Mark Lawrence, David Wagner. Document filed by Securities and Exchange Commission.(Berger, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the New York Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Securities and Exchange Commission v. Wagner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Downing Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Lawrence
Represented By: Andrew M. St. Laurent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Downing Digital Healthcare Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Downing Investment Partners, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Securities and Exchange Commission
Represented By: Marc Peter Berger
Represented By: Christopher John Dunnigan
Represented By: Jorge Gerardo Tenreiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?